Goldwire v. Inch
Plaintiff: Treymone Goldwire
Defendant: Warden Michael Booker and Mark S. Inch
Case Number: 9:2019cv80888
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah Koenig on behalf of Mark S. Inch. Attorney Deborah Koenig added to party Mark S. Inch(pty:dft). (Koenig, Deborah)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LIMITED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - 28 U.S.C. 2254 REGARDING TIMELINESS OF FEDERAL PETITION. On or before September 12, 2019, the respondent shall file a response to this show cause order regarding its position on the timeliness of this federal petition. Show Cause Response due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner filed his/her motion to proceed in forma pauperis but failed to submit the supporting statement certified by the appropriate institutional officer showing all receipts, expenditures, and balances during the last six months for any institutional account in her name. Accordingly, on or before September 12, 2019, Petitioner shall file the required supporting, certified inmate account statement, or pay the Clerks filing fee of $5.00. Responses due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE: Clerk modified the identity of the Respondent to Mark S. Inch, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections per DE# 4 . (fbn) Modified on 8/13/2019 (fbn).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER instructing the Clerk to modify the identity of the Respondent to Mark S. Inch, Secretary for the Florida Department of Corrections, who is Petitioner's legal custodian and the proper respondent in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid (bca)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Treymone Goldwire. (pcs)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (pcs)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00. IFP Filed, filed by Treymone Goldwire. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(pcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldwire v. Inch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Michael Booker
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S. Inch
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Represented By: Deborah Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Treymone Goldwire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?