United States of America v. One (1) Smith & Wesson 9mm pistol, serial number FYW1368 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One (1) Taurus PT809 9mm pistol, serial number TKN79216, One (1) Smith & Wesson 9mm pistol, serial number FYW3459, One (1) Taurus PT111 9mm pistol, serial number TCM60822, One (1) Smith & Wesson 9mm pistol, serial number FYW1368 and One (1) Taurus PT809 9mm pistol, serial number TKN79529
Case Number: 9:2019cv80771
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE (Proof) by Publication by United States of America. Last Publication date 7/28/2019. Claims/Positions/Written Defenses/Answers/etc., due by 8/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Advertisement & Certification Report)(Zloch, William)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT in Compliance with Order, ECF No. 4 by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FedEx Delivery Confirmation, #2 Exhibit B - Published Notice)(Zloch, William)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER. The Court notes that the Clerk issued a warrant in rem for the Defendant Firearms on June 12, 2019. Plaintiff is hereby ordered to provide a status report regarding the forfeiture, including the status of the publication of forfeiture notices required by Rule G, if applicable, by no later than July 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/10/2019. (kbs)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Warrant In Rem Issued as to One (1) Smith & Wesson 9mm pistol, serial number FYW1368, One (1) Smith & Wesson 9mm pistol, serial number FYW3459, One (1) Taurus PT111 9mm pistol, serial number TCM60822, One (1) Taurus PT809 9mm pistol, serial number TKN79216, One (1) Taurus PT809 9mm pistol, serial number TKN79529. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against One (1) Smith & Wesson 9mm pistol, serial number FYW1368, One (1) Smith & Wesson 9mm pistol, serial number FYW3459, One (1) Taurus PT111 9mm pistol, serial number TCM60822, One (1) Taurus PT809 9mm pistol, serial number TKN79216, One (1) Taurus PT809 9mm pistol, serial number TKN79529. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Complaint Cover Sheet, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem)(Zloch, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One (1) Smith & Wesson 9mm pistol, serial number FYW1368 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) Taurus PT809 9mm pistol, serial number TKN79216
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) Smith & Wesson 9mm pistol, serial number FYW3459
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) Taurus PT111 9mm pistol, serial number TCM60822
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) Smith & Wesson 9mm pistol, serial number FYW1368
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) Taurus PT809 9mm pistol, serial number TKN79529
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William T. Zloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?