Baker v. Bank Of America, N.A.
Appellee: Bank Of America, N.A.
Appellant: Tabitha Baker
Case Number: 9:2019cv80782
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant's Brief due August 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/8/2019. (kbs)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief re 6 Notice 8018 and Notice to Attorney,, by Tabitha Baker. Responses due by 8/22/2019 (Gabbe, Astrid)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 8/9/2019. (jc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Tabitha Baker (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Appellant designation, #3 Appellant Designated Items, #4 Appellee designation, #5 Appellee Designated Items)(mon)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Tabitha Baker (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(mon)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 18-16061-BKC-MAM, filed by Tabitha Baker.(mon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Bank Of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank Of America, N.A.
Represented By: Laudy Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Tabitha Baker
Represented By: Astrid Evelyn Gabbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?