Gabriel v. McAleenan
Plaintiff: Dawud Canaan Sturrup Gabriel
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin K. McAleenan
Case Number: 9:2019cv81078
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Partial Filing Fee received on 8/16/2019 in the amount of $ 350.00, receipt number FLS900006502 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (vmz)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Partial Filing Fee received on 8/12/2019 in the amount of $ 25.00, receipt number FLS900006498 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (vmz)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Partial Filing Fee received on 8/9/2019 in the amount of $ 25.00, receipt number FLS900006497 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (pcs)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE AND CLOSING CASE. See attached document for full details. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 8/1/2019. (fc)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program. See attached document for full details. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 7/31/2019. (fc)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. See attached document for full details. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 7/31/2019. (fc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Dawud Canaan Sturrup Gabriel. (kpe)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dawud Canaan Sturrup Gabriel. (kpe)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kevin K. McAleenan. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Dawud Canaan Sturrup Gabriel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit)(kpe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabriel v. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawud Canaan Sturrup Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?