Henry-Bey v. Castro et al
Plaintiff: Michael Anthony Henry-Bey
Defendant: Carmela Bautisa, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Hector Castro, Sherwood Lakes Homeowners Association, Inc., Bank of America Home Loans, Maxim Properties and The Bank of New York Mellon
Consolidated Defendant: PETER MORRIS ARMOLD
Case Number: 9:2019cv81281
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals Federal Circuit re #11 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz) Modified text bon 11/6/2019 (apz).
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Michael Anthony Henry-Bey re #11 Notice of Appeal. (apz)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Michael Anthony Henry-Bey. (apz)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appeal as to 10 Order on Motion to Vacate, Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge, by Michael Anthony Henry-Bey. IFP Filed. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Federal Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (apz) Modified text on 11/6/2019 (apz).
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER striking #9 Motion to Vacate; Motion to Disqualify Judge. Pursuant to the Court's Order at docket entry #8 , filings by Petitioner in this case which are not submitted by an attorney admitted to practice before this Court will be immediately stricken. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/16/2019. (hhn)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 **STRICKEN** MOTION to Vacate #8 Order on Motion to Dismiss ( Responses due by 10/25/2019), MOTION to Disqualify Judge by Michael Anthony Henry-Bey. (ail) Text Modified on 10/17/2019 per DE 10 ORDER (ail).
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Striking Petition to Confirm Final Arbitration Award, And Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Petition (Complaint) to Enforce/Compel Arbitration by Carmela Bautisa, Hector Castro. Responses due by 10/22/2019 (Armold, Peter)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Agnieszka Natalia Chiapperini on behalf of Sherwood Lakes Homeowners Association, Inc.. Attorney Agnieszka Natalia Chiapperini added to party Sherwood Lakes Homeowners Association, Inc.(pty:dft). (Chiapperini, Agnieszka)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter M. Armold on behalf of Carmela Bautisa, Hector Castro, PETER MORRIS ARMOLD. Attorney Peter M. Armold added to party Carmela Bautisa(pty:dft), Attorney Peter M. Armold added to party Hector Castro(pty:dft), Attorney Peter M. Armold added to party PETER MORRIS ARMOLD(pty:condft). (Armold, Peter)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Michael Anthony Henry-Bey to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: Apus197271@yahoo.com (mee)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 9/18/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS900006546 (mee)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 Petition to Confirm Final Arbitration Award (Complaint). Filing fee $400.00. Receipt#: FLS900006546, filed by Michael Anthony Henry-Bey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry-Bey v. Castro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmela Bautisa
Represented By: Peter M. Armold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Castro
Represented By: Peter M. Armold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherwood Lakes Homeowners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Agnieszka Natalia Chiapperini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Home Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxim Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Anthony Henry-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: PETER MORRIS ARMOLD
Represented By: Peter M. Armold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?