Lawler et al v. Torrey Pines Stable Florida Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Lawler Show Jumping LLC and Alec Lawler
Defendant: Torrey Pines Stable Florida Corp. and Eric Lamaze
Case Number: 9:2019cv80916
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 Answer to Complaint. Missing Filer Name(s); ERROR - The filer failed to select all parties indicated on DE #11 . The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Torrey Pines Stable Florida Corp., Erick Lamaze. (Barbuto, Anthony) Modified Filer on 8/28/2019 (ls).
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alec Lawler, Lawler Show Jumping LLC (Rosenberg, R)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by September 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 8/14/2019. See attached document for full details. fc)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PERFECT SERVICE. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 8/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (fc)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #5 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Serve a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint by no later than August 26, 2019. Moving forward, Defendants are cautioned that extensions of time should be requested prior to the expiration of the relevant deadline, not after the time for compliance has elapsed. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 8/14/2019. (fc)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4 Notice of Attorney Appearance. Attorney Did Not Associate Themselves; ERROR - Filing attorney neglected to associate themselves to the case. The Clerk has added the attorney to the case. It is not necessary to refile this document future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures and Local Rules by filing a Notice of Attorney Appearance and linking themselves to the case. (ls)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Torrey Pines Stable Florida Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Barbuto, Anthony)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony M. Barbuto on behalf of Torrey Pines Stable Florida Corp.. Attorney Anthony M. Barbuto added to party Torrey Pines Stable Florida Corp.(pty:dft). (Barbuto, Anthony)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Eric Lamaze, Torrey Pines Stable Florida Corp.. (pcs)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11805376, filed by Alec Lawler, Lawler Show Jumping LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Eric Lamaze, #3 Summon(s) Torrey Pines, #4 Exhibit A - July 24, #5 Exhibit B - Invoice, #6 Exhibit C - Invoice Log, #7 Exhibit D - September 14, #8 Exhibit E - December 20, #9 Exhibit F - January 31, #10 Exhibit G - May 23)(Rosenberg, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawler et al v. Torrey Pines Stable Florida Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrey Pines Stable Florida Corp.
Represented By: Anthony M. Barbuto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Lamaze
Represented By: Anthony M. Barbuto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawler Show Jumping LLC
Represented By: R Edward Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alec Lawler
Represented By: R Edward Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?