Nakava LLC v. The South Pacific Elixir Company
Plaintiff: Nakava LLC
Defendant: The South Pacific Elixir Company
Case Number: 9:2019cv81128
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Initial Disclosure(s) by Nakava LLC (Mauro, Carl)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by Nakava LLC (Mauro, Carl)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Nakava LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mauro, Carl)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by The South Pacific Elixir Company (Peretz, Steven)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by The South Pacific Elixir Company. (Peretz, Steven)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the #1 Complaint by no later than September 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/5/2019. (dco)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by The South Pacific Elixir Company. Attorney Steven Ira Peretz added to party The South Pacific Elixir Company(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peretz, Steven)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/26/2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (dco)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Supplement Complaint and Exhibits) (jao)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The South Pacific Elixir Company. (jao)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nakava LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11888215, filed by Nakava LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through F to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Mauro, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nakava LLC v. The South Pacific Elixir Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The South Pacific Elixir Company
Represented By: Steven Ira Peretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nakava LLC
Represented By: Carl Cory Mauro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?