Gentry et al v. Avco Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Troy Lee Gentry and Angela K Gentry
Defendant: Avco Corporation, Avstar Fuel Systems, Lycoming Engines, Avstart Fuel Systems, Inc. and AVCO Lycoming-Textron Williamsport
Case Number: 9:2019cv81296
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay re #10 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by Angela K Gentry, Troy Lee Gentry. Responses due by 11/29/2019 (Bigman, Jeffrey)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Angela K Gentry, Troy Lee Gentry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Bigman, Jeffrey)
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Avco Corporation (O'Flanagan, John)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Avco Corporation. Replies due by 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(O'Flanagan, John)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by Angela K Gentry, Troy Lee Gentry. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit)(Bigman, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Avco Corporation. (Justice, Petra)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): AVCO Lycoming-Textron Williamsport. (O'Flanagan, John)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF. Parties/Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties/mediator. (ls)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Avco Corporation, Lycoming Engines Notice of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'Flanagan, John)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed (O'Flanagan, John)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (amb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (amb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12003051, filed by Lycoming Engines, Avco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Justice, Petra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gentry et al v. Avco Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avco Corporation
Represented By: Petra Louise Justice
Represented By: Louis Robert Bourgeois
Represented By: John P. O'Flanagan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avstar Fuel Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lycoming Engines
Represented By: Petra Louise Justice
Represented By: Louis Robert Bourgeois
Represented By: John P. O'Flanagan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avstart Fuel Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Petra Louise Justice
Represented By: Louis Robert Bourgeois
Represented By: John P. O'Flanagan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVCO Lycoming-Textron Williamsport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Lee Gentry
Represented By: Jeffrey Errol Bigman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela K Gentry
Represented By: Jeffrey Errol Bigman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?