Lewis et al v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Monopoli, Ana Schwartz, Timothy Lewis, James Fitzpatrick, Linda Gazie, Synthia Praglin, Steven Wallach and Teresa Massa
Defendant: Daimler AG, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC and Grammer AG
Case Number: 9:2019cv81220
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Joint Motion To Extend Time To Respond To Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 9/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (btr)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Daimler AG, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Attorney W Randall Bassett added to party Daimler AG(pty:dft), Attorney W Randall Bassett added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bassett, W)
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Scarola on behalf of James Fitzpatrick, Linda Gazie, Timothy Lewis, Teresa Massa, Joseph Monopoli, Synthia Praglin, Ana Schwartz, Steven Wallach (Scarola, John)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Michael A. Burger. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 9/12/2019. (btr)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael A. Burger. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11975094 by James Fitzpatrick, Linda Gazie, Timothy Lewis, Teresa Massa, Joseph Monopoli, Synthia Praglin, Ana Schwartz, Steven Wallach. Responses due by 9/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael Burger, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Widlanski, Benjamin)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alissa Del Riego on behalf of James Fitzpatrick, Linda Gazie, Timothy Lewis, Teresa Massa, Joseph Monopoli, Synthia Praglin, Ana Schwartz, Steven Wallach. Attorney Alissa Del Riego added to party James Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Alissa Del Riego added to party Linda Gazie(pty:pla), Attorney Alissa Del Riego added to party Timothy Lewis(pty:pla), Attorney Alissa Del Riego added to party Teresa Massa(pty:pla), Attorney Alissa Del Riego added to party Joseph Monopoli(pty:pla), Attorney Alissa Del Riego added to party Synthia Praglin(pty:pla), Attorney Alissa Del Riego added to party Ana Schwartz(pty:pla), Attorney Alissa Del Riego added to party Steven Wallach(pty:pla). (Del Riego, Alissa)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Gravante, III on behalf of James Fitzpatrick, Linda Gazie, Timothy Lewis, Teresa Massa, Joseph Monopoli, Synthia Praglin, Ana Schwartz, Steven Wallach. Attorney John Gravante, III added to party James Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney John Gravante, III added to party Linda Gazie(pty:pla), Attorney John Gravante, III added to party Timothy Lewis(pty:pla), Attorney John Gravante, III added to party Teresa Massa(pty:pla), Attorney John Gravante, III added to party Joseph Monopoli(pty:pla), Attorney John Gravante, III added to party Synthia Praglin(pty:pla), Attorney John Gravante, III added to party Ana Schwartz(pty:pla), Attorney John Gravante, III added to party Steven Wallach(pty:pla). (Gravante, John)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Weinshall on behalf of James Fitzpatrick, Linda Gazie, Timothy Lewis, Teresa Massa, Joseph Monopoli, Synthia Praglin, Ana Schwartz, Steven Wallach. Attorney Matthew Weinshall added to party James Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Weinshall added to party Linda Gazie(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Weinshall added to party Timothy Lewis(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Weinshall added to party Teresa Massa(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Weinshall added to party Joseph Monopoli(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Weinshall added to party Synthia Praglin(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Weinshall added to party Ana Schwartz(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Weinshall added to party Steven Wallach(pty:pla). (Weinshall, Matthew)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Prieto on behalf of James Fitzpatrick, Linda Gazie, Timothy Lewis, Teresa Massa, Joseph Monopoli, Synthia Praglin, Ana Schwartz, Steven Wallach. Attorney Peter Prieto added to party James Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Peter Prieto added to party Linda Gazie(pty:pla), Attorney Peter Prieto added to party Timothy Lewis(pty:pla), Attorney Peter Prieto added to party Teresa Massa(pty:pla), Attorney Peter Prieto added to party Joseph Monopoli(pty:pla), Attorney Peter Prieto added to party Synthia Praglin(pty:pla), Attorney Peter Prieto added to party Ana Schwartz(pty:pla), Attorney Peter Prieto added to party Steven Wallach(pty:pla). (Prieto, Peter)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Joseph Monopoli, Linda Gazie, James Fitzpatrick, Teresa Massa, Synthia Praglin, Timothy Lewis, Steven Wallach, Ana Schwartz. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Neary, Robert)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Daimler AG. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s))(lk)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by James Fitzpatrick, Linda Gazie, Timothy Lewis, Teresa Massa, Joseph Monopoli, Synthia Praglin, Ana Schwartz, Steven Wallach re #1 Complaint, filed by Ana Schwartz, Joseph Monopoli, James Fitzpatrick, Linda Gazie, Teresa Massa, Timothy Lewis, Steven Wallach, Synthia Praglin (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, #2 Summon(s) Daimler AG, #3 Summon(s) Grammer AG) (Neary, Robert)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney George Franjola, mailing date August 30, 2019, (pt)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Daimler AG, Grammer AG, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11948657, filed by Joseph Monopoli, Linda Gazie, James Fitzpatrick, Teresa Massa, Synthia Praglin, Timothy Lewis, Steven Wallach, Ana Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Widlanski, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis et al v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Monopoli
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: Gail Ann McQuilkin
Represented By: Rachel Sullivan
Represented By: Robert J Neary
Represented By: Harley Shepard Tropin
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Represented By: George Franjola
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Michael A. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Schwartz
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: Gail Ann McQuilkin
Represented By: Rachel Sullivan
Represented By: Robert J Neary
Represented By: Harley Shepard Tropin
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Represented By: George Franjola
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Michael A. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Lewis
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: Gail Ann McQuilkin
Represented By: Rachel Sullivan
Represented By: Robert J Neary
Represented By: Harley Shepard Tropin
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Represented By: George Franjola
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Michael A. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Fitzpatrick
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: Gail Ann McQuilkin
Represented By: Rachel Sullivan
Represented By: Robert J Neary
Represented By: Harley Shepard Tropin
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Represented By: George Franjola
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Michael A. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Gazie
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: Gail Ann McQuilkin
Represented By: Rachel Sullivan
Represented By: Robert J Neary
Represented By: Harley Shepard Tropin
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Represented By: George Franjola
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Michael A. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synthia Praglin
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: Gail Ann McQuilkin
Represented By: Rachel Sullivan
Represented By: Robert J Neary
Represented By: Harley Shepard Tropin
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Represented By: George Franjola
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Michael A. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Wallach
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: Gail Ann McQuilkin
Represented By: Rachel Sullivan
Represented By: Robert J Neary
Represented By: Harley Shepard Tropin
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Represented By: George Franjola
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Michael A. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Massa
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: Gail Ann McQuilkin
Represented By: Rachel Sullivan
Represented By: Robert J Neary
Represented By: Harley Shepard Tropin
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Represented By: George Franjola
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Michael A. Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler AG
Represented By: W Randall Bassett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By: W Randall Bassett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grammer AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?