Chandra v. Elavon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shalini Chandra
Defendant: Elavon, Inc. and U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 9:2019cv81249
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE, ( Status Conference Re: Final Discovery Matters set for 4/16/2020 03:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 10/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 10/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 9/14/2020 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz., Calendar Call set for 9/8/2020 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz., Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation due by 11/14/2019., Amended Pleadings due by 12/5/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 12/5/2019., Discovery due by 5/18/2020., Expert Discovery due by 5/18/2020., Mediation Deadline 5/25/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 6/2/2020., In Limine Motions due by 6/30/2020., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/30/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for all discovery related matters. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 10/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (mhn) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Shalini Chandra (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Daniel)
October 14, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Shalini Chandra (Levine, Daniel)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Stanley Lord, Jr on behalf of Elavon, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A.. Attorney John Stanley Lord, Jr added to party Elavon, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John Stanley Lord, Jr added to party U.S. Bank, N.A.(pty:dft). (Lord, John)
October 7, 2019 Reset Deadlines Per DE#9. Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/23/2019 (cqs)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES on or before October 23, 2019. See attached document for full details. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 10/7/2019. (mhn)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Elavon, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank, N.A. (Gilcrist Sainvil, Akiesha)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Elavon, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A.. Attorney Akiesha Renee Gilcrist Sainvil added to party Elavon, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Akiesha Renee Gilcrist Sainvil added to party U.S. Bank, N.A.(pty:dft). (Gilcrist Sainvil, Akiesha)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING COMBINED RESPONSES. Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers by October 2, 2019. See attached document for full details. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 9/16/2019. (mhn)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Shalini Chandra. U.S. Bank, N.A. served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Levine, Daniel)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Shalini Chandra. Elavon, Inc. served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Levine, Daniel)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Elavon, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (cds)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11967380, filed by Shalini Chandra. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Elavon, #3 Summon(s) U.S. Bank, N.A.)(Levine, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chandra v. Elavon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elavon, Inc.
Represented By: John Stanley Lord, Jr.
Represented By: Akiesha Renee Gilcrist Sainvil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John Stanley Lord, Jr.
Represented By: Akiesha Renee Gilcrist Sainvil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalini Chandra
Represented By: Daniel R. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?