Carabano et al v. Natural Diamonds Investment Co. et al

Plaintiff: Celso Sanchez Duarte, Ramon Antonio Gonzalez Fernandez, Gabriel Carabano, SG Family Investments, LLC, Tomas Alfonso Biondi Paul, Rafael Carabano and Eduardo Enrique Sue Hernandez
Defendant: Xiomara Aman, Jonathan Siegel, Harold Siegel, Eagles Financial Diamond Group, Jose Aman, Natural Diamonds Investment Co., Eagle Financial Diamond Group, Jonathan Seigel and Harold Seigel
Case Number: 9:2019cv80716
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:0077
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Eagle Financial Diamond Group of Filing Order Staying Proceedings Against Natural Diamonds Investment Co. and Eagle Financial Diamond Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Receiver's Amended and Unopposed Motion to Consolidate and Expand Receivershipe) (Traband, Stephanie)
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Tomas Alfonso Biondi Paul, Gabriel Carabano, Rafael Carabano, Ramon Antonio Gonzalez Fernandez, SG Family Investments, LLC, Celso Sanchez Duarte, Eduardo Enrique Sue Hernandez re #1 Complaint,, Notice of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint) (Perez, Anthony)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Tomas Alfonso Biondi Paul, SG Family Investments, LLC, Eduardo Enrique Sue Hernandez, Rafael Carabano, Gabriel Carabano, Celso Sanchez Duarte, Ramon Antonio Gonzalez Fernandez. Xiomara Aman served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Perez, Anthony)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Tomas Alfonso Biondi Paul, SG Family Investments, LLC, Eduardo Enrique Sue Hernandez, Rafael Carabano, Gabriel Carabano, Celso Sanchez Duarte, Ramon Antonio Gonzalez Fernandez. Natural Diamonds Investment Co. served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Perez, Anthony)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Tomas Alfonso Biondi Paul, SG Family Investments, LLC, Eduardo Enrique Sue Hernandez, Rafael Carabano, Gabriel Carabano, Celso Sanchez Duarte, Ramon Antonio Gonzalez Fernandez. Eagle Financial Diamond Group served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Perez, Anthony)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay and Notice of Appearance by Eagle Financial Diamond Group. Attorney Stephanie Reed Traband added to party Eagle Financial Diamond Group(pty:dft). Responses due by 6/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Traband, Stephanie)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Tomas Alfonso Biondi Paul, SG Family Investments, LLC, Eduardo Enrique Sue Hernandez, Rafael Carabano, Gabriel Carabano, Celso Sanchez Duarte, Ramon Antonio Gonzalez Fernandez. Jose Aman served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Perez, Anthony)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Jose Aman. (ls)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Eagle Financial Diamond Group. (ls)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Gabriel Carabano (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Summons as to Jose Aman, #2 Summon(s) Summons as to Eagle Financial Diamond Group) (Perez, Anthony)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents (pcs)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Xiomara Aman, Natural Diamonds Investment Co., Harold Seigel, Jonathan Seigel. (pcs)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Damages, Equitable Relief and Injunctive Relief against Natural Diamonds Investment Co.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11689159, filed by Gabriel Carabano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons as to Natural Diamonds, #3 Summon(s) Summons as to Eagle Financial, #4 Summon(s) Summons as to Jose Aman, #5 Summon(s) Summons as to Xiomara Aman, #6 Summon(s) Summons as to Harold Siegel, #7 Summon(s) Summons as to Jonathan Siegel)(Perez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carabano et al v. Natural Diamonds Investment Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiomara Aman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagles Financial Diamond Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Aman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natural Diamonds Investment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Financial Diamond Group
Represented By: Stephanie Reed Traband
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Seigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Seigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celso Sanchez Duarte
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Perez
Represented By: Alfredo Garcia-Menocal
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Antonio Gonzalez Fernandez
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Perez
Represented By: Alfredo Garcia-Menocal
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Carabano
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Perez
Represented By: Alfredo Garcia-Menocal
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SG Family Investments, LLC
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Perez
Represented By: Alfredo Garcia-Menocal
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomas Alfonso Biondi Paul
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Perez
Represented By: Alfredo Garcia-Menocal
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Carabano
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Perez
Represented By: Alfredo Garcia-Menocal
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Enrique Sue Hernandez
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Perez
Represented By: Alfredo Garcia-Menocal
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?