Iguanamed IP, LLC v. Medwear Uniforms West, Inc.
Plaintiff: Iguanamed IP, LLC
Defendant: Medwear Uniforms West, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv81226
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER for Magistrate Judge Bruce Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 9/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 8/31/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 8/26/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 7/29/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), Order of Requirements, and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (pcs)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (pcs)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pcs)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Medwear Uniforms West, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11955723, filed by Iguanamed IP, LLC.(Lipscomb, Angela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iguanamed IP, LLC v. Medwear Uniforms West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iguanamed IP, LLC
Represented By: Angela Marie Lipscomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medwear Uniforms West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?