Raymond James Financial Services Inc. v. Armijos et al
Plaintiff: Raymond James Financial Services Inc.
Defendant: Elsa Magdalena Calva Ulloa, Ana del Carmen Narv Chacon, Maria Gabriela Darquea, Sonia Violeta Vinelli Aguirre, Soledad Violeta Vinelli Aguirre, Tarquino Leon, Ana Luz Bueno Pallares, Ana C. Yans Constante, Guillermo Anibal Rodrigue Miranda, Hue Linh Tran Tang, Paula Tatiana Cordova Armijos, Fabiola Jakeline Cadena Huertas, Construction Management Solution, Inc., Francisco Roh Lopez, Ada Serena Cordova Armijos, Maria Daniela Vasquez Perez, Hugo Hernan Bonilla Moyano, Martha Eugenia Lopez Yanez, Lucia Alexandra Valle Tejada, Ana Patricia Villam Espin, Kingvi Group, S.A., Diego Javier Calisto Arteta, James Manuel Esparza, Linda Andrade Zambrano, Juan Oswaldo Vinelli Aguirre, Elva Dalia Cervantes, Diego Xavier Calisto Albornoz, Natalie Alexandra Tapia Bermudez, Eugenio Arellano Fernandez, Cargi Business Corp., Rocio del Consuelo Ra Banderas, Carlos Jamil Helou Pinto, Xavier Federico Menses Espinosa, Maria Gabriela Andrad Jarrin, Maria Augusta Galarra Moreno, Gilmer Rodrigo Lopez Viteri, Carlos Salomon Helou Cevallos, Elsa Magdalena Lalam Crespo, Hernan Patricio Calder Segovia, Jose Antonio Pallares, Fabian Enrique Montalv Canelos, Paul Patricio Ortega Salazar, Herrman Gonzalo Cevallo Silva, Edward Jonathan Kennedy, Tanya Patricia Valenz Endara, Sylvia Albornoz Vorbeck, Fernando Ivan Lucero, Irma Ileana Rubio Garcia, Maria Bernarda Vasquez, Ana Luz Pallares Meneses, Gladys Rosario Calvach Ulloa, Luis Antonio Cordova Cevallos, Rodrigo Mauricio Ledsma Gandara, Megarmi, S.A., Guadalupe Bernardina Ayala, Gonzalo Vivanco, Luz Elvira Pazmino, Karen Elizabeth Sandoval, Antonio Arregui Yarza, Silvino Mina, America Alicia Troya de Kennedy, Hugo Patricio Vergar Araque, Walter Eduardo Medina Calderon, Maria Teresa Armijos Torres, James Wong Tran, Monica Catalina Almeid Garcia, Maria Alexandra Herna Lalama, Ines Fabiola Vela Barragan, Founderz Group Limited, Gabriella Bobadilla, Laura Haydee Luna Gaibor, Edgar Fabian Ortega Carrion, Luis Eduardo Castillo Vallejo, Gonzalo David Carrera Segovia, Karen Wong Tran, Ines Ximena Villamar Espin, Fernando Bueno Martinez, Dominique Kennedy, Gladys Margarita Ochoa Egas, Maria Cristina Vasquez, Marcia Cecilia Calvach Ulloa, Maria Gabriela Hernan Lalama, Elena del Carmen Pere Espinoza, Douglas Ray Good, Magson Portfolio Corp., Conferencia Episcopal Ecuatoriana, Jose Roberto Ludena Granja, Monica Susana Teran Burbano, Ute Wiecher Knaak, Maria Alegria Vasquez, Erika Elizabeth Calde Medina, Maria Daniela del Solar, Patricio E. Campuzano, Hernan Antonio Jaramillo, Rosa Ines Arteta, Cecilia Y. Marcial, Manuel Ignacio del Solar, Erika Johana Coba Vinelli, Eulalia de las Mercedes Chiriboga, Saint Salvatore Ltd., Paulina Cecilia Villama Espin, Ruben Dario Carrera Loza, Hector Hugo Darquea Moncayo, Giorgio Peroni Marchina, Nora Susana Calderon Chiriboga, Maria Fernanda Bueno Pallares, Pablo Esteban Valenci Llerena, Xavier Pinto Vela, Edwin Alberto Torres Mino, Eduardo Enrique Ledesma Mariscal, Jose Adrian Cordova, Jamie Antonio Toledo Romoleroux, Marcia Gisella Sandova Cerda, Angel A. Basantes C., Angel Eduardo Cordova Cevallas, Paola Asuncion Cortes Safadi, Paola Gabriela Coba Vinelli, Estate of Washington Eduardo Alemeida Flores, Maria Margarita Arcos Darquea, Francisco Xavier Paez Puga, Maria Celina Espin Tello, Monica Iveth Luna Gaibor, Ana Catalina Aylwin Equiguren, Maria Gabriela Pallares, Francisco Correa Holguin, Miguel Angel Reyes Fierro, Vicariato Apostolico de Esmeraldas Mision Comboniana, Monica del Carmen Dura Vaca, Fabian Yar, Segundo Castillo, Ana Maria Troncoso Garrido, Jose Luis Cordova, Edison Garcia Gualpa, Maria Isabel Almeida Garcia, Jose Victorian Naranjo, Alfonso Trujillo Grijalva, Germanico Javier Davila Proano, Diego Fernandez Vasqu Davalos, Maria Kennedy, Eduardo Anibal Benitez, Carlos Ivan C. Recalde, Consejo Guernativo de Bienes Diocesanos Tulcan, Alvaro Campuzano Arteta, James Manuel Esparza Cisneros, Consejo Gubernativo de Bienes Diocesanos Tulcan, Marcia Cecilia Espin Tello, Ana del Carmen Narvaez Chacon, Hugo Patricio Vergara Araque;, Ana Patricia Villamar Espin, Hernan Gonzalo Cevallos Silva, Hernan Antonio Jaramillo Arias and Eulalia de las Mercedes Calderon Chiriboga
Case Number: 9:2019cv81692
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PAPERLESS ORDER taking under advisement #32 Defendants' Motion to Strike/Quash a Subpoena and setting a Telephone Discovery Hearing for 2/19/2020 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Plaintiff's counsel shall advise the non-party that no documents shall be produced in response to the subpoena until further order of this Court. Counsel shall use the following conference call instructions for the hearing: Dial 1-888-557-8511; Enter access code 4098267#; and Enter security code 1234#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 2/13/2020. (hk02)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REFERRING #32 Defendants' Motion to Strike Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena and to Quash Subpoena to Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 2/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (btr)
February 11, 2020 Filing 32 Defendant's MOTION to Strike Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena and to Quash Subpoena by Juan Oswaldo Vinelli Aguirre, Soledad Violeta Vinelli Aguirre, Sonia Violeta Vinelli Aguirre, Diego Xavier Calisto Albornoz, America Alicia Troya de Kennedy, Hernan Antonio Jaramillo Arias, Ada Serena Cordova Armijos, Paula Tatiana Cordova Armijos, Diego Javier Calisto Arteta, Rosa Ines Arteta, Guadalupe Bernardina Ayala, Rocio del Consuelo Ra Banderas, Ines Fabiola Vela Barragan, Angel A. Basantes C., Eduardo Anibal Benitez, Natalie Alexandra Tapia Bermudez, Gabriella Bobadilla, Monica Susana Teran Burbano, Walter Eduardo Medina Calderon, Patricio E. Campuzano, Alvaro Campuzano Arteta, Fabian Enrique Montalv Canelos, Cargi Business Corp., Edgar Fabian Ortega Carrion, Segundo Castillo, Ana Catalina Aylwin Equiguren, Marcia Cecilia Espin Tello, Marcia Gisella Sandova Cerda, Elva Dalia Cervantes, Angel Eduardo Cordova Cevallas, Carlos Salomon Helou Cevallos, Luis Antonio Cordova Cevallos, Nora Susana Calderon Chiriboga, Conferencia Episcopal Ecuatoriana, Ana C. Yans Constante, Construction Management Solution, Inc., Jose Adrian Cordova, Jose Luis Cordova, Elsa Magdalena Lalam Crespo, Maria Gabriela Darquea, Maria Margarita Arcos Darquea, Diego Fernandez Vasqu Davalos, Gladys Margarita Ochoa Egas, Tanya Patricia Valenz Endara, Ines Ximena Villamar Espin, Paulina Cecilia Villama Espin, Xavier Federico Menses Espinosa, Elena del Carmen Pere Espinoza, Estate of Washington Eduardo Alemeida Flores, Eugenio Arellano Fernandez, Miguel Angel Reyes Fierro, Founderz Group Limited, Laura Haydee Luna Gaibor, Monica Iveth Luna Gaibor, Rodrigo Mauricio Ledsma Gandara, Irma Ileana Rubio Garcia, Maria Isabel Almeida Garcia, Monica Catalina Almeid Garcia, Ana Maria Troncoso Garrido, Hernan Gonzalo Cevallos Silva, Douglas Ray Good, Jose Roberto Ludena Granja, Alfonso Trujillo Grijalva, Edison Garcia Gualpa, Consejo Gubernativo de Bienes Diocesanos Tulcan, Francisco Correa Holguin, Fabiola Jakeline Cadena Huertas, Maria Gabriela Andrad Jarrin, Dominique Kennedy, Edward Jonathan Kennedy, Maria Kennedy, Kingvi Group, S.A., Ute Wiecher Knaak, Maria Gabriela Hernan Lalama, Maria Alexandra Herna Lalama, Tarquino Leon, Pablo Esteban Valenci Llerena, Francisco Roh Lopez, Ruben Dario Carrera Loza, Fernando Ivan Lucero, Magson Portfolio Corp., James Manuel Esparza Cisneros, Giorgio Peroni Marchina, Cecilia Y. Marcial, Eduardo Enrique Ledesma Mariscal, Fernando Bueno Martinez, Erika Elizabeth Calde Medina, Megarmi, S.A., Ana Luz Pallares Meneses, Silvino Mina, Edwin Alberto Torres Mino, Guillermo Anibal Rodrigue Miranda, Hector Hugo Darquea Moncayo, Maria Augusta Galarra Moreno, Hugo Hernan Bonilla Moyano, Jose Victorian Naranjo, Ana Luz Bueno Pallares, Jose Antonio Pallares, Maria Fernanda Bueno Pallares, Maria Gabriela Pallares, Ana Patricia Villamar Espin, Hugo Patricio Vergara Araque;, Maria Daniela Vasquez Perez, Carlos Jamil Helou Pinto, Germanico Javier Davila Proano, Francisco Xavier Paez Puga, Carlos Ivan C. Recalde, Jamie Antonio Toledo Romoleroux, Paola Asuncion Cortes Safadi, Paul Patricio Ortega Salazar, Karen Elizabeth Sandoval, Gonzalo David Carrera Segovia, Hernan Patricio Calder Segovia, Hue Linh Tran Tang, Lucia Alexandra Valle Tejada, Maria Celina Espin Tello, Maria Teresa Armijos Torres, James Wong Tran, Karen Wong Tran, Elsa Magdalena Calva Ulloa, Gladys Rosario Calvach Ulloa, Monica del Carmen Dura Vaca, Luis Eduardo Castillo Vallejo, Maria Bernarda Vasquez, Maria Alegria Vasquez, Maria Cristina Vasquez, Xavier Pinto Vela, Vicariato Apostolico de Esmeraldas Mision Comboniana, Erika Johana Coba Vinelli, Paola Gabriela Coba Vinelli, Gilmer Rodrigo Lopez Viteri, Sylvia Albornoz Vorbeck, Martha Eugenia Lopez Yanez, Fabian Yar, Antonio Arregui Yarza, Linda Andrade Zambrano, Eulalia de las Mercedes Calderon Chiriboga, Ana del Carmen Narvaez Chacon, Manuel Ignacio del Solar, Maria Daniela del Solar. Responses due by 2/25/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Millor, Sandra)
February 7, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included Emergency Motion to Vacate Temporary Restraining Order; Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction; Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary and Permane nt Injunction filed by Juan Oswaldo Vinelli Aguirre, Soledad Violeta Vinelli Aguirre, Sonia Violeta Vinelli Aguirre, Diego Xavier Calisto Albornoz, America Alicia Troya de Kennedy, Hernan Antonio Jaramillo Arias, Ada Serena Cordova Armijos, Paula Tatiana Cordova Armijos, Diego Javier Calisto Arteta, Rosa Ines Arteta, Guadalupe Bernardina Ayala, Rocio del Consuelo Ra Banderas, Ines Fabiola Vela Barragan, Angel A. Basantes C., Eduardo Anibal Benitez, Natalie Alexandra Tapia Bermudez, Gabriella Bobadilla, Monica Susana Teran Burbano, Walter Eduardo Medina Calderon, Patricio E. Campuzano, Alvaro Campuzano Arteta, Fabian Enrique Montalv Canelos, Cargi Business Corp., Edgar Fabian Ortega Carrion, Segundo Castillo, Ana Catalina Aylwin Equiguren, Marcia Cecilia Espin Tello, Marcia Gisella Sandova Cerda, Elva Dalia Cervantes, Angel Eduardo Cordova Cevallas, Carlos Salomon Helou Cevallos, Luis Antonio Cordova Cevallos, Nora Susana Calderon Chiriboga, Conferencia Episcopal Ecuatoriana, Ana C. Yans Constante, Construction Management Solution, Inc., Jose Adrian Cordova, Jose Luis Cordova, Elsa Magdalena Lalam Crespo, Maria Gabriela Darquea, Maria Margarita Arcos Darquea, Diego Fernandez Vasqu Davalos, Gladys Margarita Ochoa Egas, Tanya Patricia Valenz Endara, Ines Ximena Villamar Espin, Paulina Cecilia Villama Espin, Xavier Federico Menses Espinosa, Elena del Carmen Pere Espinoza, Estate of Washington Eduardo Alemeida Flores, Eugenio Arellano Fernandez, Miguel Angel Reyes Fierro, Founderz Group Limited, Laura Haydee Luna Gaibor, Monica Iveth Luna Gaibor, Rodrigo Mauricio Ledsma Gandara, Irma Ileana Rubio Garcia, Maria Isabel Almeida Garcia, Monica Catalina Almeid Garcia, Ana Maria Troncoso Garrido, Hernan Gonzalo Cevallos Silva, Douglas Ray Good, Jose Roberto Ludena Granja, Alfonso Trujillo Grijalva, Edison Garcia Gualpa, Consejo Gubernativo de Bienes Diocesanos Tulcan, Francisco Correa Holguin, Fabiola Jakeline Cadena Huertas, Maria Gabriela Andrad Jarrin, Dominique Kennedy, Edward Jonathan Kennedy, Maria Kennedy, Kingvi Group, S.A., Ute Wiecher Knaak, Maria Gabriela Hernan Lalama, Maria Alexandra Herna Lalama, Tarquino Leon, Pablo Esteban Valenci Llerena, Francisco Roh Lopez, Ruben Dario Carrera Loza, Fernando Ivan Lucero, Magson Portfolio Corp., James Manuel Esparza Cisneros, Giorgio Peroni Marchina, Cecilia Y. Marcial, Eduardo Enrique Ledesma Mariscal, Fernando Bueno Martinez, Erika Elizabeth Calde Medina, Megarmi, S.A., Ana Luz Pallares Meneses, Silvino Mina, Edwin Alberto Torres Mino, Guillermo Anibal Rodrigue Miranda, Hector Hugo Darquea Moncayo, Maria Augusta Galarra Moreno, Hugo Hernan Bonilla Moyano, Jose Victorian Naranjo, Ana Luz Bueno Pallares, Jose Antonio Pallares, Maria Fernanda Bueno Pallares, Maria Gabriela Pallares, Ana Patricia Villamar Espin, Hugo Patricio Vergara Araque;, Maria Daniela Vasquez Perez, Carlos Jamil Helou Pinto, Germanico Javier Davila Proano, Francisco Xavier Paez Puga, Carlos Ivan C. Recalde, Jamie Antonio Toledo Romoleroux, Paola Asuncion Cortes Safadi, Paul Patricio Ortega Salazar, Karen Elizabeth Sandoval, Gonzalo David Carrera Segovia, Hernan Patricio Calder Segovia, Hue Linh Tran Tang, Lucia Alexandra Valle Tejada, Maria Celina Espin Tello, Maria Teresa Armijos Torres, James Wong Tran, Karen Wong Tran, Elsa Magdalena Calva Ulloa, Gladys Rosario Calvach Ulloa, Monica del Carmen Dura Vaca, Luis Eduardo Castillo Vallejo, Maria Bernarda Vasquez, Maria Alegria Vasquez, Maria Cristina Vasquez, Xavier Pinto Vela, Vicariato Apostolico de Esmeraldas Mision Comboniana, Erika Johana Coba Vinelli, Paola Gabriela Coba Vinelli, Gilmer Rodrigo Lopez Viteri, Sylvia Albornoz Vorbeck, Martha Eugenia Lopez Yanez, Fabian Yar, Antonio Arregui Yarza, Linda Andrade Zambrano, Eulalia de las Mercedes Calderon Chiriboga, Ana del Carmen Narvaez Chacon, Manuel Ignacio del Solar, Maria Daniela del Solar. Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Juan Oswaldo Vinelli Aguirre(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Soledad Violeta Vinelli Aguirre(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Sonia Violeta Vinelli Aguirre(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Diego Xavier Calisto Albornoz(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party America Alicia Troya de Kennedy(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Hernan Antonio Jaramillo Arias(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Ada Serena Cordova Armijos(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Diego Javier Calisto Arteta(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Rosa Ines Arteta(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Guadalupe Bernardina Ayala(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Rocio del Consuelo Ra Banderas(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Ines Fabiola Vela Barragan(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Angel A. Basantes C.(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Eduardo Anibal Benitez(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Natalie Alexandra Tapia Bermudez(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Gabriella Bobadilla(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Monica Susana Teran Burbano(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Walter Eduardo Medina Calderon(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Patricio E. Campuzano(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Fabian Enrique Montalv Canelos(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Cargi Business Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Edgar Fabian Ortega Carrion(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Segundo Castillo(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Ana Catalina Aylwin Equiguren(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Marcia Cecilia Espin Tello(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Marcia Gisella Sandova Cerda(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Elva Dalia Cervantes(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Angel Eduardo Cordova Cevallas(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Carlos Salomon Helou Cevallos(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Luis Antonio Cordova Cevallos(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Nora Susana Calderon Chiriboga(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Conferencia Episcopal Ecuatoriana (pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Ana C. Yans Constante(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Jose Adrian Cordova(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Jose Luis Cordova(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Elsa Magdalena Lalam Crespo(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Maria Margarita Arcos Darquea(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Diego Fernandez Vasqu Davalos(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Gladys Margarita Ochoa Egas(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Tanya Patricia Valenz Endara(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Ines Ximena Villamar Espin(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Paulina Cecilia Villama Espin(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Xavier Federico Menses Espinosa(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Elena del Carmen Pere Espinoza(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Estate of Washington Eduardo Alemeida Flores(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Eugenio Arellano Fernandez(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Miguel Angel Reyes Fierro(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Founderz Group Limited (pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Laura Haydee Luna Gaibor(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Monica Iveth Luna Gaibor(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Rodrigo Mauricio Ledsma Gandara(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Irma Ileana Rubio Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Maria Isabel Almeida Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Monica Catalina Almeid Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Ana Maria Troncoso Garrido(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Hernan Gonzalo Cevallos Silva(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Douglas Ray Good(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Jose Roberto Ludena Granja(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Alfonso Trujillo Grijalva(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Edison Garcia Gualpa(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Consejo Gubernativo de Bienes Diocesanos Tulcan(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Francisco Correa Holguin(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Fabiola Jakeline Cadena Huertas(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Maria Gabriela Andrad Jarrin(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Dominique Kennedy(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Edward Jonathan Kennedy(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Maria Kennedy(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Kingvi Group, S.A. (pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Ute Wiecher Knaak(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Maria Gabriela Hernan Lalama(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Maria Alexandra Herna Lalama(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Tarquino Leon(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Pablo Esteban Valenci Llerena(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Mi
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order Dismissing Defendants Gonzalo Vivanco, Luz Elvira Pazmino, and Saint Salvatore Ltd. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 2/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (btr)
February 3, 2020 Filing 30 Clerks Notice to Filer re 28 Sealed Document. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event, document is not a motion. Corrections has been made. It is not necessary to refile this document. (nc)
February 3, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 28 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1014787)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #26 Motion to Seal. Plaintiff may file an unredacted version of its Response to Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration #25 and the declarations of Ryan O'Quinn, Linda Van Oosting, and Melissa A. Kelly, including all exhibits attached thereto, under seal. The documents shall remain under seal until the conclusion of this action, at which time the Clerk is directed to destroy the sealed materials. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 2/3/2020. (btr)
February 3, 2020 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Seal and Incorporated Memorandum of Law per Local Rule 5.4 by Raymond James Financial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (O'Quinn, Ryan)
January 31, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included Emergency Motion to Vacate Temporary Restraining Order; Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction; Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary and Permane filed by Raymond James Financial Services Inc.. Replies due by 2/7/2020. (Sevilla-Sharon, Maia)
January 30, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Defendants by Raymond James Financial Services Inc. (O'Quinn, Ryan)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OMNIBUS ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 1/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (btr)
January 24, 2020 Filing 22 Supplemental NOTICE of Intent to Accept Service of Process by Paula Tatiana Cordova Armijos, Alvaro Campuzano Arteta, Maria Gabriela Darquea, Francisco Xavier Paez Puga re 20 Order Setting Status Conference,, . Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Paula Tatiana Cordova Armijos(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Alvaro Campuzano Arteta(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Maria Gabriela Darquea(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Francisco Xavier Paez Puga(pty:dft). (Millor, Sandra) Modified text on 1/24/2020 (kpe).
January 23, 2020 Filing 21 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/23/2020. Argument heard. Order to follow. Attorney Appearance(s): Francisco A. Rodriguez, Sandra Jessica Millor, Ryan Dwight O'Quinn, Maia Sevilla-Sharon, Terry R Weiss, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, 305-523-5635. (gp)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Status Conference. A Telephonic Status Conference is hereby set for 11:30 AM on January 23, 2020 before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz. Counsel are instructed to call 1-877-402-9753 no later than 11:25 AM on January 23, 2020. The access code is 9372453 and the password is 0918 . The Court requires that counsel appear via a landline (i.e. not a cellular phone or a speaker phone) for clarity. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 1/21/2020. (btr)
January 21, 2020 Filing 19 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included Emergency Motion to Vacate Temporary Restraining Order; Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction; Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction; & Request for Emergency Hearing by Juan Oswaldo Vinelli Aguirre, Soledad Violeta Vinelli Aguirre, Sonia Violeta Vinelli Aguirre, Diego Xavier Calisto Albornoz, America Alicia Troya de Kennedy, Hernan Antonio Jaramillo Arias, Ada Serena Cordova Armijos, Diego Javier Calisto Arteta, Rosa Ines Arteta, Guadalupe Bernardina Ayala, Rocio del Consuelo Ra Banderas, Ines Fabiola Vela Barragan, Angel A. Basantes C., Eduardo Anibal Benitez, Natalie Alexandra Tapia Bermudez, Gabriella Bobadilla, Monica Susana Teran Burbano, Walter Eduardo Medina Calderon, Patricio E. Campuzano, Fabian Enrique Montalv Canelos, Cargi Business Corp., Edgar Fabian Ortega Carrion, Segundo Castillo, Ana Catalina Aylwin Equiguren, Marcia Cecilia Espin Tello, Marcia Gisella Sandova Cerda, Elva Dalia Cervantes, Angel Eduardo Cordova Cevallas, Carlos Salomon Helou Cevallos, Luis Antonio Cordova Cevallos, Nora Susana Calderon Chiriboga, Conferencia Episcopal Ecuatoriana, Ana C. Yans Constante, Construction Management Solution, Inc., Jose Adrian Cordova, Jose Luis Cordova, Elsa Magdalena Lalam Crespo, Maria Margarita Arcos Darquea, Diego Fernandez Vasqu Davalos, Gladys Margarita Ochoa Egas, Tanya Patricia Valenz Endara, Ines Ximena Villamar Espin, Paulina Cecilia Villama Espin, Xavier Federico Menses Espinosa, Elena del Carmen Pere Espinoza, Estate of Washington Eduardo Alemeida Flores, Eugenio Arellano Fernandez, Miguel Angel Reyes Fierro, Founderz Group Limited, Laura Haydee Luna Gaibor, Monica Iveth Luna Gaibor, Rodrigo Mauricio Ledsma Gandara, Irma Ileana Rubio Garcia, Maria Isabel Almeida Garcia, Monica Catalina Almeid Garcia, Ana Maria Troncoso Garrido, Hernan Gonzalo Cevallos Silva, Douglas Ray Good, Jose Roberto Ludena Granja, Alfonso Trujillo Grijalva, Edison Garcia Gualpa, Consejo Gubernativo de Bienes Diocesanos Tulcan, Francisco Correa Holguin, Fabiola Jakeline Cadena Huertas, Maria Gabriela Andrad Jarrin, Dominique Kennedy, Edward Jonathan Kennedy, Maria Kennedy, Kingvi Group, S.A., Ute Wiecher Knaak, Maria Gabriela Hernan Lalama, Maria Alexandra Herna Lalama, Tarquino Leon, Pablo Esteban Valenci Llerena, Francisco Roh Lopez, Ruben Dario Carrera Loza, Fernando Ivan Lucero, Magson Portfolio Corp., James Manuel Esparza Cisneros, Giorgio Peroni Marchina, Cecilia Y. Marcial, Eduardo Enrique Ledesma Mariscal, Fernando Bueno Martinez, Erika Elizabeth Calde Medina, Megarmi, S.A., Ana Luz Pallares Meneses, Silvino Mina, Edwin Alberto Torres Mino, Guillermo Anibal Rodrigue Miranda, Hector Hugo Darquea Moncayo, Maria Augusta Galarra Moreno, Hugo Hernan Bonilla Moyano, Jose Victorian Naranjo, Ana Luz Bueno Pallares, Jose Antonio Pallares, Maria Fernanda Bueno Pallares, Maria Gabriela Pallares, Ana Patricia Villamar Espin, Hugo Patricio Vergara Araque;, Maria Daniela Vasquez Perez, Carlos Jamil Helou Pinto, Germanico Javier Davila Proano, Carlos Ivan C. Recalde, Jamie Antonio Toledo Romoleroux, Paola Asuncion Cortes Safadi, Paul Patricio Ortega Salazar, Karen Elizabeth Sandoval, Gonzalo David Carrera Segovia, Hernan Patricio Calder Segovia, Hue Linh Tran Tang, Lucia Alexandra Valle Tejada, Maria Celina Espin Tello, Maria Teresa Armijos Torres, James Wong Tran, Karen Wong Tran, Elsa Magdalena Calva Ulloa, Gladys Rosario Calvach Ulloa, Monica del Carmen Dura Vaca, Luis Eduardo Castillo Vallejo, Maria Bernarda Vasquez, Maria Alegria Vasquez, Maria Cristina Vasquez, Xavier Pinto Vela, Vicariato Apostolico de Esmeraldas Mision Comboniana, Erika Johana Coba Vinelli, Paola Gabriela Coba Vinelli, Gilmer Rodrigo Lopez Viteri, Sylvia Albornoz Vorbeck, Martha Eugenia Lopez Yanez, Fabian Yar, Antonio Arregui Yarza, Linda Andrade Zambrano, Eulalia de las Mercedes Calderon Chiriboga, Ana del Carmen Narvaez Chacon, Manuel Ignacio del Solar, Maria Daniela del Solar. Responses due by 2/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Rodriguez, Francisco)
January 17, 2020 Filing 18 Corrected Transcript and Notice of Correction of Motion Hearing (as to speaker identifications) held on 1-9-2020 before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz, 1-68 pages, re: #16 Transcript,, Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 954-769-5568 / Gizella_Baan-Proulx@flsd.uscourts.gov. (gbx)
January 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Intent to Accept Service of Process by Construction Management Solution, Inc. re 15 Order,, (Millor, Sandra) Modified text on 1/17/2020 (kpe).
January 16, 2020 Filing 16 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 1-9-2020 before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz, 1-68 pages, Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 954-769-5568 / Gizella_Baan-Proulx@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/6/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2020. (gbx)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendant Construction Management Solution, Inc.s ("CMS") ore tenus motion for extension of time. CMS shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 by January 20, 2020. CMS shall also respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent injunction #3 by January 20, 2020. Additionally, by January 16, 2020, counsel for CMS shall file a Notice certifying whether it will represent the other Defendants in this action and, if so, whether the other Defendants have agreed to Plaintiffs request to waive service of process. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 1/9/2020. (btr)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 1/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (btr)
January 9, 2020 Filing 13 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz: Motion Hearing held on 1/9/2020 re #3 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Argument heard. Order to follow. Attorney Appearance(s): Francisco A. Rodriguez, Sandra Jessica Millor, Ryan Dwight O'Quinn, Terry R Weiss, Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 954-769-5568 / Gizella_Baan-Proulx@flsd.uscourts.gov. (gp)
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sandra Jessica Millor on behalf of Construction Management Solution, Inc.. Attorney Sandra Jessica Millor added to party Construction Management Solution, Inc.(pty:dft). (Millor, Sandra)
January 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Francisco A. Rodriguez on behalf of Construction Management Solution, Inc.. Attorney Francisco A. Rodriguez added to party Construction Management Solution, Inc.(pty:dft). (Rodriguez, Francisco)
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Raymond James Financial Services Inc. re 9 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, (Attachments: #1 Certification Certificate of Service)(O'Quinn, Ryan)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and #5 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Hearing set for 1/9/2020 03:30 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 1/7/2020. (btr)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Raymond James Financial Services Inc. as to Construction Management Solution, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certificate of Service)(O'Quinn, Ryan)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry R Weiss on behalf of Raymond James Financial Services Inc.. Attorney Terry R Weiss added to party Raymond James Financial Services Inc.(pty:pla). (Weiss, Terry)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Raymond James Financial Services Inc. re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, of Filing Exhibits to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (O'Quinn, Ryan)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Raymond James Financial Services Inc.. Responses due by 1/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sevilla-Sharon, Maia)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Juan Oswaldo Vinelli Aguirre, Soledad Violeta Vinelli Aguirre, Sonia Violeta Vinelli Aguirre, Diego Xavier Calisto Albornoz, America Alicia Troya de Kennedy, Hugo Patricio Vergar Araque, Ada Serena Cordova Armijos, Paula Tatiana Cordova Armijos, Diego Javier Calisto Arteta, Rosa Ines Arteta, Guadalupe Bernardina Ayala, Rocio del Consuelo Ra Banderas, Ines Fabiola Vela Barragan, Angel A. Basantes C., Eduardo Anibal Benitez, Natalie Alexandra Tapia Bermudez, Gabriella Bobadilla, Monica Susana Teran Burbano, Walter Eduardo Medina Calderon, Patricio E. Campuzano, Fabian Enrique Montalv Canelos, Cargi Business Corp., Edgar Fabian Ortega Carrion, Segundo Castillo, Ana Catalina Aylwin Equiguren, Marcia Gisella Sandova Cerda, Elva Dalia Cervantes, Angel Eduardo Cordova Cevallas, Carlos Salomon Helou Cevallos, Luis Antonio Cordova Cevallos, Ana del Carmen Narv Chacon, Eulalia de las Mercedes Chiriboga, Nora Susana Calderon Chiriboga, Conferencia Episcopal Ecuatoriana, Consejo Guernativo de Bienes Diocesanos Tulcan, Ana C. Yans Constante, Construction Management Solution, Inc., Jose Adrian Cordova, Jose Luis Cordova, Elsa Magdalena Lalam Crespo, Maria Gabriela Darquea, Maria Margarita Arcos Darquea, Diego Fernandez Vasqu Davalos, Gladys Margarita Ochoa Egas, Tanya Patricia Valenz Endara, James Manuel Esparza, Ana Patricia Villam Espin, Ines Ximena Villamar Espin, Paulina Cecilia Villama Espin, Xavier Federico Menses Espinosa, Elena del Carmen Pere Espinoza, Estate of Washington Eduardo Alemeida Flores, Eugenio Arellano Fernandez, Miguel Angel Reyes Fierro, Founderz Group Limited, Laura Haydee Luna Gaibor, Monica Iveth Luna Gaibor, Rodrigo Mauricio Ledsma Gandara, Irma Ileana Rubio Garcia, Maria Isabel Almeida Garcia, Monica Catalina Almeid Garcia, Ana Maria Troncoso Garrido, Douglas Ray Good, Jose Roberto Ludena Granja, Alfonso Trujillo Grijalva, Edison Garcia Gualpa, Francisco Correa Holguin, Fabiola Jakeline Cadena Huertas, Hernan Antonio Jaramillo, Maria Gabriela Andrad Jarrin, Dominique Kennedy, Edward Jonathan Kennedy, Maria Kennedy, Kingvi Group, S.A., Ute Wiecher Knaak, Maria Gabriela Hernan Lalama, Maria Alexandra Herna Lalama, Tarquino Leon, Pablo Esteban Valenci Llerena, Francisco Roh Lopez, Ruben Dario Carrera Loza, Fernando Ivan Lucero, Magson Portfolio Corp., Giorgio Peroni Marchina, Cecilia Y. Marcial, Eduardo Enrique Ledesma Mariscal, Fernando Bueno Martinez, Erika Elizabeth Calde Medina, Megarmi, S.A., Ana Luz Pallares Meneses, Silvino Mina, Edwin Alberto Torres Mino, Guillermo Anibal Rodrigue Miranda, Hector Hugo Darquea Moncayo, Maria Augusta Galarra Moreno, Hugo Hernan Bonilla Moyano, Jose Victorian Naranjo, Ana Luz Bueno Pallares, Jose Antonio Pallares, Maria Fernanda Bueno Pallares, Maria Gabriela Pallares, Luz Elvira Pazmino, Maria Daniela Vasquez Perez, Carlos Jamil Helou Pinto, Germanico Javier Davila Proano, Francisco Xavier Paez Puga, Carlos Ivan C. Recalde, Jamie Antonio Toledo Romoleroux, Paola Asuncion Cortes Safadi, Saint Salvatore Ltd., Paul Patricio Ortega Salazar, Karen Elizabeth Sandoval, Gonzalo David Carrera Segovia, Hernan Patricio Calder Segovia, Herrman Gonzalo Cevallo Silva, Hue Linh Tran Tang, Lucia Alexandra Valle Tejada, Maria Celina Espin Tello, Maria Teresa Armijos Torres, James Wong Tran, Karen Wong Tran, Elsa Magdalena Calva Ulloa, Gladys Rosario Calvach Ulloa, Marcia Cecilia Calvach Ulloa, Monica del Carmen Dura Vaca, Luis Eduardo Castillo Vallejo, Maria Bernarda Vasquez, Maria Alegria Vasquez, Maria Cristina Vasquez, Xavier Pinto Vela, Vicariato Apostolico de Esmeraldas Mision Comboniana, Erika Johana Coba Vinelli, Paola Gabriela Coba Vinelli, Gilmer Rodrigo Lopez Viteri, Gonzalo Vivanco, Sylvia Albornoz Vorbeck, Martha Eugenia Lopez Yanez, Fabian Yar, Antonio Arregui Yarza, Linda Andrade Zambrano, Manuel Ignacio del Solar, Maria Daniela del Solar. (jas)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Raymond James Financial Services Inc.. Attorney Maia Sevilla-Sharon added to party Raymond James Financial Services Inc.(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sevilla-Sharon, Maia)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12242656, filed by Raymond James Financial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s), #10 Summon(s), #11 Summon(s), #12 Summon(s), #13 Summon(s), #14 Summon(s), #15 Summon(s), #16 Summon(s), #17 Summon(s), #18 Summon(s), #19 Summon(s), #20 Summon(s), #21 Summon(s), #22 Summon(s), #23 Summon(s), #24 Summon(s), #25 Summon(s), #26 Summon(s), #27 Summon(s), #28 Summon(s), #29 Summon(s), #30 Summon(s), #31 Summon(s), #32 Summon(s), #33 Summon(s), #34 Summon(s), #35 Summon(s), #36 Summon(s), #37 Summon(s), #38 Summon(s), #39 Summon(s), #40 Summon(s), #41 Summon(s), #42 Summon(s), #43 Summon(s), #44 Summon(s), #45 Summon(s), #46 Summon(s), #47 Summon(s), #48 Summon(s), #49 Summon(s), #50 Summon(s), #51 Summon(s), #52 Summon(s), #53 Summon(s), #54 Summon(s), #55 Summon(s), #56 Summon(s), #57 Summon(s), #58 Summon(s), #59 Summon(s), #60 Summon(s), #61 Summon(s), #62 Summon(s), #63 Summon(s), #64 Summon(s), #65 Summon(s), #66 Summon(s), #67 Summon(s), #68 Summon(s), #69 Summon(s), #70 Summon(s), #71 Summon(s), #72 Summon(s), #73 Summon(s), #74 Summon(s), #75 Summon(s), #76 Summon(s), #77 Summon(s), #78 Summon(s), #79 Summon(s), #80 Summon(s), #81 Summon(s), #82 Summon(s), #83 Summon(s), #84 Summon(s), #85 Summon(s), #86 Summon(s), #87 Summon(s), #88 Summon(s), #89 Summon(s), #90 Summon(s), #91 Summon(s), #92 Summon(s), #93 Summon(s), #94 Summon(s), #95 Summon(s), #96 Summon(s), #97 Summon(s), #98 Summon(s), #99 Summon(s), #100 Summon(s), #101 Summon(s), #102 Summon(s), #103 Summon(s), #104 Summon(s), #105 Summon(s), #106 Summon(s), #107 Summon(s), #108 Summon(s), #109 Summon(s), #110 Summon(s), #111 Summon(s), #112 Summon(s), #113 Summon(s), #114 Summon(s), #115 Summon(s), #116 Summon(s), #117 Summon(s), #118 Summon(s), #119 Summon(s), #120 Summon(s), #121 Summon(s), #122 Summon(s), #123 Summon(s), #124 Summon(s), #125 Summon(s), #126 Summon(s), #127 Summon(s), #128 Summon(s), #129 Summon(s), #130 Summon(s), #131 Summon(s), #132 Summon(s), #133 Summon(s), #134 Summon(s), #135 Summon(s), #136 Summon(s), #137 Summon(s), #138 Summon(s), #139 Summon(s), #140 Summon(s), #141 Summon(s), #142 Summon(s), #143 Summon(s))(O'Quinn, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raymond James Financial Services Inc. v. Armijos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsa Magdalena Calva Ulloa
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana del Carmen Narv Chacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Gabriela Darquea
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Violeta Vinelli Aguirre
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soledad Violeta Vinelli Aguirre
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarquino Leon
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Luz Bueno Pallares
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana C. Yans Constante
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guillermo Anibal Rodrigue Miranda
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hue Linh Tran Tang
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Tatiana Cordova Armijos
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabiola Jakeline Cadena Huertas
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Construction Management Solution, Inc.
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Roh Lopez
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ada Serena Cordova Armijos
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Daniela Vasquez Perez
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugo Hernan Bonilla Moyano
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Eugenia Lopez Yanez
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucia Alexandra Valle Tejada
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Patricia Villam Espin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingvi Group, S.A.
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diego Javier Calisto Arteta
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Manuel Esparza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Andrade Zambrano
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Oswaldo Vinelli Aguirre
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elva Dalia Cervantes
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diego Xavier Calisto Albornoz
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Alexandra Tapia Bermudez
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugenio Arellano Fernandez
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargi Business Corp.
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocio del Consuelo Ra Banderas
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Jamil Helou Pinto
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Federico Menses Espinosa
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Gabriela Andrad Jarrin
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Augusta Galarra Moreno
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilmer Rodrigo Lopez Viteri
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Salomon Helou Cevallos
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsa Magdalena Lalam Crespo
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernan Patricio Calder Segovia
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Antonio Pallares
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabian Enrique Montalv Canelos
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Patricio Ortega Salazar
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herrman Gonzalo Cevallo Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Jonathan Kennedy
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Patricia Valenz Endara
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Albornoz Vorbeck
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Ivan Lucero
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irma Ileana Rubio Garcia
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Bernarda Vasquez
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Luz Pallares Meneses
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gladys Rosario Calvach Ulloa
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Antonio Cordova Cevallos
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodrigo Mauricio Ledsma Gandara
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megarmi, S.A.
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guadalupe Bernardina Ayala
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzalo Vivanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luz Elvira Pazmino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Elizabeth Sandoval
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Arregui Yarza
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvino Mina
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America Alicia Troya de Kennedy
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugo Patricio Vergar Araque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Eduardo Medina Calderon
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Teresa Armijos Torres
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Wong Tran
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Catalina Almeid Garcia
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Alexandra Herna Lalama
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ines Fabiola Vela Barragan
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Founderz Group Limited
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriella Bobadilla
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Haydee Luna Gaibor
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Fabian Ortega Carrion
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Eduardo Castillo Vallejo
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzalo David Carrera Segovia
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Wong Tran
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ines Ximena Villamar Espin
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Bueno Martinez
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominique Kennedy
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gladys Margarita Ochoa Egas
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Cristina Vasquez
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Cecilia Calvach Ulloa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Gabriela Hernan Lalama
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elena del Carmen Pere Espinoza
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Ray Good
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magson Portfolio Corp.
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conferencia Episcopal Ecuatoriana
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Roberto Ludena Granja
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Susana Teran Burbano
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ute Wiecher Knaak
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Alegria Vasquez
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erika Elizabeth Calde Medina
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Daniela del Solar
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricio E. Campuzano
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernan Antonio Jaramillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Ines Arteta
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecilia Y. Marcial
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Ignacio del Solar
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erika Johana Coba Vinelli
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eulalia de las Mercedes Chiriboga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Salvatore Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paulina Cecilia Villama Espin
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Dario Carrera Loza
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Hugo Darquea Moncayo
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giorgio Peroni Marchina
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nora Susana Calderon Chiriboga
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Fernanda Bueno Pallares
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pablo Esteban Valenci Llerena
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Pinto Vela
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Alberto Torres Mino
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Enrique Ledesma Mariscal
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Adrian Cordova
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Antonio Toledo Romoleroux
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Gisella Sandova Cerda
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel A. Basantes C.
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Eduardo Cordova Cevallas
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paola Asuncion Cortes Safadi
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paola Gabriela Coba Vinelli
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Washington Eduardo Alemeida Flores
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Margarita Arcos Darquea
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Xavier Paez Puga
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Celina Espin Tello
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Iveth Luna Gaibor
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Catalina Aylwin Equiguren
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Gabriela Pallares
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Correa Holguin
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Angel Reyes Fierro
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicariato Apostolico de Esmeraldas Mision Comboniana
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica del Carmen Dura Vaca
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabian Yar
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Segundo Castillo
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Maria Troncoso Garrido
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Luis Cordova
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edison Garcia Gualpa
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Isabel Almeida Garcia
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Victorian Naranjo
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfonso Trujillo Grijalva
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Germanico Javier Davila Proano
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diego Fernandez Vasqu Davalos
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Kennedy
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Anibal Benitez
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Ivan C. Recalde
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consejo Guernativo de Bienes Diocesanos Tulcan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvaro Campuzano Arteta
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Manuel Esparza Cisneros
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consejo Gubernativo de Bienes Diocesanos Tulcan
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Cecilia Espin Tello
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana del Carmen Narvaez Chacon
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugo Patricio Vergara Araque;
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Patricia Villamar Espin
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernan Gonzalo Cevallos Silva
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernan Antonio Jaramillo Arias
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eulalia de las Mercedes Calderon Chiriboga
Represented By: Sandra Jessica Millor
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond James Financial Services Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Dwight O'Quinn
Represented By: Maia Sevilla-Sharon
Represented By: Terry R Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?