Maltin et al v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alan Maltin and Connie Maltin
Defendant: Wright Medical Group, Inc. and Wright Medical Technology, Inc
Case Number: 9:2019cv81064
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 5/4/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 6/2/2020.)AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 7/2/2020.) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) Modified on 9/24/2019 (drz).
September 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per Order DE#21 . Mediation Deadline 6/2/2020. (drz)
September 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per Oder DE#21 . Mediation Deadline 7/2/2020. (drz)
September 10, 2019 Filing 20 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Wright Medical Technology, Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gurland, Harvey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Adam Karr on behalf of Alan Maltin, Connie Maltin. Attorney Joshua Adam Karr added to party Alan Maltin(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua Adam Karr added to party Connie Maltin(pty:pla). (Karr, Joshua)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 8/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 8/31/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 8/26/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 7/15/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), Order of Court-Mandated Requirements in, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc of Withdrawal of Counsel (Stern, Justin)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin M. L. Stern on behalf of Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Attorney Justin M. L. Stern added to party Wright Medical Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Justin M. L. Stern added to party Wright Medical Technology, Inc(pty:dft). (Stern, Justin)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harvey W. Gurland, Jr on behalf of Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Attorney Harvey W. Gurland, Jr added to party Wright Medical Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Harvey W. Gurland, Jr added to party Wright Medical Technology, Inc(pty:dft). (Gurland, Harvey)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Dana Jeffrey Ash, mailing date July 26, 2019, (pt)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney William Usher Norwood, mailing date July 26, 2019, (pt)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Michael Lee McGlamry and N. Kirkland Pope, mailing date July 26, 2019, (pt)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:16-cv-00917. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb).
July 25, 2019 Case electronically transferred again (and copies mailed via USPS) to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida at request of plaintiff's counsel. (ddm)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING 2375 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Terrence Smith terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/16/18. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-TWT et al.(jkl)
June 25, 2018 Case electronically transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. (ddm)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION AND ORDER directing that the cases identified on Exhibit A, attached to this Order, be transferred out of this MDL and remanded to the United States District Courts in which they were originally filed and from which they were transferred to the Court. The Clerk is directed to transfer the cases listed in Exhibit A to their respective District Courts. It is further ordered that the Clerk is directed to administratively close all cases listed in Exhibit B. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 6/22/18. (ddm)
June 22, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO MEDICAID, OTHER GOVERNMENTAL HEALTHCARE PROGRAMS AND PRIVATE HEALTH INSURANCE PLANS (See Order for specifics) Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 12/20/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-WSD et al.(rjs)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO MEDICARE SECONDARY PAYER granting the 1791 Motion for Protective Order in case 1:12-md-02329-WSD. (See Order for specifics) Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 12/20/2016. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-WSD et al.(rjs)
April 14, 2016 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Alan Maltin, Connie Maltin. Wright Medical Group, Inc. served on 3/28/2016, answer due 4/18/2016; Wright Medical Technology, Inc. served on 3/24/2016, answer due 4/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Return Receipt for Wright Medical Group, #2 Exhibit Summons-Affidavit of Service for Wright Medical Technology)(McGlamry, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Filing 3 SHORT FORM ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand of Alan Maltin and Connie Maltin by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Discovery ends on 9/12/2016.(Ash, Dana) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 22, 2016 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Group, Inc. and Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jkl)
March 22, 2016 Filing 1 ABBREVIATED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Alan Maltin and Connie Maltin. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-6358383.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jkl) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 3/22/2016 (jkl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maltin et al v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Maltin
Represented By: William Usher Norwood
Represented By: N. Kirkland Pope
Represented By: Michael L. McGlamry
Represented By: Joshua Adam Karr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Maltin
Represented By: William Usher Norwood
Represented By: N. Kirkland Pope
Represented By: Michael L. McGlamry
Represented By: Joshua Adam Karr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Dana Jeffrey Ash
Represented By: Justin M. L. Stern
Represented By: Harvey W. Gurland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc
Represented By: Dana Jeffrey Ash
Represented By: Justin M. L. Stern
Represented By: Harvey W. Gurland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?