Garza et al v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Plaintiff: Corina Lingerfelt, Christina Garza, Justin Rowe and Pankaj Khetarpal
Defendant: Chattem Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020cv80227
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PRETRIAL ORDER #1: Setting Initial Conference, to be held on March 20, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1, Paul G. Rogers United States Courthouse, 701 Clematis Street, West Palm Beach, Florida.. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes)
February 20, 2020 Filing 39 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of California Northern. Case Number 5:19-cv-05772 with documents 1-35. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80227-RLR. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (pes)
February 20, 2020 Filing 38 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Mark A. Sentenac and Zoran Tasic, mailing date February 20, 2020, (pt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 36 Case transferred in from California Northern; Case Number 5:19-cv-05772. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(pes).
February 14, 2020 Filing 35 MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Southern District of Florida. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 37 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes)
January 27, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Sentenac (Sentenac, Mark) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING #32 STIPULATION TO STAY THE CASE PENDING JPML DETERMINATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/4/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay the Case Pending JPML Determination [N.D. Cal. L.R. 7-12] filed by Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Young, Christopher) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 31 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. ; and Certification of Interested Entities pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-15 (Young, Christopher) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION #27 TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/8/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Barnhart, Lindsey) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Catherine Barnhart (Barnhart, Lindsey) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Young, Christopher) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pankaj Khetarpal, Corina Lingerfelt, Justin Rowe, Christina Garza. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Zweig, Jason) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pankaj Khetarpal, Corina Lingerfelt, Justin Rowe, Christina Garza. Sanofi US Services, Inc. served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Zweig, Jason) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pankaj Khetarpal, Corina Lingerfelt, Justin Rowe, Christina Garza. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Zweig, Jason) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pankaj Khetarpal, Corina Lingerfelt, Justin Rowe, Christina Garza. Chattem, Inc. served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (Zweig, Jason) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 22 *Filing Error See dkt #24 for Corrections* AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Chattem, Inc. on 09/19/19, filed by Christina Garza, Pankaj Khetarpal, Corina Lingerfelt, Justin Rowe. (Zweig, Jason) (Filed on 9/24/2019) Modified on 9/25/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Zoran Tasic (Tasic, Zoran) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Allen Zweig (Zweig, Jason) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Steve W. Berman (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #10 MOTION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAV VICE (STEVE BERMAN). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 09/18/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #9 MOTION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAV VICE (JASON ZWEIG). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 09/18/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #8 MOTION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAV VICE (ZORAN TASIC). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 09/18/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2020 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case, Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 9/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Steve W. Berman [Correction of Dkt 6] ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13704197.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/13/2019 filed by Christina Garza, Pankaj Khetarpal, Corina Lingerfelt, Justin Rowe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/13/2019) Modified on 9/16/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Jason A. Zweig [Correction of Dkt 5] ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13704151.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/13/2019 filed by Christina Garza, Pankaj Khetarpal, Corina Lingerfelt, Justin Rowe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/13/2019) Modified on 9/16/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Zoran Tasic [Correction of Dkt. 4] ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13704100.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/13/2019 filed by Christina Garza, Pankaj Khetarpal, Corina Lingerfelt, Justin Rowe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/13/2019) Modified on 9/16/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Christina Garza, Pankaj Khetarpal, Corina Lingerfelt, Justin Rowe.. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 *Filing Error See Dkt. 10 for Corrections* MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Steve W. Berman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13704197.) filed by Christina Garza, Pankaj Khetarpal, Corina Lingerfelt, Justin Rowe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/13/2019) Modified on 9/16/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 *Filing Error See Dkt. 9 for Corrections* MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Jason A. Zweig ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13704151.) filed by Christina Garza, Pankaj Khetarpal, Corina Lingerfelt, Justin Rowe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/13/2019) Modified on 9/16/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 *Filing Error See Dkt. 8 for Corrections* MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Zoran Tasic ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 26K6BBS4.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/13/2019 filed by Christina Garza, Pankaj Khetarpal, Corina Lingerfelt, Justin Rowe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/13/2019) Modified on 9/16/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13703959.). Filed byPankaj Khetarpal, Corina Lingerfelt, Justin Rowe, Christina Garza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garza et al v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Sentenac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corina Lingerfelt
Represented By: Zoran Tasic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Garza
Represented By: Zoran Tasic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Rowe
Represented By: Zoran Tasic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pankaj Khetarpal
Represented By: Zoran Tasic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?