WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. v. WEBPOWER, INC et al
Plaintiff: WAG ACQUISITION, LLC
Defendant: Webpower, Inc and Does 1-20
Case Number: 9:2019cv81155
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #168 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Settlement. The Clerk shall CLOSE this case for administrative purposes only. Any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. See attached document for full details. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 10/7/2019. (mhn)
October 4, 2019 Filing 168 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Settlement by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC. Responses due by 10/18/2019 (De Zayas, Veronica)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION with Brian F. Spector, LLC on December 11, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. See attached document for full details. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 9/23/2019. (mhn)
September 19, 2019 Filing 166 NOTICE by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC of Filing Joint Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Shapiro, Jay)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re #156 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, ( Settlement Conference set for 11/13/2019 02:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart., Telephone Conference set for 11/12/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 9/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER DISMISSING DOE DEFENDANTS. The Doe Defendants 1-20 are DISMISSED without prejudice. See attached document for full details. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 9/11/2019. (mhn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 163 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Doe Defendants Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC (De Zayas, Veronica)
September 11, 2019 Filing 162 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert C. Josefsberg on behalf of Webpower, Inc. Attorney Robert C. Josefsberg added to party Webpower, Inc(pty:dft). (Josefsberg, Robert)
September 11, 2019 Filing 161 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Status Conference held on 8-28-2019 before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz, 1-26 pages, Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 954-769-5568 / Gizella_Baan-Proulx@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/2/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2019. (gbx)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 9/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
September 4, 2019 Filing 159 NOTICE by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC re #155 Order, (De Zayas, Veronica)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER TO PERFECT SERVICE. On or before September 11, 2019, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon the John Doe Defendants. Failure to file proof of service will result in a dismissal without prejudice as to the John Doe Defendants and without further notice. See attached document for full details. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 8/28/2019. (mhn)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 4/13/2020 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz., Calendar Call set for 4/7/2020 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz., Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation due by 9/19/2019., Claim Construction Discovery due by 9/27/2019., Damages Discovery due by 12/16/2019., Expert Discovery due by 12/16/2019., Mediation Deadline 12/23/2019., Pretrial Motions due by 1/6/2020., In Limine Motions due by 2/24/2020., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/24/2020.). ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for all discovery related matters. See attached document for full details. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 8/28/2019. (mhn) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Main Document 157 replaced on 8/28/2019) (gp).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for Settlement Conference. Counsel shall confer and contact Magistrate Judge Reinhart's Chambers on or before September 18, 2019 to schedule the settlement conference. See attached document for full details. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 8/28/2019. (mhn)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO OBTAIN COUNSEL. On or before September 11, 2019, Defendant Webpower, Inc. must either retain local counsel or its out-of-state counsel must file a motion to appear pro hac vice. See attached document for full details. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 8/28/2019. (mhn)
August 28, 2019 Filing 154 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz: Status Conference held on 8/28/2019. Order to follow. Attorney Appearance(s): Veronica Louise De Zayas, David G. Liston, Ari J. Jaffess, Jay Brian Shapiro, Andrew Kayton, Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 954-769-5568 / Gizella_Baan-Proulx@flsd.uscourts.gov. (gp)
August 28, 2019 Filing 153 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/28/2019 04:30 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. (gp)
August 28, 2019 Filing 152 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Veronica Louise De Zayas on behalf of WAG ACQUISITION, LLC (De Zayas, Veronica)
August 28, 2019 Filing 151 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jay Brian Shapiro on behalf of WAG ACQUISITION, LLC. Attorney Jay Brian Shapiro added to party WAG ACQUISITION, LLC(pty:pla). (Shapiro, Jay)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring Plaintiff's local counsel to file a notice of appearance in this matter by 3:30 p.m. today, August 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 8/28/2019. (mhn)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #145 Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of electronic Filing. Attorney Alex G. Patchen is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Plaintiff WAG Acquisition LLC for all purposes relating to this action. The Clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Alex G. Patchen, Esq., at alex.patchen@listonabramson.com. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 8/28/2019. (mhn)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #144 Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of electronic Filing. Attorney David G. Liston is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Plaintiff WAG Acquisition LLC for all purposes relating to this action. The Clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to David G. Listin, Esq., at david.liston@listonabramson.com. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 8/28/2019. (mhn)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #143 Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of electronic Filing. Attorney Ari J. Jaffess is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Plaintiff WAG Acquisition LLC for all purposes relating to this action. The Clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Ari J. Jaffess, Esq., at ari.jaffes@listonabramson.com. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 8/28/2019. (mhn)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #142 Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of electronic Filing. Attorney Ronald Abramson is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Plaintiff WAG Acquisition LLC for all purposes relating to this action. The Clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Ronald Abramson, Esq., at ron.abramson@listonabramson.com. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 8/28/2019. (mhn)
August 27, 2019 Filing 145 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Alex G. Patchen. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11938552 by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC. Responses due by 9/10/2019 (De Zayas, Veronica)
August 27, 2019 Filing 144 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David G. Liston. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11938530 by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC. Responses due by 9/10/2019 (De Zayas, Veronica)
August 27, 2019 Filing 143 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ari J. Jaffess. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11938484 by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC. Responses due by 9/10/2019 (De Zayas, Veronica)
August 27, 2019 Filing 142 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ronald Abramson. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11938426 by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC. Attorney Veronica Louise De Zayas added to party WAG ACQUISITION, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Veronica Louise De Zayas added to party WAG ACQUISITION, LLC(pty:cd). Responses due by 9/10/2019 (De Zayas, Veronica)
August 21, 2019 Filing 141 NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE . A telephonic status conference is hereby scheduled for August 28, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. See attached document for full details. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 8/21/2019. (mhn)
August 15, 2019 Filing 140 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (jua)
August 14, 2019 Filing 139 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
August 14, 2019 Filing 138 Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 2:15-cv-03581. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
August 14, 2019 Case extracted via CM/ECF to the USDC Southern District of Florida. (th, )
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for (124 in 2:15-cv-03581-ES-MAH) Report and Recommendations, (158 in 2:14-cv-03456-ES-MAH) Report and Recommendations, (175 in 2:14-cv-02340-ES-MAH) Report and Recommendations, etc. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/13/2019. (byl)
August 13, 2019 Filing 136 OPINION. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/13/2019. (byl)
March 28, 2019 Filing 135 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #134 Scheduling Order,. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER: The parties shall submit to the Court a joint status report that sets forth: The discovery that remains to be completed in each case; proposed deadline for the completion of discovery, service of expert reports and the completion of all expert discovery; There will be a telephone status conference in these matters on 4/23/2019 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 03/14/2019. (sms)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting #131 and #132 Motion to Seal Document re Report and Recommendation; Plaintiff has complied with the structures of Local Civil Rule 5.3(c) and 7.1; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 01/07/2019. (sms)
December 14, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #132 MOTION to Seal Document #124 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (1 in 2:14-cv-04531-ES-MAH) Complaint, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C., (1 in 2:15-cv-03581-ES-MAH) Complaint, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC . Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
December 14, 2018 Filing 132 MOTION to Seal Document #124 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (1 in 2:14-cv-04531-ES-MAH) Complaint, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C., (1 in 2:15-cv-03581-ES-MAH) Complaint, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Appendix - Index Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(3), #3 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Findings of Fact, #4 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID)
December 13, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #131 MOTION to Seal Document #125 Objection to Report and Recommendations,, #130 Response (NOT Motion),, . Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
December 12, 2018 Filing 131 MOTION to Seal Document #125 Objection to Report and Recommendations,, #130 Response (NOT Motion),, by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Redacted Objections to Report & Recommendation, #3 Redacted Response to Objections, #4 Appendix - Index Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(3), #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Findings of Fact, #6 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID)
November 28, 2018 Filing 130 RESPONSE re #125 Objection to Report and Recommendations,,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 179 Motion to Seal, 175 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in case 2:14-cv-2340-ES-MAH, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.; Any renewed motion to seal shall be filed no later than December 14, 2018, etc. re #128 MOTION to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/26/2018. (sms) Modified on 11/29/2018 (th).
November 25, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #128 MOTION to Seal Document #124 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (1 in 2:14-cv-04531-ES-MAH) Complaint, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C., (1 in 2:15-cv-03581-ES-MAH) Complaint, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC . Motion set for 12/18/2018 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
November 21, 2018 Filing 128 MOTION to Seal Document #124 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (1 in 2:14-cv-04531-ES-MAH) Complaint, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C., (1 in 2:15-cv-03581-ES-MAH) Complaint, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Redacted Version of Document to Be Sealed, #3 Proposed Findings of Fact, #4 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER, granting WAG Acquisition, L.L.C. ("WAG") request for an eight (8) day extension for its Response to Defendants' Objection to Judge Hammer's October 23, 2018 Report and Recommendations in the above-referenced case. WAG response is extended to Wednesday, November 28. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 11/20/2018. (sms)
November 19, 2018 Filing 126 Letter from Ronald Abramson re Unopposed Request for Extension to File Response re #125 Objection to Report and Recommendations,,. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
November 6, 2018 Filing 125 OBJECTION to #124 Report and Recommendations by WEBPOWER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 23, 2018 Filing 124 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re Defendants' motions to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) or, in the alternative, to dismiss or transfer for improper venue under the patent venue statute, 28 U.S.C. 1400(b); Objections, if any, to R&R due by 11/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/22/2018. (sms)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 LETTER ORDER terminating Defendants' #112 Motion to Dismiss for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction, or alternatively, to dismiss for improper venue, or to transfer, etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 06/29/2018. (sms)
March 28, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Oral Argument Conference held on 3/28/2018. (ECR) (jqb, )
March 21, 2018 Filing 122 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 TEXT ORDER: Oral Argument set for 3/28/2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/28/2018. (jqb, )
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW/ORDER granting #119 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/27/18. (sr, )
January 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #119 MOTION to Seal Document #116 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, #115 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #113 Brief,,,, . Motion set for 2/20/2018 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
January 16, 2018 Filing 119 MOTION to Seal Document #116 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, #115 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #113 Brief,,,, by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law & Order, #3 Proposed Redactions to Brief in Support of Motion, #4 Proposed Redactions to Brief in Opposition to Motion, #5 Proposed Redactions to Reply Brief in Support of Motion, #6 Exhibit 11 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #7 Exhibit 12 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #8 Exhibit 13 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #9 Exhibit 14 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #10 Exhibit 16 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #11 Exhibit 17 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #12 Exhibit 18 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #13 Exhibit 20 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #14 Exhibit 21 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #15 Exhibit 22 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #16 Exhibit 23 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #17 Exhibit 24 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #18 Exhibit 26 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #19 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER permitting parties a one-week extension of time, until 1/16/18, to file a motion to seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/10/18. (sr, )
January 9, 2018 Filing 117 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
December 26, 2017 Filing 116 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by WEBPOWER, INC re #112 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 19, 2017 Filing 115 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC re #112 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 27, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #112 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 12/18/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
November 22, 2017 Filing 114 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WEBPOWER, INC re #112 MOTION to Dismiss , #113 Brief,,,, (QUINN, JUSTIN)
November 22, 2017 Filing 113 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS [ECF NO. 112] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin T. Quinn, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26)(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 22, 2017 Filing 112 MOTION to Dismiss by WEBPOWER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Albers, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER terminating w/out prejudice #104 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants shall make any motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter, and to dismiss or transfer for improper venue under 1406(a) on or before November 22, 2017; any opposition shall be filed by December 19, 2017; any reply shall be filed by December 26, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/2/17. (sr, )
September 26, 2017 Filing 110 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
August 29, 2017 Filing 109 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by WEBPOWER, INC re #104 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin T. Quinn, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
August 23, 2017 Filing 108 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. enclosing the parties Joint Claim Construction Statement. (Attachments: #1 Joint Claim Construction Statement, #2 Exhibit A and B)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
August 22, 2017 Filing 107 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC re #104 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mord M. Lewis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting parties request for an extension of Claim Construction deadlines, as set forth. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/3/17. (DD, )
July 31, 2017 Filing 105 Letter from Ari J. Jaffess regarding Joint Request for Extension of Claim Construction Deadlines. (JAFFESS, ARI)
July 28, 2017 Filing 104 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by WEBPOWER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Justin T. Quinn, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B (Part 1), #5 Exhibit B (Part 2), #6 Declaration of Mark Albers, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
July 12, 2017 Filing 103 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER permitting Defendant to take the deposition of Patrick O'Brien following the closeof fact discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/5/17. (cm, )
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW & ORDER AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/5/17. (cm, )
June 30, 2017 Filing 100 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER permitting Defendants a 3-week extension of all claim construction deadlines; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/29/17. (sr, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 98 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' June 12, 2017 joint letter [D.E. 95]. Defendants shall file any motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, to transfer on or before July 28, 2017. Plaintiff shall file any opposition by August 22, 2017. Any reply shall be filed by August 29, 2017. Discovery shall not be stayed pending adjudication of the motion. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/26/2017. (MAH)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER permitting Alex Patchen, Esq. to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/12/17. (sr, )
June 12, 2017 Filing 95 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. raising dispute regarding TC Heartland LLC v. Kraft Foods Group Brands (May 22, 2017). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
June 8, 2017 Filing 94 Letter from Ronald Abramson regarding Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Alex G. Patchen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald Abramson, #2 Declaration of Alex G. Patchen, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
June 8, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #93 MOTION to Seal Document #92 Letter,,, . Motion set for 7/3/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
June 8, 2017 Filing 93 MOTION to Seal Document #92 Letter,,, by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Statement of David G. Liston, Esq., #2 Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law & Order, #3 Redacted May 24, 2017 Letter, #4 Redacted Tab A - Proposed Amended Answer to May 24, 2017 Letter, #5 Appendix 1 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #6 Appendix 2 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #7 A1 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #8 A2 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #9 Redacted A3 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #10 Redacted A4 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #11 Redacted A5 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #12 Redacted A6 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #13 A7 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #14 A8 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #15 Redacted A9 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #16 A10 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #17 Redacted A11 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #18 Exhibit D1 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #19 Exhibit D2 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #20 Exhibit D3 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #21 Redacted Ex. D4 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #22 Redacted Ex. D5 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #23 Redacted Ex. D6 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #24 Redacted Ex. D7 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #25 Exhibit D8 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #26 Exhibit D9 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #27 Exhibit D10 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #28 Redacted Ex A (WAG), #29 Exhibit B (WAG), #30 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID)
May 24, 2017 Filing 92 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Tab A - Proposed Amended Answer, #2 Appendix 1, #3 Appendix 2, #4 A1, #5 A2, #6 A3, #7 A4, #8 A5, #9 A6, #10 A7, #11 A8, #12 A9, #13 A10, #14 A11, #15 Exhibit D1, #16 Exhibit D2, #17 Exhibit D3, #18 Exhibit D4, #19 Exhibit D5, #20 Exhibit D6, #21 Exhibit D7, #22 Exhibit D8, #23 Exhibit D9, #24 Exhibit D10, #25 Exhibit A (WAG), #26 Exhibit B (WAG))(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER/AMENDED DISCOVERY PLAN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/18/17. (sr, )
May 16, 2017 Filing 90 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. enclosing a proposed Amended Discovery Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #88 Joint Letter Motion re: Discovery Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/30/2017. (ld, )
March 30, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #88 Joint MOTION Joint Letter Motion regarding Discovery Plan. Motion set for 5/1/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
March 29, 2017 Filing 88 Joint MOTION Joint Letter Motion regarding Discovery Plan by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiffs proposed Amended Discovery Plan)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
March 24, 2017 Filing 87 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 TEXT ORDER: The Status Conference set for 2/24/2017 is adjourned without a new date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/21/2017. (jqb, )
January 6, 2017 Filing 85 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. and the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #59 Letter. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW/ORDER granting #77 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/4/17. (sr, )
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Order/Letter of Request for International Judicial Assistance pursuant to the 3/18/70 Hague Convention on the taking of evidence abroad in civil or commercial matters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/14/16. (sr, )
December 12, 2016 Filing 82 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #79 Exhibit (to Document), #77 Joint MOTION to Seal Document #70 Letter,, #75 Letter,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted Letter of Request)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
December 8, 2016 Filing 81 Letter from Ronald Abramson re #80 Letter. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
December 8, 2016 Filing 80 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
December 7, 2016 Filing 79 Exhibit to #78 Letter by WEBPOWER, INC. (QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 7, 2016 Filing 78 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re 76 Order,. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
November 29, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #77 Joint MOTION to Seal Document #70 Letter,, #75 Letter,, . Motion set for 1/3/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
November 29, 2016 Filing 77 Joint MOTION to Seal Document #70 Letter,, #75 Letter,, by WEBPOWER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Justin T. Quinn, Esq., #2 Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law & Order, #3 Redacted November 3, 2016 Letter of Defendants, #4 Redacted Ex. A to November 3, 2016 Letter, #5 Redacted November 21, 2016 Letter of Plaintiff, #6 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 TEXT ORDER: The parties are directed to continue to meet and confer regarding Defendants' request that their Letter of Request be signed. If the parties are unable to resolve this matter on their own, they shall appear in the courtroom of the Undersigned on December 8, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. for an in person meet and confer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/22/16. (TAD)
November 21, 2016 Filing 75 Letter from Ronald Abramson re #70 Letter,,. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 15, 2016 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by MORD MICHAEL LEWIS on behalf of WAG ACQUISITION, LLC (LEWIS, MORD)
November 15, 2016 Filing 73 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #72 Letter. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
November 14, 2016 Filing 72 Letter from Ari J. Jaffess re #70 Letter,, #71 Letter. (JAFFESS, ARI)
November 14, 2016 Filing 71 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #70 Letter,,. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
November 3, 2016 Filing 70 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter of Request)(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER/AMENDED DISCOVERY PLAN; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/14/16. (sr, )
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER that Defendants' request that the Court limit the number of claims that Plaintiff can assert is DENIED, and that Plaintiff's request that the Court limit the number of prior art references by Defendants is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/14/16. (sr, )
October 14, 2016 Filing 67 Joint Discovery Plan by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC.(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/7/2016 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Counsel for plaintiff will initiate the call to 973-776-7858. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/30/2016. (jqb, )
September 29, 2016 Text Only Minute Entry for an oral opinion placed on the record re #39 Motion to Bifurcate by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/29/2016. See order #65 . (jqb, )
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #39 Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/29/16. (sr, )
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference call scheduled for today is cancelled. A new date and time for the call will be scheduled shortly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/3/16. (TAD)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference call scheduled for today is adjourned to Wednesday, August 3, 2016 at 4:00 p.m. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/29/16. (TAD)
July 28, 2016 Filing 61 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
July 27, 2016 Filing 64 Transcript of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on July 15, 2016, before Judge Michael A. Hammer. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 8/17/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2016. (mfr)
July 15, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Status Conference held on 7/15/2016. (ECR) (jqb, )
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 TEXT ORDER: The parties shall forthwith continue to meet & confer in an attempt to resolve the issue raised in their June 23, 2016 letter to the Court. There will be a telephone conference call with counsel on July 29, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. to advise the Court regarding the status of their meet & confer and this outstanding issue. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/15/16. (TAD)
July 14, 2016 Filing 59 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. and the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' June 23, 2016 joint letter, the Court adjourns Plaintiff's June 23, 2016 deadline to submit responses to Defendants invalidity contentions and the July 6, 2016 deadline to exchange proposed terms of construction. The parties shall be prepared to discuss the positions and arguments raised in the June 23, 2016 joint letter before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on July 15, 2016. So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 7/5/2016. (ps, )
June 23, 2016 Filing 57 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 TEXT ORDER: There will be Oral Argument on the pending motion to bifurcate #39 on July 15, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/25/16. (TAD)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/28/16. (sr, )
March 23, 2016 Filing 54 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 TEXT ORDER: On or before March 23, 2016, the parties are directed to file a revised discovery confidentiality order consistent with the Court's rulings of March 9, 2016. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/10/16. (Dunican, T) Modified on 3/10/2016 (jqb, ).
March 9, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/9/2016. (ECR) (jqb, )
March 7, 2016 Filing 52 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC re #39 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery (Sur-Reply) (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TEXT ORDER: Today's Telephone Conference is adjourned to 3/9/2016 at 3:30 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/7/2016. (jqb, )
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER that WAG shall be permitted to file a sur-reply brief not to exceed 5 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/4/16. (sr, )
March 3, 2016 Filing 49 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #48 Letter. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
March 3, 2016 Filing 48 Letter from Ronald Abramson re #39 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
February 29, 2016 Filing 47 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by WEBPOWER, INC re #39 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 3/7/2016 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/6/2016. (jqb,
February 23, 2016 Filing 45 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re 40 Order,,. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
February 22, 2016 Filing 44 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC re #39 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
February 18, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by GIANNA ELISSA CRICCO-LIZZA on behalf of WEBPOWER, INC (CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER permitting the parties an extension, until 2/23/16, to comply with the Court's 2/8/16 Text Order RE: remaining disputes in the Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/17/16. (sr, )
February 16, 2016 Filing 41 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ORDER:The Court has reviewed the parties' February 5, 2016 letter presenting disputes between the parties regarding the form of the Discovery Confidentiality Order. The Court directs the parties to immediately resume their efforts to meet and confer on this dispute. If the parties cannot resolve their issues, then they shall submit, by February 17, 2016, a revised letter presenting any remaining disputes. The revised joint letter also shall explain why the Court's standard Discovery Confidentiality Order (Appendix S to the New Jersey Federal Practice Rules) is insufficient. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/16/16. (Dunican, T)
February 11, 2016 Filing 39 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery by WEBPOWER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Joint Motion to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
February 8, 2016 Filing 38 Transcript of Proceedings of Scheduling Conference held on January 22, 2016, before Judge MICHAEL A. HAMMER. Court Reporter/Transcriber KING TRANSCRIPTION SERVICES/ Sara L. Kern (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 2/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2016. (ek)
February 5, 2016 Filing 37 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE: discovery schedule; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/1/16. (sr, )
January 29, 2016 Filing 35 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Joint Discovery Plan)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER pursuant to Fed.R.Evid.502(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/26/16. (sr, )
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER regarding E-Discovery in Patent Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/26/16. (sr, )
January 19, 2016 Filing 32 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. enclosing Joint Discovery Plan, E-Discovery Order, and Rule 502(d) Order. (Attachments: #1 Joint Discovery Plan, #2 Proposed Order re: Electronic Discovery, #3 Proposed Rule 502(d) Order)(QUINN, JUSTIN)
December 22, 2015 Filing 31 ANSWER to Counterclaim by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC.(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
December 1, 2015 Reset Hearing: The Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/2016 has been adjourned to 1/22/2016 at 11:00 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jqb, )
November 30, 2015 Reset Hearing: Per counsel's request, the Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2015 has been adjourned to 1/21/2016 at 2:30 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jqb, )
November 30, 2015 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #30 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/24/15. (sr, )
November 25, 2015 Filing 30 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to WAG Acquisition, L.L.C... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
November 17, 2015 Filing 29 Letter from Ronald Abramson for Plaintiff WAG re #28 Letter. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)
November 16, 2015 Filing 28 Letter from Keith J. Miller, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #25 Letter, #26 Order, Set/Clear Flags, Set Hearings. (MILLER, KEITH)
November 16, 2015 Filing 27 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against WAG ACQUISITION, LLC by WEBPOWER, INC.(MILLER, KEITH)
November 16, 2015 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ps, )
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 LETTER ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2015 at 12:00 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/13/2015. (jqb, )
November 12, 2015 Filing 25 Letter from Ronald Abramson for Plaintiff WAG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX 1-PTAB Decision on 011 Patent, #2 Exhibit EX 2-PTAB Decision on 141 Patent, #3 Exhibit EX 3-PTAB Decision on 611 Patent, #4 Exhibit EX 4-PTAB Decision on 839 Patent)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)
November 5, 2015 Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson no longer assigned to case. (jr)
October 26, 2015 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by WEBPOWER, INC.(MILLER, KEITH)
September 25, 2015 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #23 Order submitted by WEBPOWER, INC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/26/15. (sr, )
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CONSENT ORDER granting Defendants' application to file answer to WAG Acquisition, LLC's Complaints until 10/26/15. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 10/24/15. (sr, )
September 22, 2015 Filing 22 Letter from Keith J. Miller, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. and the Honorable Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, KEITH)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall terminate Defendants motion to dismiss in each of the consolidated cases, the Clerk shall terminate WebPowers motion to dismiss in Civil Action No. 15-3581, D.E. No. 9, and the parties shall engage in limited jurisdictional discovery regarding the Courts personal jurisdiction over Defendant Coolvision. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/10/15. (sr, )
July 23, 2015 Pro Hac Vice counsel, FRANK M. GASPARO and RALPH A. DENGLER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sr, )
July 22, 2015 Filing 20 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ralph A. Dangler, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-6537375.) (QUINN, JUSTIN)
July 22, 2015 Filing 19 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Frank M. Gasparo, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-6537340.) (QUINN, JUSTIN)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER permitting Frank M. Gasparo & Ralph A. Dengler to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 7/21/15. (sr, )
July 13, 2015 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by WEBPOWER, INC re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MILLER, KEITH)
July 6, 2015 Filing 16 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ari J. Jaffess, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1 Dunnhumby v. Emnos, #3 Exhibit 2 Intellectual Ventures v. Capital One, #4 Exhibit 3 My Health, Inc. v. Lifescan, #5 Exhibit 4 Presqriber v. Advanced Data, #6 Exhibit 5 Summit 6 v. HTC)(JAFFESS, ARI)
July 2, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN on behalf of WEBPOWER, INC (QUINN, JUSTIN)
July 2, 2015 Filing 14 Letter from Keith J. Miller, Esq. to the Honorable Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J. enclosing the pro hac vice application of Frank M. Gasparo, Esq. and Ralph A. Dengler, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith J. Miller, Esq., #2 Declaration of Frank M. Gasparo, Esq., #3 Declaration of Ralph A. Dengler, Esq., #4 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, KEITH)
June 29, 2015 Filing 13 Letter from Keith J. Miller, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. (MILLER, KEITH)
June 29, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by TODD MATTHEW NOSHER on behalf of WEBPOWER, INC (NOSHER, TODD)
June 29, 2015 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 7/20/2015 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (sr, )
June 26, 2015 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WEBPOWER, INC re #9 MOTION to Dismiss , #10 Corporate Disclosure Statement (MILLER, KEITH)
June 26, 2015 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WEBPOWER, INC. (MILLER, KEITH)
June 26, 2015 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by WEBPOWER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 11.2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, KEITH)
June 26, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW P. MACARTHUR on behalf of WEBPOWER, INC (MACARTHUR, ANDREW)
June 25, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID G. LISTON on behalf of WAG ACQUISITION, LLC (LISTON, DAVID)
June 22, 2015 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC. WEBPOWER, INC waiver sent on 5/28/2015, answer due 7/27/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID)
June 9, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ARI JASON JAFFESS on behalf of WAG ACQUISITION, LLC (JAFFESS, ARI)
June 2, 2015 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) Modified on 6/2/2015 (JB, ).
May 28, 2015 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to WEBPOWER, INC Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Jackeline Barco* (JB, )
May 28, 2015 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (JB, )
May 27, 2015 Filing 4 AO120 Patent Form filed. (Attachments: #1 AO 120, #2 COMPLAINT) (JB, )
May 27, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1-20, WEBPOWER, INC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-6416363) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Related Case Notice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JB, ) Modified on 6/2/2015 (JB, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. v. WEBPOWER, INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webpower, Inc
Represented By: Robert C. Josefsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAG ACQUISITION, LLC
Represented By: David G. Liston
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Ari J. Jaffess
Represented By: Jay Brian Shapiro
Represented By: Alex G. Patchen
Represented By: Veronica Louise De Zayas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?