Hartog v. American Express Company et al
Plaintiff: Ross Hartog
Defendant: American Express National Bank, American Express Centurion Bank, American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. and American Express Company
Case Number: 9:2019cv80875
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
2 Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 8/31/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 8/26/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 7/15/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 13, 2019 Filing 18 Plaintiff's REPLY to #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Ross Hartog. (Rosenberg, Alan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, American Express Company, American Express National Bank, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.. (Green, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand /Abstention And Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, American Express Company, American Express National Bank, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.. Replies due by 8/14/2019. (Green, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ross Hartog. Replies due by 8/13/2019. (Rosenberg, Alan)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is due by August 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/30/2019. (bkd)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ross Hartog. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robson, Grace)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF TRANSFER to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 7/26/2019. Judge Rodney Smith no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 07/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand /Abstention And Supporting Memorandum of Law by Ross Hartog. (Rosenberg, Alan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Robert Rosenberg on behalf of Ross Hartog. Attorney Alan Robert Rosenberg added to party Ross Hartog(pty:pla). (Rosenberg, Alan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, American Express Company, American Express National Bank, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.. Responses due by 7/31/2019 (Green, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by American Express Centurion Bank, American Express Company, American Express National Bank, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. re #5 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions, (Green, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Darryl S. Laddin. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond #3 to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 . Defendants' response to the Complaint is due no later than July 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/8/2019. (lbn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, American Express Company, American Express National Bank, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. (Green, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Darryl S. Laddin. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11781781 by American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, American Express Company, American Express National Bank, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.. Responses due by 7/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certification)(Green, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, by American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, American Express Company, American Express National Bank, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Green, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Ross R. Hartog, Assignee for the Benefit of Creditors of Med-Care Diabetic & Medical Supplies, Inc., v. American Express Company; American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.; American Express Centurion Bank; American Express Bank, FSB, and American Express National Bank f/k/a American Express Centurion Bank) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11780399, filed by American Express National Bank f/k/a American Express Centurion Bank and successor-by-merger to American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., American Express Company. No Answer and/or Motion to Dismiss Filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Green, Michael) Modified on 7/2/2019 (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartog v. American Express Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express National Bank
Represented By: Darryl S. Laddin
Represented By: Michael Brandon Green
Represented By: Kenneth G.M. Mather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Centurion Bank
Represented By: Darryl S. Laddin
Represented By: Michael Brandon Green
Represented By: Kenneth G.M. Mather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Bank, FSB
Represented By: Darryl S. Laddin
Represented By: Michael Brandon Green
Represented By: Kenneth G.M. Mather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.
Represented By: Darryl S. Laddin
Represented By: Michael Brandon Green
Represented By: Kenneth G.M. Mather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Company
Represented By: Darryl S. Laddin
Represented By: Michael Brandon Green
Represented By: Kenneth G.M. Mather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Hartog
Represented By: Grace E. Robson
Represented By: Alan Robert Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?