Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. v. Preferred Florida Real Estate, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.
Defendant: Preferred Florida Real Estate, LLC and Steven M. Shattow
Case Number: 9:2019cv80819
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants have until September 3, 2019 to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/12/2019. (vty)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, by Preferred Florida Real Estate, LLC, Steven M. Shattow. Attorney Jillian Sidisky added to party Steven M. Shattow(pty:dft). (Sidisky, Jillian)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Preferred Florida Real Estate, LLC. Answer due 8/12/2019. Re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/29/2019. (vty)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, by Preferred Florida Real Estate, LLC. Attorney Jillian Sidisky added to party Preferred Florida Real Estate, LLC(pty:dft). (Sidisky, Jillian)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. Preferred Florida Real Estate, LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Sanks, Terry)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Preferred Florida Real Estate, LLC, Steven M. Shattow. (lbc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to Sreven M. Shattow by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. re 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es) (Sanks, Terry)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to Preferred Florida Real Estate, LLC by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. re 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es) (Sanks, Terry)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (mailed to copyright office) (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Attorney's return address is not listed (mee)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (mee)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Copyright Infringement against Preferred Florida Real Estate, LLC, and Steven M. Shattow. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11752550, filed by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Exhibit S)(Sanks, Terry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. v. Preferred Florida Real Estate, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Florida Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Jillian Sidisky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven M. Shattow
Represented By: Jillian Sidisky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.
Represented By: Terry Marcus Sanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?