Cohan v. V&M Food Enterprises, LLC
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Defendant: V&M Food Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv81001
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER CLOSING CASE. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT, all hearings are CANCELLED, and all deadlines are TERMINATED; The Clerk of the Court is instructed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 8/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #5 Order, by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pacer Search)(Sconzo, Gregory)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by V&M Food Enterprises, LLC. Attorney Justin Canner Sorel added to party V&M Food Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft). (Sorel, Justin)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MEDIATION. SCHEDULING ORDER: (Fact Discovery due by 11/18/2019., Expert Discovery due by 12/2/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 12/16/2019., Jury Trial set for 3/16/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 3/11/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 1/29/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery.., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 10/7/2019.) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT. Plaintiffs counsel shall file with the Clerk of the Court the verified statement responding to the questions promulgated above within two (2) weeks of the rendition of this Order. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. V&M Food Enterprises, LLC served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Sconzo, Gregory)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to V&M Food Enterprises, LLC. (amb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against V&M Food Enterprises, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11817301, filed by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Sconzo, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohan v. V&M Food Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Represented By: Gregory Steven Sconzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V&M Food Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Justin Canner Sorel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?