Piester et al v. Franklin American Mortgage Company
Plaintiff: Leslie Piester and Trevor Piester
Defendant: Franklin American Mortgage Company
Case Number: 9:2019cv80651
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 *Case Reopened* Answer Due Deadline: Franklin American Mortgage Company response due 7/16/2019. SEE DE 17 ORDER (ail)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion to Vacate. The #12 Clerk's Default is hereby VACATED. The Clerk of the Court is further ordered to REOPEN this case. Defendant's response to the complaint is due by no later than 7/16/2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/2/2019. (kbs)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren Goldberg Raines on behalf of Franklin American Mortgage Company (Raines, Lauren)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate #12 Order on Motion for Clerks Entry of Default by Franklin American Mortgage Company. Responses due by 7/10/2019 (Dunn, Sara)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sara Drennen Dunn on behalf of Franklin American Mortgage Company. Attorney Sara Drennen Dunn added to party Franklin American Mortgage Company(pty:dft). (Dunn, Sara)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT PROCEDURE Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 *VACATED* ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re #9 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to Franklin American Mortgage Company. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail) Text Modified on 7/2/2019 (ail).
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE re #7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure. The filer is instructed to add all parties indicated on the Certificate per 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. All Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties/mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties and add parties indicated on the Certificate. (ail) (ail)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Leslie Piester, Trevor Piester (Farrow, Jay)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Courts Entry of Default pursuant to Federal Debt Collections Procedures Act (FDCPA) Title 28, U.S.C., Section 3205(6) as to Franklin American Mortgage Company by Leslie Piester, Trevor Piester. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certification)(Farrow, Jay) Event Modified on 6/21/2019 (ail).
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. All Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties/mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties and add parties indicated on the Certificate. (ail)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Leslie Piester, Trevor Piester (Farrow, Jay)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Leslie Piester, Trevor Piester. Franklin American Mortgage Company served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019.(Farrow, Jay) Text Modified on 6/19/2019 (ail).
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MEDIATION. SCHEDULING ORDER: (Fact Discovery due by 10/3/2019., Expert Discovery due by 10/18/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 11/4/2019., Jury Trial set for 2/3/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 1/29/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 12/18/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery.., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 12/3/2019.) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Franklin American Mortgage Company. (ar2)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Franklin American Mortgage Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11647985, filed by Leslie Piester, Trevor Piester. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Farrow, Jay) Modified text on 5/15/2019 (ar2).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piester et al v. Franklin American Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Piester
Represented By: Jay Lewis Farrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Piester
Represented By: Jay Lewis Farrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin American Mortgage Company
Represented By: Lauren Goldberg Raines
Represented By: Sara Drennen Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?