Massiah v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Plaintiff: Edith Massiah
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc. and Chattem Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020cv80315
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRETRIAL ORDER #1 Setting Initial Conference. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
February 27, 2020 Filing 19 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from the Southern District of New York. Case Number 1:19-cv-11944 with documents 1-16. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80315-RLR on 2/27/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc)
February 27, 2020 Filing 18 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc)
February 27, 2020 Filing 17 Case transferred in from New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-11944. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
February 24, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (Signed by MDL Panel on 2/19/2020) (sjo)
February 24, 2020 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (sjo)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/7/2020) (mro)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/4/2020 at 11:40 AM in Courtroom 15D of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/7/2020) (mro) Modified on 1/24/2020 (mro).
January 7, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-09527-AT. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 7, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 7, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chattem, Inc.. (dnh)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (dnh)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.. (dnh)
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-09527 (AT). Document filed by Edith Massiah.(Marlborough, Christopher)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Marlborough, Christopher)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chattem, inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Edith Massiah. (Marlborough, Christopher)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Edith Massiah. (Marlborough, Christopher)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Edith Massiah. (Marlborough, Christopher)
January 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Christopher Marlborough. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 07:1; Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Arbitration code e (Exempt);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Arbitration code has been deleted;. (jgo)
January 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Christopher Marlborough to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code - no selection; the PDF was not signed or dated by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
January 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Christopher Marlborough, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
January 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christopher Marlborough. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Edith Massiah; Chattem, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
January 2, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
January 2, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Analisa Torres as possibly related to 19-cv-9527. (jgo)
January 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Christopher Marlborough to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
January 2, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chattem, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Chattem, Inc.. (Marlborough, Christopher) Modified on 1/2/2020 (jgo).
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Edith Massiah. (Marlborough, Christopher) Modified on 1/2/2020 (jgo).
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Edith Massiah. (Marlborough, Christopher) Modified on 1/2/2020 (jgo).
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Marlborough, Christopher) Modified on 1/2/2020 (jgo).
December 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chattem, Inc., Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18394085)Document filed by Edith Massiah.(Marlborough, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massiah v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith Massiah
Represented By: Christopher Marlborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?