M Nicolas Enterprises, LLC et al v. Department of Veterans Affairs

Plaintiff: M NICOLAS ENTERPRISES, LLC d/b/a WORLD WIDE HEALTH SERVICES, Michelle Nicolas and M Nicolas Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 9:2019cv80638
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: William J Zloch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Summons Returned Executed,. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 8 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (vmz)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed Office of General Counsel served on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (See image DE #7 ) (vmz)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by M Nicolas Enterprises, LLC, Michelle Nicolas. Department of Veterans Affairs served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Hirsch, Scott)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erika Denise Rodriguez on behalf of M Nicolas Enterprises, LLC, Michelle Nicolas (Rodriguez, Erika)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (vmz)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (vmz)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Office of General Counsel. (vmz)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge William J. Zloch and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Veterans Affairs. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11640387, filed by M NICOLAS ENTERPRISES, LLC , Michelle Nicolas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Hirsch, Scott) Modified text on 5/14/2019 (vmz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M Nicolas Enterprises, LLC et al v. Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M NICOLAS ENTERPRISES, LLC d/b/a WORLD WIDE HEALTH SERVICES
Represented By: Scott David Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Nicolas
Represented By: Scott David Hirsch
Represented By: Erika Denise Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M Nicolas Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Scott David Hirsch
Represented By: Erika Denise Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?