Jacobson v. Cantin et al
Appellee: Janice Norvell, Adam G Wasch, Norman L Schroeder, Rusty Norvell Concrete Pumping Service, Inc., John Norvell and Rene Cantin
Appellant: Donald N Jacobson
Case Number: 9:2019cv80776
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
2 Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Cases associated with 9:19-cv-80735-RAR. (gp)
July 29, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. Per ECF No. #17 Order Consolidating Cases. (gp)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Granting (17) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 9:19-cv-80735-RAR. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to CLOSE Case No. 19-CIV-80776-RAR for administrative purposes only. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to CLOSE Case No. 19-CIV-80776-RAR for administrative purposes only. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 7/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (gp)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 7/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 7/26/2019 by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (gp)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE APPEALS PURSUANT TO FRAP 8003(b)(2) by Donald N Jacobson. Responses due by 7/31/2019 (pcs)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 Consent to Consolidation to #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Janice Norvell, John Norvell, Rusty Norvell Concrete Pumping Service, Inc., Norman L Schroeder, Adam G Wasch. (Wasch, Adam)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER. Appellant Donald Jacobson, pro se, has moved to consolidate this action with another appeal. (DE #6 ). Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 7.1(a)(3), prior to filing any motion in a civil case, counsel for the moving party shall certify "that counsel for the movant has conferred with all parties or non-parties who may be affected by the relief sought in the motion in a good faith effort to resolve the issues raised in the motion and has been unable to do so." S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.1(a)(3). Appellant has not provided such certification in his Motion to Consolidate. Accordingly, Appellees are ORDERED to file a response on or before July 17, 2019, indicating their position(s) on the relief requested and stating the basis of any opposition. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/11/2019. (mbt)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 8/9/2019. (jc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 APPENDIX FOR APPELLANTS' BRIEF by Rene Cantin, Donald N Jacobson (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement, #6 Supplement, #7 Supplement, #8 Supplement, #9 Supplement, #10 Supplement)(pcs)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF FOR APPELLANTS by Rene Cantin, Donald N Jacobson. (pcs)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #7 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court, (Exhibit Register and Exhibits from 10/11/2018 Evidentiary Hearing as part of Designated Record) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21, #21 Exhibit 23, #22 Exhibit 25, #23 Exhibit 26)(mon)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 Supplemental Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Donald N Jacobson (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Appellant designations, #3 Appellant designated items, #4 Statements of Issues DE 214 and 216)(mon)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE APPEALS PURSUANT TO FRAP 8003(B)(2) by Donald N Jacobson. Responses due by 7/23/2019 (pcs)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Gruder Wasch on behalf of Janice Norvell, John Norvell, Rusty Norvell Concrete Pumping Service, Inc., Norman L Schroeder, Adam G Wasch (Wasch, Adam)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jua)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Donald N Jacobson (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(mon)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 Notices of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 15-28505-BKC-MAM, filed by Donald N Jacobson. (Attachments: #1 Amended Notice of Appeal DE#189, #2 Amended Notice of Appeal DE#190)(mon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobson v. Cantin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Janice Norvell
Represented By: Adam Gruder Wasch
Represented By: Norman Lorraine Schroeder, II.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Adam G Wasch
Represented By: Adam Gruder Wasch
Represented By: Norman Lorraine Schroeder, II.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Norman L Schroeder
Represented By: Adam Gruder Wasch
Represented By: Norman Lorraine Schroeder, II.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rusty Norvell Concrete Pumping Service, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Gruder Wasch
Represented By: Norman Lorraine Schroeder, II.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John Norvell
Represented By: Adam Gruder Wasch
Represented By: Norman Lorraine Schroeder, II.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rene Cantin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Donald N Jacobson
Represented By: Donald Nathan Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?