Medlin v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Linda Medlin
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv81003
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William Matthewman
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Stay DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT filed by Linda Medlin. Replies due by 8/29/2019. (Scott, Cathleen)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT by Linda Medlin (Scott, Cathleen)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney(s) Kimberly J. Doud, Esq. and Nancy A. Johnson re #10 Notice of Change of Address. Attorneys Kimberly J. Doud, Esq. and Nancy A. Johnson are directed to update their information in CM/ECF. Pursuant to CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, upon the change of a Users e-mail address, mailing address, telephone or fax number, the User shall update their mailing address, telephone and fax numbers in CM/ECF Maintain User Account. (pt)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Nancy A. Johnson. Attorney Nancy A. Johnson added to party Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.(pty:dft). (Johnson, Nancy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Forman, Scott)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Responses due by 8/26/2019 (Forman, Scott)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS #3 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND MOTION TO STRIKE IMMATERIAL ALLEGATIONS, ALONG WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Responses due by 8/26/2019 (Forman, Scott)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT: (Joint Status Report due by 8/22/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 8/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (kza)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 8/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (kza)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And Order Referring Discovery Matters To The Magistrate Judge William Matthewman. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., filed by Linda Medlin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Scott, Cathleen)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mc)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Pursuant to Order to Sever - Filing Fees - Waived, filed by Linda Medlin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Order to Sever)(mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medlin v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Medlin
Represented By: Cathleen Ann Scott
Represented By: Leslie Mitchell Kroeger
Represented By: Lindsey Brooke Wagner
Represented By: Diana Leigh Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Bridget Ann Berry
Represented By: Scott Alan Forman
Represented By: Stacey Bradford
Represented By: Allan G. King
Represented By: Kimberly J. Doud
Represented By: Nancy A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?