United States Sugar Corporation v. Commanding General and Chief of Engineers for the United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES SUGAR CORPORATION
Defendant: Commanding General and Chief of Engineers for the United States Army Corps of Engineers, Commanding District Engineer for the United States Army Corps of Engineers, Jacksonville District and UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Case Number: 9:2019cv81086
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
2 Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by United States Sugar Corporation (Munson, Gregory)
September 16, 2019 Filing 17 Joint Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by Commanding District Engineer for the United States Army Corps of Engineers, Jacksonville District, Commanding General and Chief of Engineers for the United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Army Corps of Engineers (Dykema, Peter)
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Commanding District Engineer for the United States Army Corps of Engineers, Jacksonville District, Commanding General and Chief of Engineers for the United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Army Corps of Engineers (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dykema, Peter)
September 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Kryn Dykema on behalf of Commanding District Engineer for the United States Army Corps of Engineers, Jacksonville District, Commanding General and Chief of Engineers for the United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Army Corps of Engineers. Attorney Peter Kryn Dykema added to party Commanding District Engineer for the United States Army Corps of Engineers, Jacksonville District(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Kryn Dykema added to party Commanding General and Chief of Engineers for the United States Army Corps of Engineers(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Kryn Dykema added to party United States Army Corps of Engineers(pty:dft). (Dykema, Peter)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by United States Sugar Corporation. United States Army Corps of Engineers served on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service to U.S. Department of Justice)(Burgess, Rick)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by United States Sugar Corporation. United States Attorney served on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Burgess, Rick) Modified Party 8/26/2019 (ls).
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by United States Sugar Corporation. Commanding District Engineer for the United States Army Corps of Engineers, Jacksonville District served on 8/14/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Burgess, Rick)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by United States Sugar Corporation. Commanding General and Chief of Engineers for the United States Army Corps of Engineers served on 8/14/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Burgess, Rick)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by United States Sugar Corporation. United States Army Corps of Engineers served on 8/14/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Burgess, Rick)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF TRANSFER to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 8/21/2019. Judge Rodney Smith no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ls)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) of Ariana F. Orshan and William Barr by UNITED STATES SUGAR CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Ariana F. Orshan, #2 Summon(s) William Barr) (Burgess, Rick)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by UNITED STATES SUGAR CORPORATION (Munson, Gregory)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES, AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/16/2019 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commanding District Engineer for the United States Army Corps of Engineers, Jacksonville District, Commanding General and Chief of Engineers for the United States Army Corps of Engineers, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS (pcs)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pcs)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11863044, filed by UNITED STATES SUGAR CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Summon(s) Semonite Summons, #7 Summon(s) Kelly Summons, #8 Summon(s) CORPS Summons)(Burgess, Rick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Sugar Corporation v. Commanding General and Chief of Engineers for the United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commanding General and Chief of Engineers for the United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Peter Kryn Dykema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commanding District Engineer for the United States Army Corps of Engineers, Jacksonville District
Represented By: Peter Kryn Dykema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Represented By: Peter Kryn Dykema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES SUGAR CORPORATION
Represented By: Rick J. Burgess
Represented By: Gregory M. Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?