Rodriguez v. Sanofi U.S. LLC et al
Plaintiff: Glorimar Rodriguez
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Chattem Inc. and CVS Health Co.
Case Number: 9:2020cv80203
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes)
February 13, 2020 Filing 32 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of New York Southern. Case Number 1:19-cv-09527 with documents 1-28. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80203-RLR on 2/7/2020 Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (pes)
February 12, 2020 Filing 31 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Loren H. Brown, mailing date February 12, 2020, (pt)
February 12, 2020 Filing 30 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes)
February 12, 2020 Filing 29 Case transferred in from New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-09527. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(pes).
February 11, 2020 Filing 28 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (Signed by MDL Panel on 2/6/2020) (sjo)
February 11, 2020 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (sjo)
February 6, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending JPML Determination. Having reviewed the parties' joint letter filed on December 3, 2019, ECF No. 26, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The action is STAYED pending the decision of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") in In re Zantac/Ranitidine NDMA Litig., MDL No. 2924; 2. All deadlines are VACATED; and 3. The parties shall notify the Court of the JPML's decision within ten days of the decision. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/4/2019) (jca)
December 3, 2019 Filing 26 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending JPML Determination addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Christopher M. Strongosky dated December 3, 2019. Document filed by CVS Health Co., Chattem, Inc., Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(Strongosky, Christopher)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED in part, DENIED in part. By December 20, 2019, Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/4/2019) (cf)
November 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: CVS Health Co. answer due 12/20/2019; Chattem, Inc. answer due 12/20/2019; Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. answer due 12/20/2019; Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC answer due 12/20/2019. (cf)
November 1, 2019 Filing 24 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Christopher M. Strongosky dated November 1, 2019. Document filed by Chattem, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(Strongosky, Christopher)
November 1, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Loren H. Brown on behalf of Chattem, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Brown, Loren)
November 1, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher M. Strongosky on behalf of Chattem, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Strongosky, Christopher)
October 29, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. Service was accepted by Mairbel Menendez, Paralegal. Document filed by Glorimar Rodriguez. (Obergfell, Andrew)
October 24, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (dnh)
October 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Andrew Obergfell. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sanofi U.S. LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (dnh)
October 23, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. Service was accepted by Renee Nordquist, Registered Agent. Document filed by Glorimar Rodriguez. (Obergfell, Andrew)
October 23, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, re: #17 Complaint. Document filed by Glorimar Rodriguez. (Obergfell, Andrew)
October 23, 2019 Filing 17 COMPLAINT against CVS Health Co., Chattem, Inc., Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Sanofi U.S. LLC. Document filed by Glorimar Rodriguez.(Obergfell, Andrew)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/22/2019) (mml)
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew Obergfell dated 10/22/2019. Document filed by Glorimar Rodriguez.(Obergfell, Andrew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Chattem, Inc. served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. Service was accepted by Cathy Jones, Registered Agent. Document filed by Glorimar Rodriguez. (Obergfell, Andrew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. CVS Health Co. served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Registered Agent. Document filed by Glorimar Rodriguez. (Obergfell, Andrew)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, at 11:20 a.m., on December 16, 2019, in Courtroom 15D of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS NOTICE AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES TO ALL PARTIES. The parties are directed to submit a joint letter by December 9, 2019, addressing the following in separate paragraphs: (1) a brief description of the case, including the factual and legal bases for the claim(s) and defense(s), (2) any contemplated motions and (3) the prospect for settlement. The parties shall set forth the date and time of the conference in the opening paragraph of the joint letter. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 11:20 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/17/19) (yv)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/17/2019) (jwh)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sanofi U.S. LLC. (dnh)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (dnh)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CVS Health Co.. (dnh)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chattem, Inc.. (dnh)
October 16, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Cathy Seibel is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
October 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Andrew Obergfell. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Glorimar Rodriguez, CVS Health Co.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (dnh)
October 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
October 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
October 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so redesignated. (wb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sanofi U.S. LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Glorimar Rodriguez. (Obergfell, Andrew)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Glorimar Rodriguez. (Obergfell, Andrew)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CVS Health Co., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Glorimar Rodriguez. (Obergfell, Andrew)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chattem, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Glorimar Rodriguez. (Obergfell, Andrew)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Obergfell, Andrew)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CVS Health Co., Chattem, Inc., Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Sanofi U.S. LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17776629)Document filed by Glorimar Rodriguez.(Obergfell, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Sanofi U.S. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Strongosky
Represented By: Loren H. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Strongosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Strongosky
Represented By: Loren H. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Co.
Represented By: Christopher M. Strongosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glorimar Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Obergfell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?