Blake v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mark Allan Blake
Defendant: Chattem Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Pfizer Inc, Sanofi US Services Inc. and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020cv80181
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes)
February 7, 2020 Filing 21 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes)
February 7, 2020 Filing 20 Case transferred in from Colorado; Case Number 1:19-cv-02991. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(pes).
February 6, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 19-cv-02991 MEH, to the Southern District of Florida, to become part of MDL 2924, by Clerk on 2/6/2020. (evana, )
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending JPML Determination by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/6/2020. This case is STAYED. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 3/12/2020 is VACATED. Status Report due by 3/12/2020. (tsher, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending JPML Determination by Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Lindquist, Elizabeth)
February 4, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elizabeth Francesca Lindquist on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.Attorney Elizabeth Francesca Lindquist added to party Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft) (Lindquist, Elizabeth)
January 6, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS REQUEST as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.; CHATTEM, INC.; GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC; PFIZER, INC.; and SANOFI US SERVICES INC. by Plaintiff Mark Allan Blake. (Wisner, Robert)
December 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Brent Wisner on behalf of Mark Allan Blake (Wisner, Robert)
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), Robert Brent Wisner was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2018 Biennial Fee. Each counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/20/2019. Scheduling Conference is VACATED and RESET to 3/12/2020 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 Administrative Notice: #8 Summons Request is incomplete. Defendant's name and address box as well as the attorney's name and address box is blank. Please refile the document with the updated information. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/7/2019 re: #7 Amended Complaint filed by Mark Allan Blake. #6 Order to Show Cause is discharged. Consent Form due by 12/19/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/18/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.; SANOFI US SERVICES INC.; CHATTEM, INC.; PFIZER, INC.; and GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC by Plaintiff Mark Allan Blake. (Wisner, Robert)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., filed by Mark Allan Blake.(Wisner, Robert)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE returnable by Plaintiff Mark Allan Blake as to why the Court should not dismiss the case without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction due to Plaintiff's failure to show complete diversity in the operative Complaint. Show Cause Response due by 11/6/2019. (tsher, ) Modified on 11/7/2019 to show as discharged pursuant to #9 Minute Order (tsher, ).
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. The summons submitted is not on the court approved form, and not issued. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (rsams, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Robert Brent Wisner. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (rsams, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6954445)Attorney Robert Brent Wisner added to party Mark Allan Blake(pty:pla), filed by Mark Allan Blake. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Wisner, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blake v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Elliott C. Mogul
Represented By: Daniel S. Pariser
Represented By: Anand Agneshwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Bayman
Represented By: Robert B. Friedman
Represented By: Elizabeth Francesca Lindquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Allan Blake
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?