Cohan v. Phoenix of Deerfield, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Defendant: Phoenix of Davie, Inc., Phoenix of N Lauderdale, LLC, Phoenix of Deerfield, Inc., Phoenix of West Commercial, Inc. and Phoenix of Pembroke Pines, LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv80990
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER administratively closing case in light of the #17 Notice of Settlement, which indicates that this matter has settled. The parties are hereby notified that, within forty-five (45) days of the date of this Order, they must file a Notice or Stipulation of Dismissal, along with any other pertinent document necessary to conclude this action. All other pending deadlines are stayed and any pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/5/2019. (dco)
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Settlement by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. The Parties shall file their Joint Scheduling Report by no later than September 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/29/2019. (dco)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To file Joint scheduling report and proposed scheduling order re #12 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, by Howard Cohan. Responses due by 9/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sconzo, Gregory)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Phoenix of Davie, Inc., Phoenix of Deerfield, Inc., Phoenix of N Lauderdale, LLC, Phoenix of Pembroke Pines, LLC, Phoenix of West Commercial, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Phoenix Holdings of South Florida, LLC for Phoenix of Davie, Inc., Phoenix of Deerfield, Inc., Phoenix of N Lauderdale, LLC, Phoenix of Pembroke Pines, LLC, Phoenix of West Commercial, Inc. (Chotiner, Adam)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Joint Scheduling Report due by 8/29/2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (dco)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the #1 Complaint by no later than August 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/22/2019. (dco)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Phoenix of Davie, Inc., Phoenix of Deerfield, Inc., Phoenix of N Lauderdale, LLC, Phoenix of Pembroke Pines, LLC, Phoenix of West Commercial, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chotiner, Adam)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam S. Chotiner on behalf of Phoenix of Davie, Inc., Phoenix of Deerfield, Inc., Phoenix of N Lauderdale, LLC, Phoenix of Pembroke Pines, LLC, Phoenix of West Commercial, Inc.. Attorney Adam S. Chotiner added to party Phoenix of Davie, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Adam S. Chotiner added to party Phoenix of Deerfield, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Adam S. Chotiner added to party Phoenix of N Lauderdale, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Adam S. Chotiner added to party Phoenix of Pembroke Pines, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Adam S. Chotiner added to party Phoenix of West Commercial, Inc.(pty:dft). (Chotiner, Adam)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. Phoenix of West Commercial, Inc. served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Sconzo, Gregory)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. Phoenix of Davie, Inc. served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Sconzo, Gregory)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. Phoenix of Deerfield, Inc. served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Sconzo, Gregory)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. Phoenix of Pembroke Pines, LLC served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Sconzo, Gregory)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. Phoenix of N Lauderdale, LLC served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Sconzo, Gregory)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Phoenix of Davie, Inc., Phoenix of Deerfield, Inc., Phoenix of N Lauderdale, LLC, Phoenix of Pembroke Pines, LLC, Phoenix of West Commercial, Inc. (ar2)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Phoenix of Davie, Inc., Phoenix of Deerfield, Inc., Phoenix of N Lauderdale, LLC, Phoenix of Pembroke Pines, LLC, Phoenix of West Commercial, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11816809, filed by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s))(Sconzo, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohan v. Phoenix of Deerfield, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix of Davie, Inc.
Represented By: Adam S. Chotiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix of N Lauderdale, LLC
Represented By: Adam S. Chotiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix of Deerfield, Inc.
Represented By: Adam S. Chotiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix of West Commercial, Inc.
Represented By: Adam S. Chotiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix of Pembroke Pines, LLC
Represented By: Adam S. Chotiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Represented By: Gregory Steven Sconzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?