F'Real Foods, LLC v. Fresh Blends North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: f'real Foods LLC and F'Real Foods, LLC
Defendant: Fresh Blends North America, Inc.
Intervenor Defendant: Welbilt, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv80744
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 25 First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Fresh Blends North America, Inc., filed by F'Real Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gurland, Harvey)
July 30, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christopher T. Ilardi. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11858386 by Welbilt, Inc.. Responses due by 8/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Munn, Janet)
July 30, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joseph A. Loy, P.C.. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11858384 by Welbilt, Inc.. Responses due by 8/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Munn, Janet)
July 30, 2019 Filing 22 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Welbilt, Inc. (Munn, Janet)
July 30, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Intervene , MOTION and Memorandum of Law to file an Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's Complaint by Welbilt, Inc.. Attorney Janet T. Munn added to party Welbilt, Inc.(pty:intvd). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Munn, Janet)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Charles M. McMahon. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/30/2019. (mbt)
July 29, 2019 Filing 19 Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Charles M. McMahon. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11851811 by Fresh Blends North America, Inc.. Responses due by 8/12/2019 (Iovino, Caroline)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 , #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Sarah Chapin Columbia and Paresh Kumar. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/26/2019. (mbt)
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Paresh Kumar. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11844181 by Fresh Blends North America, Inc.. Responses due by 8/8/2019 (Iovino, Caroline)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Sarah Chapin Columbia. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11844143 by Fresh Blends North America, Inc.. Responses due by 8/8/2019 (Iovino, Caroline)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fresh Blends North America, Inc. (Iovino, Caroline)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Fresh Blends North America, Inc.. (Iovino, Caroline)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant seeks a twenty-eight day extension of the deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (DE #1 ) due to its recent retention of counsel and the need to investigate the allegations in the Complaint. In the absence of specific details as to counsel's inability to meet the current deadline, I do not find good cause exists to grant the relief requested. I will, however, grant the motion in part. The deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (DE #1 ) is extended to July 12, 2019. No other deadlines are modified or extended as a result of this Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/27/2019. (mbt)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Fresh Blends North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Iovino, Caroline)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney John Calandra. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/24/2019. (mbt)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John Calandra. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11752140 by Fresh Blends North America, Inc.. Responses due by 7/8/2019 (Iovino, Caroline)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Guy W. Chambers. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/18/2019. (mbt)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Caroline Marie Iovino on behalf of Fresh Blends North America, Inc.. Attorney Caroline Marie Iovino added to party Fresh Blends North America, Inc.(pty:dft). (Iovino, Caroline)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Guy W. Chambers. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11735019 by F'Real Foods, LLC. Responses due by 7/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gurland, Harvey)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by F'Real Foods, LLC. Fresh Blends North America, Inc. served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Gurland, Harvey)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by F'Real Foods, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Rich Products Corporation for F'Real Foods, LLC (Gurland, Harvey)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (ar2)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Fresh Blends North America, Inc. (ar2)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Fresh Blends North America, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11709247, filed by f'real Foods LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Gurland, Harvey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: F'Real Foods, LLC v. Fresh Blends North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresh Blends North America, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Marie Iovino
Represented By: Paresh Kumar
Represented By: Charles M. McMahon
Represented By: Sarah Chapin Columbia
Represented By: John Calandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: f'real Foods LLC
Represented By: Harvey W. Gurland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F'Real Foods, LLC
Represented By: Harvey W. Gurland, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory Marc Lefkowitz
Represented By: Guy W. Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Welbilt, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Ilardi
Represented By: Joseph A. Loy
Represented By: Janet T. Munn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?