Hainsworth v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christian Hainsworth
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. and David Roman
Case Number: 9:2019cv81634
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #3 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,. US Mail returned for: Joshua Evan Orlan. Updated address found and document resent to new address. Hamilton, Miller & Birthisel LLP150 SE 2nd AveMiami, FL 33131-1518 (mp)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., David Roman (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Final Order of Dismissal)(Brooks, Jennifer)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference set for January 22, 2020 at 11:00 A.M. in West Palm Beach Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. At that time, the parties shall call (888) 808-6929 and enter access code 2036573. Any motions to modify the existing trial date should be filed prior to the telephonic scheduling conference. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)s conference report requirement. The parties must be prepared at their assigned time but may have to wait 10-20 minutes before their conference begins, as the Court sets multiple cases per 30-minute time slot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 1/16/2020. (spe)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon and Setting Trial date: ( Calendar Call set for 7/29/2020 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Jury Trial set for 8/3/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (lk)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12209261, filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Return of Service, #3 Exhibit June 27, 2019 Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit August 8, 2019 Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit October 11, 2019 Letter, #6 Exhibit Notice of Filing Proposal for Settlement, #7 Exhibit November 27, 2019 Response to PFS, #8 Exhibit State Court Docket, #9 Exhibit Division of Corporation, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Brooks, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hainsworth v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Hainsworth
Represented By: Yvette M. Trelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Patricia Brooks
Represented By: Joshua Evan Orlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Roman
Represented By: Jennifer Patricia Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?