Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. v. Signature Properties of the Palm Beaches, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.
Defendant: Clayton G. Haviland and Signature Properties of the Palm Beaches, LLC.
Case Number: 9:2019cv80820
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (ar2)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT PROCEDURE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 Clerks Entry of Default as to Signature Properties of the Palm Beaches, LLC., Clayton G. Haviland - Motions Terminated: #10 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, #9 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 8/5/2019. (mc)
August 4, 2019 Filing 10 Amended MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Clayton G. Haviland, Signature Properties of the Palm Beaches, LLC. by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Clerk's Entry of Default)(Sanks, Terry)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against Signature Properties of the Palm Beaches, LLC, and Clayton G. Haviland, as to Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. (Sanks, Terry)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. Clayton G. Haviland served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Sanks, Terry)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. Signature Properties of the Palm Beaches, LLC. served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Sanks, Terry)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 7/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. ( Jury Trial set for 6/22/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 6/17/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 5/6/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg). Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Clayton G. Haviland, Signature Properties of the Palm Beaches, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ebz) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/21/2019) (ebz). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/21/2019) (ebz).
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE. (Copy of the Complaint, Exhibits and AO 121 form mailed out). (ebz)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against Signature Properties of the Palm Beaches, LLC, and Clayton G. Haviland. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11752653, filed by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N)(Sanks, Terry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. v. Signature Properties of the Palm Beaches, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton G. Haviland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signature Properties of the Palm Beaches, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.
Represented By: Terry Marcus Sanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?