Cohan v. Great Service Restaurants, LLC
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Defendant: Great Service Restaurants, LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv80996
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 9/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Amended Pleadings due by 10/16/2019., Discovery due by 1/28/2020., Expert Discovery due by 1/28/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 10/16/2019., Mediation Deadline 2/11/2020., In Limine Motions due by 5/11/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 2/19/2020., Motions due by 2/19/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/11/2020., Jury Trial set for 5/26/2020 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman., Calendar Call set for 5/19/2020 01:45 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon for all pretrial non-dispositive and discovery matters. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Howard Cohan (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sconzo, Gregory)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Compliance of Local Rule 7.1 by Great Service Restaurants, LLC re #10 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report (Burger, Alan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #11 Order, by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pacer Search)(Sconzo, Gregory)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT (Verified Response due 8/26/2019). Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Joint Scheduling Report due by 8/29/2019 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Great Service Restaurants, LLC. Attorney Alan Michael Burger added to party Great Service Restaurants, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - List of Modifications)(Burger, Alan)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/1/2019. (vve)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Continue Status Conference re #4 Order Setting Status Conference by Howard Cohan. Responses due by 8/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sconzo, Gregory)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. Great Service Restaurants, LLC served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Sconzo, Gregory)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Status Conference: Status Conference set for 8/1/2019 09:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Great Service Restaurants, LLC. (pcs)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Great Service Restaurants, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11817137, filed by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Sconzo, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohan v. Great Service Restaurants, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Represented By: Gregory Steven Sconzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Service Restaurants, LLC
Represented By: Alan Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?