Stopek v. AIG Assurance Company
Plaintiff: Richard Stopek
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company and AIG Assurance Company
Case Number: 9:2019cv81704
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kenneth A Marra
Referring Judge: William Matthewman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Mark A Greenberg as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 3/172020 at 10:00am. (Greenberg, Mark)
January 31, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to AIG Property Casualty Company. (pcs)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 1/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra., Calendar Call set for 12/4/2020 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Discovery. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 1/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (ir) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
January 24, 2020 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by AIG Property Casualty Company (Medeiros, Crystalin)
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by AIG Property Casualty Company (Medeiros, Crystalin)
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract and Demand for Jury Trial against AIG Property Casualty Company, filed by Richard Stopek. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(Messinger, Max)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment,. US Mail returned for: Matthew David Gottlieb. Updated address found and document resent to new address.Kanner & Pintaluga925 S Federal HwyBoca Raton, FL 33432-6122 (mp)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying as moot re [1-3] Motion to Dismiss Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) filed by AIG Assurance Company. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 1/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (ir)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by AIG Assurance Company OF FILING OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, D.E. 1 (Medeiros, Crystalin)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requiring Counsel to Confer and File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 12/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (ir)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra and Magistrate Judge William Matthewman. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12248481, filed by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Medeiros, Crystalin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stopek v. AIG Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Stopek
Represented By: Matthew David Gottlieb
Represented By: Max Michael Messinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By: Crystalin C Medeiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Assurance Company
Represented By: Crystalin C Medeiros
Represented By: Steven Charles Teebagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?