Guthrie v. US Government et al
Plaintiff: Randolph H. Guthrie, III
Defendant: Park One of Florida, LLC, Facebook, Inc., Riverside Park Community II, LLC, IAC/Interactive Corp, Urban American Management Corp, An Luxury Imports of Palm Beach, Inc., CVS Caremark Corporation, Iconbrickell Condominium No. One Association, Inc., J & J Teq III, Corp., Clarence Lee Lott, III, United Parcel Service, Inc., Baptist Health South Florida, Inc., Robert E. Hauberg, Jr., University Of Miami, AT&T Corp., City of New York, Apple Inc., Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC, Walgreens Co., Federal Express Corp., Richmond Healthcare, Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation, Hotwire Communications, LTD., US Government, Iconbrickell Condominium No. Three Association, Inc., JFK Medical Center, Inc., Bethesda Hospital, Inc., The Related Group, Iconbrickell Master Association, Inc., eHarmony.com, TRG Brickell Point Hotel, LLC and Riverside Park Community, LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv81253
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
2 Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
3 Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUA SPONTE ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT AS FRIVOLOUS AND CLOSING CASE Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT and the Clerk of the Court shall CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(a)(1) states that "The court may issue a preliminary injunction only on notice to the adverse party." To date, the Defendants have not appeared and there is no evidence that Defendants have been served with the Complaint. Plaintiff may refile his Motion for Preliminary Injunction once at least one defendant has appeared in this action. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/17/2019. (bkd)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/17/2019. (bkd)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Randolph H. Guthrie, III. (ebz)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Delay of Service by Randolph H. Guthrie, III. Responses due by 9/30/2019 (ebz)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4, defendants must be served within 90 days of the filing of a complaint. Here, Plaintiff must serve the named defendants by no later than December 9, 2019 (the filing date + 90 days, pursuant to Rule 4(m)). Plaintiff must prove service by filing the appropriate affidavits in the Court record. See Rule 4(l). Plaintiff is further directed to carefully review Rule 4 subsections (i) and (j) for requirements on serving the U.S. Government and state governments. Failure to serve any individually named defendant and file proof of that service in the Court record by December 10, 2019 may result in the dismissal of that defendant from this case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/11/2019. (kbs)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(a)(1) states that "The court may issue a preliminary injunction only on notice to the adverse party." To date, the Defendants have not appeared and there is no evidence that Defendants have been served with the Complaint. Plaintiff may refile his Motion for Preliminary Injunction once at least one defendant has appeared in this action. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/11/2019. (kbs)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for all further proceedings. Motions referred to Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (bms)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC. (pcs) (Main Document 6 replaced on 9/10/2019) (pcs).
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to US Government (pcs)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 9/10/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS900006537 (pcs)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Randolph H. Guthrie, III. (pcs)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T Corp., An Luxury Imports of Palm Beach, Inc., Apple Inc., Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC, Baptist Health South Florida, Inc., Bethesda Hospital, Inc., CVS Caremark Corporation, City of New York, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Facebook, Inc., Federal Express Corp., Robert E. Hauberg, Jr, Hotwire Communications, LTD., IAC/Interactive Corp, Iconbrickell Condominium No. One Association, Inc., Iconbrickell Condominium No. Three Association, Inc., Iconbrickell Master Association, Inc., J & J Teq III, Corp., JFK Medical Center, Inc., Clarence Lee Lott, III, Park One of Florida, LLC, Richmond Healthcare, Inc., Riverside Park Community II, LLC, Riverside Park Community, LLC, TRG Brickell Point Hotel, LLC, The Related Group, US Government, United Parcel Service, Inc., University Of Miami, Urban American Management Corp, Walgreens Co., eHarmony.com. Filing fees $ 400.00, filed by Randolph H. Guthrie, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(pcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guthrie v. US Government et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park One of Florida, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside Park Community II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAC/Interactive Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban American Management Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: An Luxury Imports of Palm Beach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Caremark Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iconbrickell Condominium No. One Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & J Teq III, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence Lee Lott, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Health South Florida, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Hauberg, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Of Miami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richmond Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotwire Communications, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iconbrickell Condominium No. Three Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JFK Medical Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethesda Hospital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Related Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iconbrickell Master Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eHarmony.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRG Brickell Point Hotel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside Park Community, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph H. Guthrie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?