Littman et al v. AIG Property Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Robert Littman and Roslyn Littman
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Case Number: 9:2019cv81576
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Scheduling conference set for January 23, 2020 at 10:30 A.M. in West Palm Beach Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon, Courtroom 3, 4th Floor. Counsel shall appear in person. Any motions to modify the existing trial date should be filed prior to the scheduling conference. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)s conference report requirement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 1/16/2020. (spe)
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 Joint Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by AIG Property Casualty Company (Medeiros, Crystalin)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by AIG Property Casualty Company (Medeiros, Crystalin)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon for Scheduling Conference, and Setting Trial Date. ( Calendar Call set for 7/29/2020 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Jury Trial set for 8/3/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Medeiros, Crystalin)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part #4 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant removed Plaintiffs' lawsuit to this Court on November 20, 2019, making Defendant's response to the Complaint due by November 27, 2019. (See DE #1 ). In the present Motion, Defendant requests for this deadline to be extended by two weeks because Defendant's counsel "is currently pending receipt of the claim file documentation necessary to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint." (DE #4 at 1). I find good cause to grant the requested extension in part. Defendant is directed to file its response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by December 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/27/2019. (kal)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Medeiros, Crystalin)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Garrick Ferguson, mailing date November 20, 2019, (cco)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Damages) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12164645, filed by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Medeiros, Crystalin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Littman et al v. AIG Property Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Littman
Represented By: Garrick Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roslyn Littman
Represented By: Garrick Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By: Steven Charles Teebagy
Represented By: Crystalin C Medeiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?