Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Co. v. Shenzhen Unit Pack Power Technology Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Co.
Defendant: Shenzhen Unit Pack Power Technology Co., Ltd., Panasonic Corporation and California Ebike, LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv81535
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying as moot #6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue Trial and Deadlines filed by Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Co. Any pending Motions are Denied as Moot, Closing Case.. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 12/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue Trial and Deadlines by Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Co.. Responses due by 12/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Martenak, Jonathan)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: (Amended Pleadings due by 1/13/2020., Discovery due by 4/27/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 1/13/2020., In Limine Motions due by 5/11/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 5/11/2020., Motions due by 5/11/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/22/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 11/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 7/15/2020 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to California Ebike, LLC, Panasonic Corporation, Shenzhen Unit Pack Power Technology Co., Ltd.. (amb)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against California Ebike, LLC, Panasonic Corporation, Shenzhen Unit Pack Power Technology Co., Ltd.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12137830, filed by Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Co. as subrogee of Elijah Oliphant and Sharon Oliphant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Exhibit)(Martenak, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Co. v. Shenzhen Unit Pack Power Technology Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Unit Pack Power Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Ebike, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Alyson Nicole Holob
Represented By: Etta Mills
Represented By: Demetra Ruth Halmoukos
Represented By: Jonathan D. Martenak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?