Abrebaya v. Princeton Medical Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alberto Abrebaya
Defendant: Princeton Medical Group, Inc. and DIMEDA INSTRUMENTE GMBH
Case Number: 9:2019cv81138
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to DIMEDA INSTRUMENTE GMBH. (lbc)
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Alberto Abrebaya re #3 Amended Complaint filed by Alberto Abrebaya (Magolnick, Joel)
October 2, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Princeton Medical Group, Inc. (Shapiro, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Princeton Medical Group, Inc.. Attorney Jeffrey Brian Shapiro added to party Princeton Medical Group, Inc.(pty:dft). (Shapiro, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #3 Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Alberto Abrebaya. Princeton Medical Group, Inc. served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Magolnick, Joel)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Princeton Medical Group, Inc.. (dj)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Alberto Abrebaya re #3 Amended Complaint filed by Alberto Abrebaya (Magolnick, Joel)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO REMOVE ATTORNEYS OF RECORD FROM SERVICE LIST,granting #5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Alberto Abrebaya, granting #4 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Alberto Abrebaya., Attorney Giovanna Abreu O'Connor and Veronica Mae Rabinowitz terminated. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Motion; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (vmz)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Motion; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (vmz) Modified on 8/12/2019 (vmz).
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO REMOVE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FROM SERVICE LIST by Alberto Abrebaya Removal of Attorney as Counsel of Record (Magolnick, Joel) Modified on 8/12/2019 (vmz).
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Motion To Remove Veronica Mae Rabinowitz Attorney Of Record From Service by Alberto Abrebaya Removal of Attorney as Counsel of Record (Magolnick, Joel) Modified convert to motion on 8/12/2019 (vmz).
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alberto Abrebaya.(Magolnick, Joel)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11892008, filed by Alberto Abrebaya. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Magolnick, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrebaya v. Princeton Medical Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princeton Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Brian Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIMEDA INSTRUMENTE GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Abrebaya
Represented By: Veronica Mae Rabinowitz
Represented By: Joel Steven Magolnick
Represented By: Giovanna Abreu O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?