Ticktin Law Group v. Beale Street Blues Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ticktin Law Group
Defendant: Stewart Thomas Peters, Beale Street Blues Company, Inc. and Beale Street Blues Company - West Palm Beach, LLC
Case Number: 9:2020cv80333
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kenneth A Marra
Referring Judge: William Matthewman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William E. Routt III. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12768356 by Beale Street Blues Company - West Palm Beach, LLC, Beale Street Blues Company, Inc., Stewart Thomas Peters. Responses due by 5/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Morse, Gregory)
April 20, 2020 Filing 15 Renewed MOTION to Amend/Correct #9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Frank L. Watson III by Beale Street Blues Company - West Palm Beach, LLC, Beale Street Blues Company, Inc., Stewart Thomas Peters. Responses due by 5/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Morse, Gregory)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint. The Court will grant Defendants their request for 30 days due to the current pandemic that warrants additional time that would otherwise not be justified. Beale Street Blues Company - West Palm Beach, LLC Answer due 5/11/2020; Beale Street Blues Company, Inc. Answer due 5/11/2020; Stewart Thomas Peters Answer due 5/11/2020. Re: #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Beale Street Blues Company, Inc., Beale Street Blues Company - West Palm Beach, LLC, Stewart Thomas Peters. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 4/10/2020. (lh1)
April 10, 2020 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Beale Street Blues Company - West Palm Beach, LLC, Beale Street Blues Company, Inc., Stewart Thomas Peters. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morse, Gregory)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 3/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/15/2021 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra., Calendar Call set for 3/12/2021 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Discovery., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 3/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (ir) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
March 20, 2020 Filing 10 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Ticktin Law Group (Almaguer, Kendrick)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Frank L. Watson of Attorney Frank L. Watson, III Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Frank Watson. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 3/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (ir)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint. Beale Street Blues Company - West Palm Beach, LLC Answer due 3/30/2020; Beale Street Blues Company, Inc. Answer due 3/30/2020; Stewart Thomas Peters Answer due 3/30/2020. Re: #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Beale Street Blues Company, Inc., Beale Street Blues Company - West Palm Beach, LLC, Stewart Thomas Peters. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 3/9/2020. (ir)
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint by Beale Street Blues Company - West Palm Beach, LLC, Beale Street Blues Company, Inc., Stewart Thomas Peters. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morse, Gregory)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Frank L. Watson, III. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12564104 by Beale Street Blues Company - West Palm Beach, LLC, Beale Street Blues Company, Inc., Stewart Thomas Peters. Responses due by 3/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Morse, Gregory)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Counsel to Confer and File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 3/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (ir)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Beale Street Blues Company - West Palm Beach, LLC, Beale Street Blues Company, Inc., Stewart Thomas Peters re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case Civil Cover Sheet (Morse, Gregory)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (ebz)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra and Magistrate Judge William Matthewman. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Ticktin Law Group v. Beale Street Blues, Inc. et al) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12528566, filed by Stewart Thomas Peters, Beale Street Blues Company - West Palm Beach, LLC, Beale Street Blues Company, Inc.. No Motion to Dismiss and/or Answer has been attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit A)(Morse, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ticktin Law Group v. Beale Street Blues Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Thomas Peters
Represented By: Gregory Joseph Morse
Represented By: William E. Routt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beale Street Blues Company, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Joseph Morse
Represented By: Frank L. Watson, III
Represented By: William E. Routt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beale Street Blues Company - West Palm Beach, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Joseph Morse
Represented By: William E. Routt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ticktin Law Group
Represented By: Kendrick Almaguer
Represented By: Peter David Ticktin
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?