Miller v. Inch
Plaintiff: Patrick Alan Miller
Defendant: Mark S. Inch
Case Number: 9:2019cv81565
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 APPENDIX to #9 Appendix, #8 Response to Order to Show Cause by Mark S. Inch (Attachments: #1 Transcripts, #2 Transcripts)(Worthy, Anesha)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 APPENDIX to #8 Response to Order to Show Cause by Mark S. Inch (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Worthy, Anesha)
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Mark S. Inch. (Worthy, Anesha)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 12/16/2019 in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number FLS100200055. (vt)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anesha Worthy on behalf of Mark S. Inch. Attorney Anesha Worthy added to party Mark S. Inch(pty:dft). (Worthy, Anesha)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254. On or before forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order, Respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this Petition should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 12/16/2019. Motions due by 12/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (pcs)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00 Not Paid/No IFP., filed by Patrick Alan Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(pcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Inch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S. Inch
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Represented By: Anesha Worthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Alan Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?