Melillo v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Plaintiff: Yesenia Melillo
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc. and Chattem Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020cv80250
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL ORDER #1: Setting Initial Conference, to be held on March 20, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1, Paul G. Rogers United States Courthouse, 701 Clematis Street, West Palm Beach, Florida.. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes)
February 21, 2020 Filing 12 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes)
February 21, 2020 Filing 11 Case transferred in from New York Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-06376. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(pes).
February 19, 2020 Case transferred to District of Southern District of Florida. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August)
February 19, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-1: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of Florida for the reasons stated in the order of February 6, 2020, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. (Attachments: #1 Request for Case Transfer) (Marziliano, August)
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-1: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of Florida for the reasons stated in the order of February 6, 2020, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. (Marziliano, August)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion to stay #6 is granted. All deadlines and proceedings are hereby adjourned sine die. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/17/2019. (Ferrara, Anthony)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Strongosky on behalf of Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (aty to be noticed) (Strongosky, Christopher)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Strongosky, Christopher)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 Letter MOTION Request to Stay Proceedings by Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Strongosky, Christopher) Modified on 12/17/2019 (Ferrara, Anthony).
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara for all further proceedings. Judge Pamela K. Chen, Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 11/21/2019. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case (Davis, Kimberly)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12052588 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Yesenia Melillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Dsouza, Zahra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melillo v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yesenia Melillo
Represented By: Zahra R. Dsouza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Strongosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Strongosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Strongosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?