De Luca v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Plaintiff: Patrick A De Luca
Defendant: Chattem Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Pfizer Inc, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020cv80179
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes)
February 10, 2020 Filing 14 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Kevin P. Fitzpatrick, Dirk Marschhausen, John K. Weston, Jeremy E. Abay, Jordan Joachim, Will W. Sachse, mailing date February 10, 2020, (cco)
February 7, 2020 Filing 13 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes)
February 7, 2020 Filing 12 Case transferred in from New York Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-06160. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(pes).
February 7, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFIED COPY OF JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Southern District of Florida are transferred to the Southern District of Florida and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Requst for Case Transfer) (Marziliano, August)
February 6, 2020 Filing 10 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Southern District of Florida are transferred to the Southern District of Florida and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Marziliano, August)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion to stay #9 is granted. All deadlines and proceedings are hereby adjourned sine die. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/17/2019. (Ferrara, Anthony)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending JPML Determination by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Joachim, Jordan)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Joachim, Jordan)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan S. Joachim on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Joachim, Jordan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Related Case (Davis, Kimberly)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion of Plaintiffs for Transfer of Actions to the District of New Jersey, filed before the MDL Panel. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service) (Lee, Tiffeny)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano for all further proceedings. Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 11/6/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Chattem Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Pfizer Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 5, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12000018 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by PATRICK A De LUCA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Fitzpatrick, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Luca v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Will W. Sachse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Michael X. Imbroscio
Represented By: Andrew Soukup
Represented By: Paul W. Schmidt
Represented By: Jordan Scott Joachim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick A De Luca
Represented By: Kevin P. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Jeremy E. Abay
Represented By: Dirk Marschhausen
Represented By: John K. Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?