L2 Capital, LLC v. Anthony L.G. PLLC, et al
Plaintiff: L2 Capital, LLC
Defendant: Esquire Chad Friend, Anthony L.G. PLLC and Esqurie Laura Anthony
Case Number: 9:2019cv80781
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 1/22/2020 @ 02:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 7/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
July 26, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew R. Schindler on behalf of Laura Anthony, Anthony L.G. PLLC, Chad Friend. Attorney Andrew R. Schindler added to party Laura Anthony(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew R. Schindler added to party Anthony L.G. PLLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew R. Schindler added to party Chad Friend(pty:dft). (Schindler, Andrew)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 2/10/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 3/10/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 4/9/2020.) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Samantha A. Millrood. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 7/25/2019. (kry)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Alan L. Frank. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 7/25/2019. (kry)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Samantha A. Millrood. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11844800 by L2 Capital, LLC. Responses due by 8/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silverstein, Keith)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Alan L. Frank. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11844746 by L2 Capital, LLC. Attorney Keith David Silverstein added to party L2 Capital, LLC(pty:pla). Responses due by 8/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silverstein, Keith)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 Defendants' Verified ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Laura Anthony, Anthony L.G. PLLC, Chad Friend. (Sacher, Joseph)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by L2 Capital, LLC (Frank, Evan)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Mitchell Einhorn on behalf of Laura Anthony, Anthony L.G. PLLC, Chad Friend. Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Laura Anthony(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Anthony L.G. PLLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Mitchell Einhorn added to party Chad Friend(pty:dft). (Einhorn, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint. Answer due 7/24/2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/9/2019. (kbs)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,,,, by Laura Anthony, Anthony L.G. PLLC, Chad Friend. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sacher, Joseph)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Alan Sacher on behalf of Laura Anthony, Anthony L.G. PLLC, Chad Friend. Attorney Joseph Alan Sacher added to party Laura Anthony(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Alan Sacher added to party Anthony L.G. PLLC(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Alan Sacher added to party Chad Friend(pty:dft). (Sacher, Joseph)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 7/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by L2 Capital, LLC. Laura Anthony served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Frank, Evan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by L2 Capital, LLC. Chad Friend served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Frank, Evan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by L2 Capital, LLC. Anthony L.G. PLLC served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Frank, Evan)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OFREQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Trial set for 6/8/2020 at 9:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 6/3/2020 at 9:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 4/22/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Laura Anthony, Anthony L.G. PLLC, Chad Friend. (amb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11726576, filed by L2 Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Proposed Summons Anthony LG, PLLC, #3 Summon(s) Proposed Summons - Chad Friend, Esquire, #4 Summon(s) Proposed Summons - Laura Anthony, Esquire, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit Exhibit P, #21 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #22 Exhibit Exhibit R, #23 Exhibit Exhibit S, #24 Exhibit Exhibit T, #25 Exhibit Exhibit U, #26 Exhibit Exhibit V, #27 Exhibit Exhibit W, #28 Exhibit Exhibit X, #29 Exhibit Exhibit Y, #30 Exhibit Exhibit Z, #31 Exhibit Exhibit AA)(Frank, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L2 Capital, LLC v. Anthony L.G. PLLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esquire Chad Friend
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Represented By: Andrew R. Schindler
Represented By: Joseph Alan Sacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony L.G. PLLC
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Represented By: Andrew R. Schindler
Represented By: Joseph Alan Sacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esqurie Laura Anthony
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Einhorn
Represented By: Andrew R. Schindler
Represented By: Joseph Alan Sacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L2 Capital, LLC
Represented By: Evan Louis Frank
Represented By: Alan L. Frank
Represented By: Keith David Silverstein
Represented By: Samantha A. Millrood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?