Philips North America LLC et al v. 626 Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Philips India Ltd., Philips North America LLC, Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Koninklijke Philips N.V. and Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd.
Defendant: 626 Holdings, Inc. and Alexander Kalish
Case Number: 9:2019cv81263
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William Matthewman
Referring Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 170 Unopposed MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Marcil, Michael)
September 24, 2020 Filing 169 NOTICE by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish re #128 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order Parties' Joint Notice (Marcil, Michael)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting #143 Defendants' Expedited Motion to Provide Attorneys Eyes Only Information to their Experts in Advance of the Expert Disclosure Deadline and granting in part and denying in part #126 Plaintiffs' Amended Motion to Compel Compliance with Electronic Discovery Orders Email Discovery Process. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 9/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza)
September 22, 2020 Filing 167 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman: The hearing was held by Zoom Video Teleconference with all parties. Motion Hearing by Zoom Video held on 9/22/2020 re #143 Defendant's EXPEDITED MOTION For Approval to Provide Confidential Materials to Experts in Advance of the Expert Disclosure Deadlines - Argument held - Court entered a ruling on the record - granting the motion - written order to be issued; #126 Plaintiffs' Amended MOTION to Compel Defendant's Compliance with the Electronic Discovery Orders Email Discovery Process - Argument held - the Court granted in part the motion - written order to be issued; #128 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order - Argument held - the Court took the matter under advisement - Joint Notice to be filed by Thursday, September 24, 2020 - written order to be issued. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 37 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Kirsten R. Rydstrom, Gerard M. Donovan and Doug McKnight for Plaintiffs; Michael Walter Marcil, John William Terwilleger, Jennifer Nicole for Defendants. (Digital 14:02:31) (kza)
September 22, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 166 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (751604)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #164 Unopposed Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 9/21/2020. (zsa)
September 21, 2020 Filing 164 Unopposed MOTION to Seal re DE 163 per Local Rule 5.4 by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Marcil, Michael)
September 21, 2020 Filing 163 REPLY to Response to Motion re #132 Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct #19 Answer to Complaint and Assert Counterclaim filed by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Marcil, Michael)
September 18, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 162 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (751604)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #160 Unopposed Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 9/18/2020. (zsa)
September 18, 2020 Filing 160 Unopposed MOTION to Seal re DE 159 per Local Rule 5.4 by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Marcil, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 159 NOTICE by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish re #145 Order,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,,, Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings,,, (Joint) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Marcil, Michael)
September 18, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 158 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1404964)
September 18, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 157 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1404964)
September 18, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 156 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1404964)
September 17, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 155 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (751604)
September 16, 2020 Filing 154 Clerks Notice to Filer re #152 Response in Support of Motion,. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see DE# 153 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas)
September 16, 2020 Filing 153 REPLY to Response to Motion re #143 Defendant's EXPEDITED MOTION For Approval to Provide Confidential Materials to Experts in Advance of the Expert Disclosure Deadlines filed by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. (See DE#152 for image). (jas)
September 16, 2020 Filing 152 RESPONSE in Support re #143 Defendant's EXPEDITED MOTION For Approval to Provide Confidential Materials to Experts in Advance of the Expert Disclosure Deadlines filed by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. (Marcil, Michael)
September 15, 2020 Filing 151 RESPONSE in Opposition re #143 Defendant's EXPEDITED MOTION For Approval to Provide Confidential Materials to Experts in Advance of the Expert Disclosure Deadlines filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. Replies due by 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kirsten R. Rydstrom, #2 Exhibit A - 2017 - 2018 Member Benefits_Updated, #3 Exhibit B - Cybersecurity Heatmap)(Kuleba, Christopher)
September 14, 2020 Filing 150 RESPONSE in Opposition re #132 Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct #19 Answer to Complaint and Assert Counterclaim /Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Leave to Amend their Affirmative Defenses and Assert Counterclaim [D.E. 132] filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. Replies due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_April 7, 2020 service email_REDACTED, #2 Exhibit B_ Deposition of Alexander Kalish, #3 Exhibit C_626s Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, Response to Interrogatory No. 3, #4 Exhibit D_Deposition of Philip Revien, #5 Exhibit E_May 14, 2020 email from G. Donovan to A. Beaulieu_REDACTED, #6 Exhibit F_626 marketing brochure)(Kuleba, Christopher)
September 10, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 149 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (751604)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #147 Unopposed Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 9/10/2020. (zsa)
September 10, 2020 Filing 147 Unopposed MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Alexander Kalish. (Marcil, Michael)
September 10, 2020 Filing 146 REPLY to Response to Motion re #128 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order filed by Alexander Kalish. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-MOL in Support of Motion To Quash Subpoena Served on Non-Party Dustin Zimmerman Or, In The Alternative, Motion for Modification/Protective Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Confidential)(Marcil, Michael)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER SETTING HEARING VIA ZOOM VIDEO TELECONFERENCE AND SETTING EXPEDITED BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DE #143 : Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #143 Defendant's EXPEDITED MOTION For Approval to Provide Confidential Materials to Experts in Advance of the Expert Disclosure Deadlines - (Response due by 9/15/2020 at 2:00 p.m., Reply due by 9/16/2020 at 2:00 p.m.); #126 Plaintiff's Amended MOTION to Compel Defendant's Compliance with the Electronic Discovery Orders and Email Discovery Process and #128 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order. ( Joint Notice Deadline 9/18/2020 by 12:00 p.m..), Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2020 at 2:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 9/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #123 Motion to Seal, which was replaced by an amended motion at #127 ; and granting #127 Unopposed Motion to Seal; granting #138 Unopposed Motion to Seal; granting #140 Unopposed Motion to Seal; granting #142 Unopposed Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 9/10/2020. (zsa)
September 9, 2020 Filing 143 Defendant's EXPEDITED MOTION For Approval to Provide Confidential Materials to Experts in Advance of the Expert Disclosure Deadlines by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 21)(Marcil, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Filing 142 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal /Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs_ Motion to File Under Seal) (Kuleba, Christopher)
September 9, 2020 Filing 141 REPLY to Response to Motion re #126 Amended MOTION to Compel Defendant's Compliance with the Electronic Discovery Orders Email Discovery Process /Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Amended Motion to Compel Defendants Compliance with Electronic Discovery Orders Email Discovery Process [D.E. 126] filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P - Kalish Rough Transcript, #2 Exhibit Q - Rochester General Log File Excerpts)(Kuleba, Christopher)
September 4, 2020 Filing 140 Unopposed MOTION to Seal re #139 per Local Rule 5.4 by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kuleba, Christopher)
September 4, 2020 Filing 139 RESPONSE in Opposition re #128 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. Replies due by 9/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Kuleba, Christopher)
September 3, 2020 Filing 138 Unopposed MOTION to Seal re [DE 137] per Local Rule 5.4 by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Marcil, Michael)
September 3, 2020 Filing 137 RESPONSE in Opposition re #126 Amended MOTION to Compel Defendant's Compliance with the Electronic Discovery Orders Email Discovery Process, filed by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. Replies due by 9/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Marcil, Michael)
September 3, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 136 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (751604)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Order granting #134 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (cbr)
September 1, 2020 Filing 134 Unopposed MOTION to Seal re [DE 132] per Local Rule 5.4 by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Marcil, Michael)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE AND EXTENSION OF SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES. Joint Motion for Continuance of Trial and Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines DE#129 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. All other deadlines remain the same. Expert Discovery due by 11/20/2020. Fact Discovery due by 9/29/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 11/27/2020. In Limine Motions due by 3/26/2021. Motions due by 3/26/2021. Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/26/2021. Calendar Call set for 4/20/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Smith. Jury Trial reset for 4/26/2021 before Judge Rodney Smith. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
August 31, 2020 Filing 132 Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct #19 Answer to Complaint and Assert Counterclaim by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. Responses due by 9/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Marcil, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #130 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney William R. Overend. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/31/2020. (cbn)
August 28, 2020 Filing 130 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William R. Overend. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13431869 by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. Responses due by 9/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification of William R. Overend, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice_William R. Overend)(Kuleba, Christopher)
August 28, 2020 Filing 129 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial and Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines re #69 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, #24 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. Responses due by 9/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Marcil, Michael)
August 28, 2020 Filing 128 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Marcil, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Filing 127 Amended MOTION to Seal /Plaintiffs' Unopposed Amended Motion to File Under Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Unopposed Amended Motion to File Under Seal) (Kuleba, Christopher)
August 27, 2020 Filing 126 Amended MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS COMPLIANCE WITH THE ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDERS EMAIL DISCOVERY PROCESS /PLAINTIFFS AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS COMPLIANCE WITH THE ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDERS EMAIL DISCOVERY PROCESS by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. Responses due by 9/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Alex Kalish Deposition Excerpts_SEALED, #2 Exhibit B - 2020-06-22 (Kalish) Fourth Supplemental ROGs, #3 Exhibit C - 626HOLDING00001008 (Jorge emails with Alex), #4 Exhibit D - Michael Fischer Deposition Excerpts_SEALED, #5 Exhibit E - METROPOLIS_INTERNATIONAL,_LLC_-_v._-_ALEXANDER_KALYUSH_-_Complaint, #6 Exhibit F- 2020-06-05 Philips Email Production Requests to 626 Holdings Inc. and Alexander Kalish, #7 Exhibit G - 2020-07-20_Defendants' Response and Objections to Plaintiffs' June 5 2020 Request for Email Production(12271197.1), #8 Exhibit H - 20200807 - R Graham email to Opp Counsel and coordinating, #9 Exhibit I - 20200817 R Graham email to J Nicole Regarding August 13 Meet and Confer, #10 Exhibit J - 20200818 - Email J Nicole to RS regarding hit counts, #11 Exhibit K - 20200821 R Graham email to J Nicole regarding August 19 m&C, #12 Exhibit L - 20200821 J. Nicole Email to R Graham Re Corrected Hitcounts, #13 Exhibit M - 20200825 Correspondence between R.Graham and J. Nicole_SEALED, #14 Exhibit N - 2020-08-26_Defendants' Amended Response and Objections to Plaintiffs' June 5 2020 Email Production Request(12271197.1) (002, #15 Exhibit O - Halperin Email with Certificates_SEALED)(Kuleba, Christopher)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER denying as moot #73 Defendants' Motion to Compel Similar Unauthorized Acts and granting in part and denying in part #105 Defendants' Motion to Compel Better Responses to Second Set of Interrogatories and Second Requests for Production. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 8/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 PAPERLESS ORDER DENYING #122 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. The Court's review of the motion indicates that it fails to comply with Local Rule 7.1(a)(3), which requires that a certificate of compliance with the rule be placed at the end of the motion above the signature block. Plaintiffs may file an amended motion, if necessary, after they comply with the requirements of Local Rule 7.1(a)(3). Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 8/27/2020. (zsa)
August 27, 2020 Filing 123 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal) (Kuleba, Christopher)
August 26, 2020 Filing 122 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS COMPLIANCE WITH THE ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDERS EMAIL DISCOVERY PROCESS /PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS COMPLIANCE WITH THE ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDERS EMAIL DISCOVERY PROCESS by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. Responses due by 9/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Alex Kalish Deposition Excerpts_SEALED, #2 Exhibit B - 2020-06-22 (Kalish) Fourth Supplemental ROGs, #3 Exhibit C - 626HOLDING00001008 (Jorge emails with Alex), #4 Exhibit D - Michael Fischer Deposition Excerpts_SEALED, #5 Exhibit E - METROPOLIS_INTERNATIONAL,_LLC_-_v._-_ALEXANDER_KALYUSH_-_Complaint, #6 Exhibit F- 2020-06-05 Philips Email Production Requests to 626 Holdings Inc. and Alexander Kalish, #7 Exhibit G - 2020-07-20_Defendants' Response and Objections to Plaintiffs' June 5 2020 Request for Email Production(12271197.1), #8 Exhibit H - 20200807 - R Graham email to Opp Counsel and coordinating, #9 Exhibit I - 20200817 R Graham email to J Nicole Regarding August 13 Meet and Confe, #10 Exhibit J - 20200818 - Email J Nicole to RS regarding hit counts, #11 Exhibit K - 20200821 R Graham email to J Nicole regarding August 19 m&C, #12 Exhibit L - 20200821 J. Nicole Email to R Graham Re Corrected Hitcounts, #13 Exhibit M - 20200825 Correspondence between R.Graham and J. Nicole_SEALED, #14 Exhibit N - 2020-08-26_Defendants' Amended Response and Objections to Plaintiffs' June 5 2020 Email Production Request(12271197.1) (002), #15 Exhibit O - Halperin Email with Certificates_SEALED)(Kuleba, Christopher)
August 24, 2020 Filing 121 Clerks Notice to Filer re 117 SEALED DOCUMENT 118 SEALED DOCUMENT; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. Filer selected a Motion event. *The document event and docket text was corrected by the Clerk. **It is not necessary to refile these document. (jmd)
August 21, 2020 Filing 120 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman: The Hearing was held by Zoom video conference with all parties. Motion Hearing by Zoom Video Teleconference held on 8/21/2020 re #73 Defendants' MOTION to Compel a Better Response to Interrogatories and #105 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Second Set of Interrogatories and Second Request for Production. Argument held. The Court entered rulings on the record. Better responses due by August 31, 2020. Written order to be issued. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 12 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Gerard M. Donovan for Plaintiffs, Jennifer Nicole for Defendants. (Digital 14:00:46) (kza)
August 21, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 119 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1404964)
August 20, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 118 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (751604)
August 20, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 117 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (751604)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #111 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Christopher R. Brennan. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/20/2020. (cbn)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #106 Motion to Seal ; granting #110 Motion to Seal; granting #113 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 8/20/2020. (zsa)
August 20, 2020 Filing 114 JOINT NOTICE in Compliance re 107 Order Setting Hearing and Requiring Joint Notice by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish (Marcil, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 113 Unopposed MOTION to Seal [DE 112] per Local Rule 5.4 by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Marcil, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 112 REPLY in Support re #105 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Second Set of Interrogatories and Second Request for Production filed by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Marcil, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 111 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christopher R. Brennan. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13377480 by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. Responses due by 9/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Christopher R. Brennan, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Christopher R. Brennan)(Kuleba, Christopher)
August 18, 2020 Filing 110 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Kuleba, Christopher)
August 18, 2020 Filing 109 RESPONSE in Opposition re #105 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Second Set of Interrogatories and Second Request for Production /Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Compel filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. Replies due by 8/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sealed Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Philips v Transtate Protective Order, #3 Exhibit C - Correspondence with Transtate defendants' counsel)(Kuleba, Christopher)
August 18, 2020 Filing 108 JOINT NOTICE re #104 Order Setting Hearing and Requiring Joint Notice by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. (Marcil, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 PAPERLESS ORDER ADDING MOTION TO HEARING AND SETTING EXPEDITED BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Upon review of Defendants' "Motion to Compel Better Responses to the Second Set of Interrogatories and the Second Set of Requests for Production" [DE 105], it is hereby ORDERED that said Motion [DE 105] shall be heard at the hearing previously scheduled for Friday, August 21, 2020, at 2:00 p.m., to take place via Zoom VTC. The Clerk of Court shall provide counsel with instructions for accessing the VTC. The Response to the Motion shall be due on or before August 18, 2020, at 9:00 p.m., and the Reply to the Response shall be due on or before August 19, 2020, at 9:00 p.m. The Court reiterates that it expects cooperation during the discovery process from parties and their counsel, and it will not hesitate to impose sanctions or cost-shifting per Rule 37 upon any party or counsel who persists in violating the letter or spirit of all discovery orders, rules, or takes an unreasonable discovery position. To that end, the Court directs that counsel shall further confer, either in person or by telephone, in good faith and for as long as necessary to address this additional discovery dispute. Thereafter, the parties shall file, on or before August 20, 2020, at 12:00 p.m. a Joint Notice advising whether the discovery dispute has been resolved, and if not, what specific issues remain for determination by the Court, and a brief recitation of the position of each party on the specific dispute. The deadline for this Joint Notice does not affect the deadline for the prior Joint Notice Ordered in DE 104. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 8/17/2020. (zsa)
August 14, 2020 Filing 106 Unopposed MOTION to Seal [DE 105] per Local Rule 5.4 by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Marcil, Michael)
August 14, 2020 Filing 105 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Second Set of Interrogatories and Second Request for Production by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. Responses due by 8/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Marcil, Michael)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER SETTING HEARING AND REQUIRING JOINT NOTICE: (Joint Notice Deadline 8/18/2020.), Set Hearing as to #73 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Similar Unauthorized Acts. (Motion Hearing via Zoom Video Teleconference set for 8/21/2020 at 2:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 8/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza)
August 2, 2020 Filing 103 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 7/6/20 before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman, 1-25 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/24/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2020. (hh)
August 2, 2020 Filing 102 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 6/26/20 before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman, 1-28 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/24/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2020. (hh)
July 15, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 101 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (751604)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 PAPERLESS ORDER Granting [DE 99] Motion to Seal. Defendants' Motion to File Under Seal is GRANTED. Defendants are hereby given leave to file Exhibits 1 and 2 to their Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel under seal. The sealed materials shall remain under seal until further Court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 7/15/2020. (zsa)
July 14, 2020 Filing 99 Defendant's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Marcil, Michael)
July 14, 2020 Filing 98 REPLY to Response to Motion re #73 MOTION to Compel a Better Response to Interrogatories filed by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Marcil, Michael)
July 13, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 97 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1404964)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #95 Motion to Seal. Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are hereby given leave to file Exhibits A, C and E to their Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Better Interrogatory Responses under seal. The sealed materials shall remain under seal until further Court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 7/13/2020. (zsa)
July 9, 2020 Filing 95 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kuleba, Christopher)
July 9, 2020 Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition re #73 MOTION to Compel a Better Response to Interrogatories filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. Replies due by 7/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Confidential Document, #2 Exhibit B - May 14 Email, #3 Exhibit C - Confidential Document, #4 Exhibit D - June 1 Email, #5 Exhibit E - Confidential Document)(Kuleba, Christopher)
July 8, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Kent Osborne on behalf of 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish (Osborne, Jonathan)
July 8, 2020 Filing 92 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John William Terwilleger on behalf of 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish (Terwilleger, John)
July 8, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Nicole on behalf of 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish (Nicole, Jennifer)
July 8, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Walter Marcil on behalf of 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish (Marcil, Michael)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 PAPERLESS ORDER Granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery [DE 80]. After conducting a hearing via Zoom VTC on July 6, 2020, the Court hereby enters the following deadlines for the production of written discovery responses and responsive documents. All passwords necessary to decrypt Defendants' documents shall be produced on or before July 13, 2020. The ESI protocol and hit reports shall be produced on or before July 20, 2020. All remaining discovery outlined in Defendants' Motion shall be produced on or before July 29, 2020. The Court notes that discovery needs to move expeditiously, without overbroad and vague discovery requests or objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 7/7/2020. (zsa)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #86 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' Motion to Compel [D.E. 73] is due on or before July 9, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 7/7/2020. (zsa)
July 6, 2020 Filing 88 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman: Motion Hearing by Zoom Video Teleconference held on 7/6/2020 re #80 Defendants' MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery. Argument held. The Court granted the motion in part. Written order to be issued. Total time in court: 32 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Gerard M. Donovan for Plaintiffs, Andrew Edward Beaulieu, Jennifer Nicole and Michael Walter Marcil for Defendants. (Digital 15:02:16) (kza)
July 6, 2020 Filing 86 MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline to Respond to Defendants Motion to Compel re #73 MOTION to Compel a Better Response to Interrogatories by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. Responses due by 7/20/2020 (Kuleba, Christopher)
July 6, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Kent Osborne on behalf of 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. Attorney Jonathan Kent Osborne added to party 626 Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Kent Osborne added to party Alexander Kalish(pty:dft). (Osborne, Jonathan)
July 6, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Nicole on behalf of 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. Attorney Jennifer Nicole added to party 626 Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Nicole added to party Alexander Kalish(pty:dft). (Nicole, Jennifer)
July 6, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John William Terwilleger on behalf of 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. Attorney John William Terwilleger added to party 626 Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John William Terwilleger added to party Alexander Kalish(pty:dft). (Terwilleger, John)
July 6, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Walter Marcil on behalf of 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. Attorney Michael Walter Marcil added to party 626 Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Walter Marcil added to party Alexander Kalish(pty:dft). (Marcil, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #80 MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Defendants' Second Set of Discovery Requests : The Court has carefully reviewed [DE 80] Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery. In light of the fact that the due date for the referenced discovery is July 6, 2020, and due to the continuing discovery disputes in this case, a hearing on Defendants' Motion [DE 80] shall be held via Zoom VTC on Monday, July 6, 2020, at 3:00 p.m. The Clerk of Court shall furnish via email instructions for access the hearing to counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 7/2/2020. (zsa)
July 2, 2020 Filing 80 MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Defendants' Second Set of Discovery Requests by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. Responses due by 7/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence from Counsel, #2 Exhibit E-Mail Production Requests to Defendants, #3 Exhibit Second RFP to A. Kalish, #4 Exhibit Second RFP to 626 Holdings, #5 Exhibit Second Interrogatories to A. Kalish, #6 Exhibit Second Interrogatories to 626 Holdings, #7 Exhibit Good Faith Conferral Correspondence, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Beaulieu, Andrew)
June 29, 2020 Filing 79 Clerks Notice to Filer re #76 Notice (Other),. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see DE# 78 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas)
June 26, 2020 Filing 78 MEDIATION REPORT by Richard Suarez. Disposition: Case did not settle.(See DE#76 for image). (jas)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS [DE 62] AND MEMORIALIZING FURTHER DISCOVERY RULINGS: denying #62 Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 6/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza)
June 26, 2020 Filing 76 Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Mediator's Report by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC re #75 Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Mediator's Report) (Kuleba, Christopher) Text Modified on 6/29/2020 (ail).
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 7/6/2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
June 26, 2020 Filing 74 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman: Motion Hearing by Zoom Video teleconference held on 6/26/2020 re #62 Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions for Defendants Failure to Comply with this Courts March 13 Order (DE 46). Argument held. The Court ruling entered on the record denying the motion. Written order to be issued. Total time in court: 37 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Kirsten R. Rydstrom, Gerard M. Donovan and Douglas McKnight for Plaintiffs; Andrew Edward Beaulieu and Joshua Shore for Defendants. (Digital 14:02:02) (kza)
June 25, 2020 Filing 73 MOTION to Compel a Better Response to Interrogatories by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. Responses due by 7/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defs' First Set of Interrogatories to D, #2 Exhibit Correspondence with opposing counsel)(Beaulieu, Andrew)
June 23, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE of Filing Status of Discovery Dispute and Whether It Has Been Resolved by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC re 67 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, Set/Reset Hearings, #62 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions /Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions for Defendants Failure to Comply with this Courts March 13 Order (DE 46) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law /Joint Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 626's Third Supplemental Responses to Philips' First Set of Rogs, #2 Exhibit B - Kalish's Third Supplemental Responses to Philips' First set of Rogs, #3 Exhibit C - Email memorializing May 26 call, #4 Exhibit D - Kalish's Fourth Supplemental Responses to Philips' First Set of Rogs, #5 Exhibit E - 626's Supplemental Resposes to Philips First Set of RFPs, #6 Exhibit F - Email to Philips Counsel) (Kuleba, Christopher)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #70 Motion for Extension of Time. The Parties shall have until Tuesday, June 23, 2020 to submit the Joint Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 6/18/2020. (zsa)
June 18, 2020 Filing 70 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File Joint Notice re 67 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, Set/Reset Hearings, by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. Responses due by 7/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beaulieu, Andrew)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING IN PART JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINESre DE#68 Motion for Extension of Time. Expert Discovery due by 10/20/2020. Fact Discovery due by 9/8/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/30/2020. In Limine Motions due by 10/30/2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
June 11, 2020 Filing 68 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. Responses due by 6/25/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beaulieu, Andrew)
June 8, 2020 Reset Hearing: Zoom Discovery Hearing originally scheduled for June 23, 2020, is hereby reset to June 26, 2020, at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman. All other deadlines remain in effect. The Clerk of Court shall email counsel instructions for accessing the hearing via Zoom video conference. (zsa)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #62 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions /Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions for Defendants Failure to Comply with this Courts March 13 Order (DE 46) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law :( After careful review of the Motion, and because the parties are unable to resolve this matter without Court intervention, it is hereby ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion [DE 62] will be conducted via Zoom video conference on June 23, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. The Clerk of Court shall email instructions for accessing the conference to counsel. Further, in advance of the scheduled hearing, the Court directs that counsel for the parties shall further confer, either in person or by telephone, in good faith and for as long as necessary to address the pending dispute. Thereafter, the parties shall file, on or before June 18, 2020, a Joint Notice advising whether the dispute has been resolved, and if not, what specific issues remain for determination by the Court and a brief recitation of the position of each party. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 5/29/2020. (zsa)
May 28, 2020 Filing 66 JOINT NOTICE Regarding Discovery by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC re 65 Order, (Kuleba, Christopher)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 PAPERLESS ORDER. Upon review of Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions [DE 62] and Defendants' response [DE 64], the Court will hold the Motion for Sanctions in abeyance for ten days to allow Defendants a final chance to fully comply with their discovery obligations. Defendants shall fully comply on or before May 25, 2020. Thereafter, on or before May 28, 2020, the parties shall file a Joint Notice stating whether Defendants have fully complied with their discovery obligations, or whether further Court intervention is needed. The discovery cut off date in this case is July 8, 2020, [DE 24], and the parties must be diligent in their discovery efforts and conduct in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 5/14/2020. (zsa)
May 13, 2020 Filing 64 RESPONSE in Opposition re #62 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions for Defendants Failure to Comply with this Courts March 13 Order (DE 46) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. Replies due by 5/20/2020. (Beaulieu, Andrew)
May 8, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Compliance by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 626 Holdings' Third Supplemental Responses to Ps' RFPs, #2 Exhibit A. Kalish Third Supplemental Responses to RFPs, #3 Exhibit A. Kalish Fourth Supplemental Responses to Ps' RFPs) (Beaulieu, Andrew)
April 29, 2020 Filing 62 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions for Defendants Failure to Comply with this Courts March 13 Order (DE 46) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 626 Second Supplemental Responses to Philips' First Set of Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B - Kalish's Second Supplemental Responses to Philips' First Set of Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit C - Kalish Amended Second Supplemental Responses to Philips' First Set of Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit D - Correspondence re defendants' second supplemental interrogatory responses, #5 Exhibit E - Correspondence re scheduling meet and confer)(Kuleba, Christopher)
April 23, 2020 Filing 61 Clerks Notice to Filer re #60 Notice (Other). Docket Text Does Not Match Document; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter a title in the docket text that matches the title of the document. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile the document. (jas)
April 23, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE About Rolling Production by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish re 59 Order on Motion to Produce,, (Beaulieu, Andrew) Modified text on 4/24/2020 (jas).
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #55 Motion to Produce Documents on a Rolling Basis. All production by the Defendants shall be completed on or before May 8, 2020. In the interim, on April 23, 2020, Defendants shall file a Notice reporting on their progress in producing the documents, and detailing what remains to be produced. Further, on or before May 8, 2020, Defendants shall file a Final Notice stating whether production is complete and in compliance with this Order. The Court wants no further delays in production, and requires full and complete production in a timely manner. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 4/9/2020. (zsa)
April 8, 2020 Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion re #55 MOTION to Produce Documents on a Rolling Basis filed by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. (Beaulieu, Andrew)
April 2, 2020 Filing 57 RESPONSE to Motion re #55 MOTION to Produce Documents on a Rolling Basis /Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Produce Documents on a Rolling Basis filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. Replies due by 4/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Emails between counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order on Defendants' Motion to Produce Documents on a Rolling Basis)(Kuleba, Christopher)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PAPERLESS ORDER directing Plaintiffs to respond to #55 Defendants' Motion to Produce Documents on a Rolling Basis on or before Monday, April 6, 2020. Defendants' reply thereto, if any, is due on or before Wednesday, April 8, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 4/2/2020. (zsa)
March 31, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION to Produce Documents on a Rolling Basis by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beaulieu, Andrew)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY, Motions terminated: #53 Joint MOTION for Entry of Order Regarding Electronic Discovery filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips North America LLC, Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 3/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
March 25, 2020 Filing 53 Joint MOTION for Entry of Order Regarding Electronic Discovery by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Joint Proposed Order Regarding Electronic Discovery)(Kuleba, Christopher)
March 24, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Mediation Hearing. /Notice of Mediation Mediation Hearing set for 6/17/2020 at 9:30 a.m.. (Kuleba, Christopher)
March 24, 2020 Reset Deadlines Per DE#51. Mediation Deadline 6/30/2020. (cqs)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #50 Joint Motion for Extension of Mediation Deadline. The mediation deadline is extended until June 30, 2020. The parties shall file a new Notice of Mediation by March 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/24/2020. (cbn)
March 23, 2020 Filing 50 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Mediation Deadline by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. Responses due by 4/6/2020 (Kuleba, Christopher)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #48 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall produce to Plaintiffs the documents and information required by the Court's March 13, 2020 Order on or before March 27, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman (erz)
March 17, 2020 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responses in accordance with this Court's Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. Attorney Andrew Edward Beaulieu added to party 626 Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Edward Beaulieu added to party Alexander Kalish(pty:dft). Responses due by 3/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beaulieu, Andrew)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #32 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. In light of #33 Plaintiffs' Notice of Striking, it is hereby ORDERED that #32 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman (erz)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #31 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part #34 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Joint Notice due on or before March 23, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 3/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #30 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. In light of the parties' Joint Notice #43 in which the parties stated that they both agreed that their #30 Joint Motion for Extension of Time is now moot, the motion is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman (erz)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PAPERLESS ORDER. The Court has reviewed #42 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Appear Telephonically. In the motion, Plaintiffs' pro hac vice counsel requests permission to attend the hearing previously scheduled for March 11, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. telephonically. In the motion, Plaintiffs' counsel states that Plaintiffs' local counsel, Christopher Kuleba, Esq., will attend the March 11, 2020 hearing in person. However, the Court received a telephone call from Mr. Kuleba this morning informing the Court that Mr. Kuleba had possibly been exposed to the COVID-19 virus and would not be able to attend the hearing. Mr. Kuleba has not yet filed any motion to appear telephonically. In light of the inability of Plaintiffs' counsel to attend the March 11, 2020 hearing in person, it is hereby ORDERED that the March 11, 2020 hearing is CANCELLED and #42 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Appear Telephonically is DENIED AS MOOT. The Court will rule on the pending discovery motions on the papers. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman (erz)
March 9, 2020 Filing 43 JOINT NOTICE by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC re #35 Order,,,, Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings,,, Joint Notice (Kuleba, Christopher) Modified text on 3/10/2020 (jas).
March 9, 2020 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at 3/11/20 Hearing . Attorney/Representative: Gerard M. Donovan by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. Responses due by 3/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kuleba, Christopher)
March 2, 2020 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #34 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories /Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F - 626 Supplemental Responses to First ROGS, #2 Exhibit G - Kalish Supplemental Responses to First ROGS, #3 Exhibit H - 626 Supplemental Resposes to First RFPs, #4 Exhibit I - Kalish Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' First RFP)(Kuleba, Christopher)
February 28, 2020 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Request for Production /Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' First Requests for Production filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F - Declaration of Gerard Donovan, #2 Exhibit G - Email chain between G. Donovan and A. Beaulieu)(Kuleba, Christopher)
February 27, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories filed by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. Replies due by 3/5/2020. (Shore, Joshua)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ADDING MOTION TO MARCH 11, 2020 DISCOVERY HEARING: Set Hearing as to #30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Motions Concerning Plaintiffs' First Sets of Interrogatories and First Requests for Production.( Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2020 at 2:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 2/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza)
February 25, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Request for Production filed by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. Replies due by 3/3/2020. (Shore, Joshua)
February 25, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Shore on behalf of 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. Attorney Joshua Shore added to party 626 Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Shore added to party Alexander Kalish(pty:dft). (Shore, Joshua)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PENDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS: Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #31 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Request for Production - Response due by 2/25/2020, If Plaintiffs wish to reply to Defendants' response, they may do so within 3 days of its filing and #34 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories - Response due by 2/27/2020 - If Plaintiffs wish to reply to Defendants' response, they may do so within 3 days of its filing - Joint Notice due on or before Monday, 3/9/2020 - Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2020 at 2:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 2/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza)
February 20, 2020 Filing 34 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. Responses due by 3/5/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to 626 Holdings, #2 Exhibit B_626 Holdings Unverified Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit C_Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Alexander Kalish, #4 Exhibit D_Alexander Kalish Unverified Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit E _2020-02-10 Letter re_deficiences with defendants initial discovery responses)(Kuleba, Christopher)
February 20, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Striking #32 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips North America LLC, Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd. by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC (Kuleba, Christopher)
February 18, 2020 Filing 32 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. Responses due by 3/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to 626 Holdings, #2 Exhibit B_626 Holdings Unverified Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit C_Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Alexander Kalish, #4 Exhibit D_Alexander Kalish Unverified Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit E _2020-02-10 Letter re_deficiences with defendants initial discovery responses)(Kuleba, Christopher)
February 18, 2020 Filing 31 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Request for Production by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. Responses due by 3/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Plaintiff's First Request for Production to 626 Holdings, #2 Exhibit B_626 Holdings Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Request for Production, #3 Exhibit C_ Plaintiffs First Request for Production to Alexander Kalish, #4 Exhibit D_ Alexander Kalish Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Request for Production, #5 Exhibit E _2020-02-10 Letter re_deficiences with defendants initial discovery responses)(Kuleba, Christopher)
February 18, 2020 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Motions Concerning Plaintiffs' First Sets of Interrogatories and First Requests for Production by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. Responses due by 3/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Joint Motion for Extension of Time)(Kuleba, Christopher)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER: granting #28 Joint Motion for Entry of a Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 2/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza)
February 5, 2020 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Entry of a Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order)(Kuleba, Christopher)
January 30, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. /Notice of Scheduling Mediation Selected/Added Richard Suarez as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 04/07/2020 at 9:30 a.m.. (Kuleba, Christopher)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 12/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (kza)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER OF REFERRAL to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 5/1/2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 12/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 3/15/2021 before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 3/9/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2020., Expert Discovery due by 9/25/2020., Fact Discovery due by 7/8/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2020., Mediation Deadline 5/1/2020., In Limine Motions due by 2/12/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 10/12/2020., Motions due by 2/12/2021., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/12/2021), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 12/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
November 27, 2019 Filing 23 Clerks Notice to Filer re #21 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement,. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties. (jas)
November 27, 2019 Filing 22 Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC (Kuleba, Christopher)
November 27, 2019 Filing 21 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC (Kuleba, Christopher)
November 27, 2019 Filing 20 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Kuleba, Christopher)
November 22, 2019 Filing 19 Defendants' ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. (Narula, Anthony)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #17 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendants shall file their response by November 22, 2019. No further extensions shall be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Additionally, in all future motions, Defendants shall make a better attempt to comply with Local Rule 7.1(a)(3). Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/5/2019. (cbn)
November 5, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Narula, Anthony)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall file their response by November 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/10/2019. (cbn)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. Attorney Anthony Vicken Narula added to party 626 Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony Vicken Narula added to party Alexander Kalish(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Narula, Anthony)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Gerard M. Donovan. Mr. Donovan is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Plaintiffs for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Donovan at GDonovan@reedsmith.com. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/3/2019. (cbn)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Richard A. Graham. Mr. Graham is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Plaintiffs for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Graham at RGraham@reedsmith.com. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/3/2019. (cbn)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Kirsten R. Rydstrom. Ms. Rydstrom shall be permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Plaintiffs for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Ms. Rydstrom at krydstrom@reedsmith.com. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/3/2019. (cbn)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gerard M. Donovan. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12028051 by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. Responses due by 10/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Gerard M. Donovan, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice for Gerard M. Donovan)(Kuleba, Christopher)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Richard A. Graham. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12028024 by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. Responses due by 10/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification for Richard Graham, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice for Richard Graham)(Kuleba, Christopher)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kirsten R. Rydstrom. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12027972 by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. Responses due by 10/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification for Kirsten Rydstrom, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice for Kirsten Rydstrom)(Kuleba, Christopher)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips North America LLC, Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd.. Alexander Kalish served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (Kuleba, Christopher)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/27/2019 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips North America LLC, Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd.. 626 Holdings, Inc. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Kuleba, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Kirsten R. Rydstrom, Richard A. Graham and Gerard M. Donovan, mailing date September 13, 2019, (pt)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, EXHIBITS AND AO 121 MAILED OUT). (ebz)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 626 Holdings, Inc., Alexander Kalish. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ebz)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11979181, filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips North America LLC, Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) to 626 Holdings, Inc., #3 Summon(s) to Alexander Kalish, #4 Exhibit A to Complaint)(Kuleba, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philips North America LLC et al v. 626 Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 626 Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Vicken Narula
Represented By: Jennifer Nicole
Represented By: Jonathan Kent Osborne
Represented By: John William Terwilleger
Represented By: Joshua Shore
Represented By: Andrew Edward Beaulieu
Represented By: Michael Walter Marcil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Kalish
Represented By: Anthony Vicken Narula
Represented By: Jennifer Nicole
Represented By: Jonathan Kent Osborne
Represented By: John William Terwilleger
Represented By: Joshua Shore
Represented By: Andrew Edward Beaulieu
Represented By: Michael Walter Marcil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips India Ltd.
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Kuleba
Represented By: Richard A. Graham
Represented By: Kirsten R. Rydstrom
Represented By: Gerard M. Donovan
Represented By: Christopher R. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips North America LLC
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Kuleba
Represented By: Richard A. Graham
Represented By: Kirsten R. Rydstrom
Represented By: Gerard M. Donovan
Represented By: Christopher R. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Kuleba
Represented By: Richard A. Graham
Represented By: Kirsten R. Rydstrom
Represented By: Gerard M. Donovan
Represented By: Christopher R. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V.
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Kuleba
Represented By: Richard A. Graham
Represented By: Kirsten R. Rydstrom
Represented By: Gerard M. Donovan
Represented By: Christopher R. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koninklijke Philips N.V.
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Kuleba
Represented By: Richard A. Graham
Represented By: Kirsten R. Rydstrom
Represented By: Gerard M. Donovan
Represented By: Christopher R. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd.
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Kuleba
Represented By: Richard A. Graham
Represented By: Kirsten R. Rydstrom
Represented By: Gerard M. Donovan
Represented By: Christopher R. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?