Vilsaint v. Bluegreen Vacations
Plaintiff: Marquise Vilsaint
Defendant: Bluegreen Vacations
Case Number: 9:2019cv80793
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Marquise Vilsaint, ORDER STRIKING #1 Complaint filed by Marquise Vilsaint, (Amended Complaint due by 7/26/2019.) Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay the necessary filing fee of $400.00. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Marquise Vilsaint to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: mvilsaint08@gmail.com (ebz)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marquise Vilsaint. (mee)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 STRICKEN COMPLAINT for Employment Discrimination against Bluegreen Vacations. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Marquise Vilsaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mee) Modified stricken per Order DE #5 on 7/8/2019 (ebz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vilsaint v. Bluegreen Vacations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluegreen Vacations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquise Vilsaint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?