Scott et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Plaintiff: Norman Scott and Jacqueline Scott
Defendant: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY
Case Number: 9:2019cv81396
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT and Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY. (cds)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 10/15/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS900006596 (cds)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY. Filing fee $ 400.00, (Not Paid/No IFP) filed by Jacqueline Scott, Norman Scott. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(cds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?