Handelsman v. SMS Co. et al
Plaintiff: Burton Handelsman
Defendant: SMS Co., Marsha Stocker, Steven Handelsman and Sandy Heaslip
Case Number: 9:2019cv80847
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 8/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/18/2019., Discovery due by 2/10/2020., Expert Discovery due by 2/10/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 10/18/2019., Mediation Deadline 2/18/2020., In Limine Motions due by 4/24/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 2/24/2020., Motions due by 2/24/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/24/2020., Jury Trial set for 6/8/2020 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman., Calendar Call set for 6/2/2020 01:45 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon For Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Other Affiliates by SMS Co. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Burton Handelsman identifying Other Affiliate Lucille Handelsman, Other Affiliate Landmark Properties for Burton Handelsman (DuBosar, Howard)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT REGARDING Scheduling (Joint) by Burton Handelsman (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DuBosar, Howard)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 8/14/2019. The parties, including governmental parties must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements by 8/14/2019. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 the Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendants shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to #1 the Plaintiff's Complaint on or before August 30, 2019. Note that no further extensions of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/24/2019. (jrf)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 Clerks Notice to Filer re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time extension of time . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SMS Co. (Fisher, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Steven Handelsman. Attorney Jeffrey David Fisher added to party Steven Handelsman(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher, Jeffrey) Modified Relief on 7/24/2019 (ls).
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Burton Handelsman. Marsha Stocker served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (DuBosar, Harrison)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Burton Handelsman. Sandy Heaslip served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (DuBosar, Harrison)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Burton Handelsman. Steven Handelsman served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (DuBosar, Harrison)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE PLAINTIFFS OR DEFENDANTS Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Attorney information does not match initiating document. The name of the attorney submitting the complaint does not match the signature on the pdf document. The attorney listed on the initiating document has been added. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pcs)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Steven Handelsman, Sandy Heaslip, SMS Co., Marsha Stocker. (pcs)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11763413, filed by Burton Handelsman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s))(DuBosar, Harrison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Handelsman v. SMS Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMS Co.
Represented By: Jeffrey David Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Stocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Handelsman
Represented By: Jeffrey David Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Heaslip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burton Handelsman
Represented By: Howard D. DuBosar
Represented By: Harrison Ross DuBosar
Represented By: Eli Matthew DuBosar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?