PNC Bank, National Association v. Donald Moss Corporation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association
Defendant: State of Florida, Donald Moss Corporation, Inc., Lynda H. Moss and United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 9:2019cv81717
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kenneth A Marra
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service. (Desmond, Conor)
January 20, 2020 Filing 14 REPORT REGARDING Case Management Report by PNC Bank, National Association (Anthony, John)
December 31, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Donald Moss Corporation, Inc., Lynda H. Moss(individually), Lynda H. Moss(as Successor Trustee to the T. Donald Moss, II Irrevocable Trust 2, Dated September 7, 2000) identifying Other Affiliate Donna Moss for Donald Moss Corporation, Inc., Lynda H. Moss, Lynda H. Moss (Fields, Preston)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Requiring Counsel to Confer and File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 12/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (ir)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Conor P. Desmond added. Attorney Adam D. Strait terminated. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 12/30/2019. (ir)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint. United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service Answer due 1/21/2020. Re: #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 12/30/2019. (ir)
December 29, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by PNC Bank, National Association (Anthony, John)
December 29, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by PNC Bank, National Association (Anthony, John)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service (Desmond, Conor)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service. (Desmond, Conor)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 UNSTIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Conor P. Desmond for Adam D. Strait by United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service. Attorney Conor Patrick Desmond added to party United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/10/2020 (Desmond, Conor)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 2 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Case closed in error. Correction: Review and Judge Assignment to be made forthwith. (bb)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Case administratively closed - No Initiating Document filed/attached. No further entries will be made on this case. (bb) Modified file date on 12/26/2019 (bb).
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Amended Complaint) Filing fee $400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended State-Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Strait, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank, National Association v. Donald Moss Corporation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Florida
Represented By: John Gary Savoca
Represented By: John Mika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Moss Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Preston James Fields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynda H. Moss
Represented By: Preston James Fields, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Adam D. Strait
Represented By: Conor Patrick Desmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association
Represented By: Lydia Marie Gazda
Represented By: Nicholas Lafalce
Represented By: John Albert Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?