Savasir v. Cintas Corporate Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ahmet Savasir
Defendant: Cintas Corporate Services, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv81506
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:0451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Stay; granting #5 Motion to Dismiss this Case Pending Arbitration; Compelling Parties to Arbitrate Plaintiff's Claims; Dismissing Action; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Defendant's MOTION to Stay or Alternatively Dismiss this Case Pending Arbitration and Memorandum of Law In Support. Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (ls)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Ahmet Savasir of Filing Non-Objection to Defendant's Motion to Stay, or, Alternatively, Dismiss this Case Pending Arbitration (Storch, Noah) Modified Text on 11/21/2019 (ls).
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon for Scheduling Order, and Setting Trial Date ( Calendar Call set for 7/15/2020 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING EXPEDITED BRIEFING. In light of the nature of Defendant's Motion to Stay or Alternatively Dismiss this Case Pending Arbitration (DE #5 ), the Court ORDERS expedited briefing on the Motion. Plaintiff must file any response to Defendant's Motion by November 20, 2019. I encourage the Parties to make additional reasonable efforts to confer and resolve the dispute at issue. If the Parties resolve the dispute at issue in Defendant's Motion, they must promptly notify the Court. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/14/2019. (kal)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's MOTION to Stay or Alternatively by Cintas Corporate Services, Inc.. Responses due by 11/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Thompson, Laurie). Added MOTION to Dismiss this Case Pending Arbitration on 11/21/2019 (ls).
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Cintas Corporate Services, Inc. re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case Notice of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Thompson, Laurie)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (amb)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Palm Beach) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12126216, filed by Cintas Corporate Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thompson, Laurie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savasir v. Cintas Corporate Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cintas Corporate Services, Inc.
Represented By: Laurie Ann Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmet Savasir
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?