Dimesky et al v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Dimesky, STEPHANIE FRASIER, Mohamed Haridi, Richard Harris and Michael Burke
Defendant: Chattem Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020cv80201
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes)
February 13, 2020 Filing 26 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Connecticut. Case Number 3:19-cv-01517 with documents 1-22. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80201-RLR on 2/7/2020 Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (pes) Modified text on 2/13/2020 (pes).
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 02/11/2020. (Murphy, Tatihana)
February 7, 2020 Filing 25 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes)
February 7, 2020 Filing 24 Case transferred in from Connecticut; Case Number 3:19-cv-01517. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(pes). Modified on 2/12/2020 (pes).
February 7, 2020 Filing 22 MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to Southern District of Florida. (signed by Clerk Karen K. Caldwell, MDL Panel.)(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Stay. The action is stayed pending the decision of the JPML in In Re: Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litig., MDL No. 2924. All deadlines are vacated until further order of the Court. The parties shall notify the Court of the JPML's decision within ten (10) days of the decision. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/5/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
December 3, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending JPML Determination by Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.Responses due by 12/24/2019 (Mancari, Leeanne)
October 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah A. Westby on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Westby, Sarah)
October 24, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Fahey, Patrick)
October 24, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Fahey on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Fahey, Patrick)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 12/13/2019 to file an answer, move, or otherwise respond to the #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/17/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 13, 2019 for all Defendants, including Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., to file an answer, move, or otherwise respond to the #1 Complaint, by Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Mancari, Leeanne)
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Mancari, Leeanne)
October 17, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to 12/13/2019; Chattem, Inc. to 12/13/2019; Sanofi US Services Inc. to 12/13/2019; Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC to 12/13/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
October 11, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Burke, Mohamed Haridi, Jonathan Dimesky, Stephanie Frasier, Richard Harris. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019; Sanofi US Services Inc. served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019; Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Barrett, Christopher)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Burke, Mohamed Haridi, Jonathan Dimesky, Stephanie Frasier, Richard Harris. Chattem, Inc. served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (Raabe, Craig)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steve W. Berman, Jason A. Zweig, and Zoran Tasic to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Michael Burke, Jonathan Dimesky, Stephanie Frasier, Mohamed Haridi, Richard Harris. (Raabe, Craig)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steve W. Berman, Jason A. Zweig, and Zoran Tasic to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Michael Burke, Jonathan Dimesky, Stephanie Frasier, Mohamed Haridi, Richard Harris. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steve W. Berman, #2 Affidavit of Jason A. Zweig, #3 Affidavit of Zoran Tasic)(Raabe, Craig)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steve W. Berman, Jason A. Zweig, and Zoran Tasic to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $225 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5461726) by Michael Burke, Jonathan Dimesky, Stephanie Frasier, Mohamed Haridi, Richard Harris. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steve W. Berman, #2 Affidavit of Jason A. Zweig, #3 Affidavit of Zoran Tasic, #4 Certificate of Good Standing for Jason A. Zweig, #5 Certificate of Good Standing for Zoran Tasic)(Raabe, Craig) Modified on 9/30/2019 to correct attorney name(Reis, Julia).
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Craig A. Raabe* *Izard, Kindall & Raabe LLP* *29 South Main Street, Suite 305* *West Hartford, CT 06107*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Standing Protective Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Mohamed Haridi, Stephanie Frasier, Jonathan Dimesky, Michael Burke, Richard Harris, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Mohamed Haridi, Stephanie Frasier, Jonathan Dimesky, Michael Burke, Richard Harris, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, filed by Mohamed Haridi, Stephanie Frasier, Jonathan Dimesky, Michael Burke, Richard Harris Signed by Clerk on 09/27/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 09/26/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 09/26/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/25/2019. Discovery due by 3/27/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2020. Signed by Clerk on 09/26/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth R. Klein on behalf of Michael Burke, Jonathan Dimesky, Stephanie Frasier, Mohamed Haridi, Richard Harris (Klein, Seth)
September 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Barrett on behalf of Michael Burke, Jonathan Dimesky, Stephanie Frasier, Mohamed Haridi, Richard Harris (Barrett, Christopher)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5458390.), filed by Michael Burke, Mohamed Haridi, Jonathan Dimesky, Stephanie Frasier, Richard Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Raabe, Craig)
September 26, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Raabe, Craig)
September 26, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dimesky et al v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Dimesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE FRASIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Haridi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?