Zahreciyan et al v. MACY'S FLORIDA STORES, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Zahreciyan and Michael P. Zahreciyan
Defendant: Macy's Credit and Customer Services, Inc. and MACY'S FLORIDA STORES, LLC.
Case Number: 9:2019cv81273
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MACY'S FLORIDA STORES, LLC., Macy's Credit and Customer Services, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate MACYS RETAIL HOLDINGS, INC., Other Affiliate Macy's, Inc. for MACY'S FLORIDA STORES, LLC., Macy's Credit and Customer Services, Inc. (Hooker, Valerie)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by MACY'S FLORIDA STORES, LLC., Macy's Credit and Customer Services, Inc.. (Hooker, Valerie)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Rene E. Thorne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 10/22/2019. (kry)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Rene E. Thorne, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12085400 by MACY'S FLORIDA STORES, LLC., Macy's Credit and Customer Services, Inc.. Responses due by 11/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Hooker, Valerie)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by MACY'S FLORIDA STORES, LLC., Macy's Credit and Customer Services, Inc. (Hooker, Valerie)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 10/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
October 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Jury Trial set for 9/28/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 9/23/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 8/26/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), Order of Court-Mandated Requirements in ERISA case, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint. Defendants shall file a responsive pleading or a responsive motion to Plaintiffs' Complaint by 10/22/2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/4/2019. (hhn)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by MACY'S FLORIDA STORES, LLC., Macy's Credit and Customer Services, Inc.. Attorney Valerie Lorraine Hooker added to party MACY'S FLORIDA STORES, LLC.(pty:dft), Attorney Valerie Lorraine Hooker added to party Macy's Credit and Customer Services, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order granting unopposed motion for extension)(Hooker, Valerie)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MACY'S FLORIDA STORES, LLC., Macy's Credit and Customer Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ebz)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MACY'S FLORIDA STORES, LLC., Macy's Credit and Customer Services, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11986767, filed by Michael P. Zahreciyan, Michael P. Zahreciyan and Arthur Zahreciyan as PR of Estate of Armenoui Zahreciyan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Thomas, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zahreciyan et al v. MACY'S FLORIDA STORES, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Zahreciyan
Represented By: Charles Dominic Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P. Zahreciyan
Represented By: Charles Dominic Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's Credit and Customer Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACY'S FLORIDA STORES, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?